(HC) Cardenas v. CDCR
Petitioner: Danny Cardenas, Jr.
Respondent: Director of CDCR
Case Number: 4:2019cv07166
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE Acknowledging Receipt of Case Transfer in from the Eastern District of California, Case Number 2:19-cv-2110-KJM HC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 12/9/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2019)
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of California Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-02110. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 23, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order, Case Transferred Out to Another District served on Danny Cardenas Jr.. (Plummer, M)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/23/19 ORDERING CASE TRANSFERRED to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California. (Plummer, M) Modified on 10/23/2019 (Plummer, M).
October 21, 2019 Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Danny Cardenas, Jr, CDC G-36254 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (TEXT ONLY) (Plummer, M)
October 18, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Danny Cardenas Jr.. (Tupolo, A)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 11/21/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Tupolo, A)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Danny Cardenas, Jr. (Tupolo, A) Modified on 10/21/2019 (Plummer, M).
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation by Danny Cardenas, Jr.(Tupolo, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Cardenas v. CDCR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director of CDCR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Danny Cardenas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?