Guerra v. Montgomerry
Petitioner: Juan M. Guerra
Respondent: Montgomerry
Case Number: 4:2019cv07165
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC CHC
Referring Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. TO SHOW CAUSE: GRANTING #2 LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2019)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Juan M. Guerra. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2019) (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Juan M. Guerra. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2019) (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Filed byJuan M. Guerra. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2019: #1 Envelope) (jjbS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guerra v. Montgomerry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Juan M. Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Montgomerry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?