Lapping v. Wydham Vacation Ownership, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Lapping
Defendant: Matthew Muro, Derek Milholland, Wydham Vacation Ownership, Inc. and Wyndham Worldwide Corporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv07549
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #11 John K. Bennett's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2019)
December 16, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: John K. Bennett (Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13983399) filed by Derek Milholland, Wydham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Worldwide Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bennett, John) (Filed on 12/16/2019) Modified on 12/16/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Christopher Lapping.. (Mitchell, Kevin) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
December 4, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Matthew Muro.. (Catlos, Katherine) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT MATTHEW MURO Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff and Defendant Matthew Muro shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 12/17/2019. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Wydham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Worldwide Corporation.. (Dale, Conor) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
November 18, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 2/ 12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/19/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Derek Milholland, Matthew Muro, Wydham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Worldwide Corporation re 4 Case Assigned by Intake,,, (Dale, Conor) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/2/2019. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
November 15, 2019 #1 Answer to Removal Complaint (with jury demand) by Matthew Muro. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 15, 2019 #1 Answer to Removal Complaint by Derek Milholland, Wydham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Worldwide Corporation. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Derek Milholland, Matthew Muro, Wydham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Worldwide Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet w/Exhibits 1-3 (Dale, Conor) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Derek Milholland, Matthew Muro, Wydham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Wyndham Worldwide Corporation . (Dale, Conor) (Filed on 11/15/2019)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (with jury demand by plaintiff) to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California from County of San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC 18 571411. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13895130). Filed by Derek Milholland, Wyndham Worldwide Corporation, Wydham Vacation Ownership, Inc., Matthew Muro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Dale, Conor) (Filed on 11/15/2019) Modified on 11/18/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lapping v. Wydham Vacation Ownership, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Lapping
Represented By: Conrad Kahn Wu
Represented By: Edward Mathieu Higginbotham
Represented By: Kevin E Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Muro
Represented By: Conor John Dale
Represented By: Katherine S. Catlos
Represented By: Aaron Michael Cargain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Milholland
Represented By: Conor John Dale
Represented By: John K Bennett
Represented By: Atticus Shouyu Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wydham Vacation Ownership, Inc.
Represented By: Conor John Dale
Represented By: John K Bennett
Represented By: Atticus Shouyu Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyndham Worldwide Corporation
Represented By: Conor John Dale
Represented By: John K Bennett
Represented By: Atticus Shouyu Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?