Serje et al v. Rappi, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jorge Uribe, Jose David Mendoza, Mauricio Paba Serje and Jose David Mendoza Macanaz
Defendant: Rappi, Inc., RAPPI S.A.S. and Simon Borrero Posada
Case Number: 4:2019cv07415
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jose David Mendoza Macanaz, Mauricio Paba Serje, Jorge Uribe.. (Skaff, Stephanie) (Filed on 11/26/2019)
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Simon Borrero Posada, Rappi S.A.S., Rappi, Inc.. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2019)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Skaff, Stephanie) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
November 12, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Defendant Simon Borrero Posada's name on the Complaint does not match the Defendant name on the proposed summons. Please correct the name and re-file the proposed summons. Re: #2 Proposed Summons filed by Jorge Uribe, Jose David Mendoza Macanaz, Mauricio Paba Serje (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/4/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2020 01:30 PM. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2019) Modified on 11/12/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/26/2019. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Skaff, Stephanie) (Filed on 11/8/2019)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for (1) Misappropriation of Trade Secrets Under the Defend Trade Secrets Act (DTSA) 18 U.S.C. 1836; (2) Misappropriation of Trade Secrets Under the California Uniform Trade Secrets Act (CUTSA)- Cal. Civ. Code 3426 against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13873532.). Filed byMauricio Paba Serje, Jose David Mendoza, Jorge Uribe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Skaff, Stephanie) (Filed on 11/8/2019) Modified on 11/12/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Serje et al v. Rappi, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Uribe
Represented By: Stephanie Powers Skaff
Represented By: Julia Frederika Kropp
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Fisher
Represented By: James Alexander Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose David Mendoza
Represented By: Stephanie Powers Skaff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mauricio Paba Serje
Represented By: Stephanie Powers Skaff
Represented By: Julia Frederika Kropp
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Fisher
Represented By: James Alexander Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose David Mendoza Macanaz
Represented By: Stephanie Powers Skaff
Represented By: Julia Frederika Kropp
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Fisher
Represented By: James Alexander Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rappi, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAPPI S.A.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simon Borrero Posada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?