Hubbard v. Lockwood et al
Plaintiff: Zane M. Hubbard
Defendant: Connie Gipson, Timothy M. Lockwood and Kathleen Allison
Case Number: 4:2019cv07026
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC CHC
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Ordering Plaintiff to Pay Filing Fee in Full.Filing Fees due by 12/23/2019. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 11/25/19, a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Zane M. Hubbard. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PLAINTIFF SHOULD NOT BE DENIED LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Show Cause Response due by 12/5/2019. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 7, 2019. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 11/7/19, a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2019)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Zane M. Hubbard. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/31/2019: #1 Envelope) (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT; No Process against Kathleen Allison, Connie Gipson, Timothy M. Lockwood. Filed by Zane M. Hubbard. (Filing Fee: Not Paid, IFPP). (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/31/2019: #1 Envelope) (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hubbard v. Lockwood et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy M. Lockwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zane M. Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?