Hubbard v. Ramos
Plaintiff: Zane M. Hubbard
Defendant: Dr. Gloria Ramos
Case Number: 4:2019cv07508
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC CHC
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #6 Order, #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2020)
December 30, 2019 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF Receipt for SERVICE as to #6 Order, #1 Complaint, #7 Summons Issued. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
December 26, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #1 Complaint and #6 Order to the Attorney General. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2019)
December 26, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Gloria Ramos. (Attachments: #1 USM-285)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2019)
December 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF SERVICE re #1 Complaint filed by Zane M. Hubbard. Signed by Judge Tigar, Jon S. on 12/24/2019. (chcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2019)
December 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Judge Tigar, Jon S. granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (chcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2019)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PLAINTIFF SHOULD NOT BE DENIED LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Show Cause Response due by 12/18/2019. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 20, 2019. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 11/21/2019, a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2019)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 Prison Trust Fund Account Statement by Zane M. Hubbard. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Zane M. Hubbard. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gloria Ramos. Filed by Zane M. Hubbard. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/15/2019: #1 Envelope) (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hubbard v. Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zane M. Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Gloria Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?