Cannell v. The People of the State of Utah et al
Plaintiff: Thomas A. Cannell, IV
Defendant: Jocelyn Anderson Jobs, Apple Computer Inc and The People of the State of Utah
Case Number: 4:2019cv06869
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC JNE
Referring Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 11/01/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2019)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE TO A DISTRICT JUDGE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 10/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2019)
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to a United States Magistrate Judge. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2019)
October 22, 2019 Filing 6 CASE TRANSFERRED in from United States District Court for the Eastern District of California (Fresno); Case Number 1:19-cv-01154-LJO-BAM. Original File Certified Copy of Transfer Order and Docket Sheet Received.
October 11, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order, Case Transferred Out to Another District, Terminate Civil Case, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings served on Thomas A. Cannell, IV. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER, CASE TRANSFERRED to Northern District of CA, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/10/2019. CASE CLOSED(Martin-Gill, S)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Thomas A. Cannell, IV. (Sant Agata, S)
August 29, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order, served on Thomas A. Cannell, IV. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Submit Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or Pay $400.00 Filing Fee within Thirty Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/28/2019.(Motion for IFP or Filing Fee due: 30-Day Deadline) (Attachments: #1 IFP Application -Prisoner)(Martin-Gill, S)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by Thomas A. Cannell, IV. (Flores, E)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple Computer, Inc., Jocelyn Anderson Jobs, The People of the State of Utah by Thomas A. Cannell, IV. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Flores, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cannell v. The People of the State of Utah et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jocelyn Anderson Jobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Computer Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The People of the State of Utah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas A. Cannell, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?