Cisco Systems, Inc. et al v. Chung et al
Plaintiff: Cisco Systems, Inc. and Cisco Technology, Inc.
Defendant: Jedd Williams, James He, Wilson Chung, Thomas Puorro and Plantronics, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv07562
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Referring Judge: Phyllis J Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Filing 33 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint filed by James He, Cisco Technology, Inc and Cisco Systems, Inc. (Sockolov, Leila) (Filed on 1/9/2020) Modified on 1/9/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
December 30, 2019 Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco Technology, Inc.. Service waived by Plantronics, Inc. waiver sent on 12/23/2019, answer due 2/21/2020. (Olsheski, Carson) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
December 30, 2019 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco Technology, Inc.. Service waived by Thomas Puorro waiver sent on 12/23/2019, answer due 2/21/2020. (Olsheski, Carson) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
December 18, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Case number and Judge name or initials are incorrect Re: #29 Waiver of Service Executed filed by Cisco Technology, Inc., Cisco Systems, Inc. Counsel need not re-file the document, but should reference the correct judge name/initials on future all filings: 4:19-cv-07562-PJH (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2019)
December 18, 2019 Filing 30 Summons Issued as to Plantronics, Inc., Thomas Puorro. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2019)
December 17, 2019 Filing 29 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco Technology, Inc.. Service waived by Jedd Williams waiver sent on 11/27/2019, answer due 1/27/2020. (Desmarais, John) (Filed on 12/17/2019)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Carson Olsheski. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2019)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/19/2020 at 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/17/19. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2019)
December 17, 2019 Filing 26 Proposed Summons. (Desmarais, John) (Filed on 12/17/2019)
December 17, 2019 Filing 25 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT for Trade Secret Misappropriation against All Defendants. Filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Desmarais, John) (Filed on 12/17/2019) Modified on 12/18/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Judge William H. Orrick no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 12/17/19. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2019)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/16/2019. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2019)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Judge Maxine M. Chesney no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 12/12/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2019)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 12, 2019. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2019)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Judge James Donato no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 12/11/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2019)
December 11, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by James He. (Sockolov, Leila) (Filed on 12/11/2019)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/20/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 2/13/2020. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/4/19. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
December 3, 2019 Filing 17 Case REASSIGNED to Judge James Donato. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
December 2, 2019 Filing 16 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
December 2, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13939176.) filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco Technology, Inc.. (Olsheski, Carson) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
December 2, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
December 2, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco Technology, Inc... (Packin, Tamir) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
November 25, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco Technology, Inc.. Service waived by Wilson Chung waiver sent on 11/21/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (Desmarais, John) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
November 20, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco Technology, Inc.. James He served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. (Desmarais, John) (Filed on 11/20/2019)
November 18, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Jedd Williams. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
November 18, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to James He. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
November 18, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Wilson Chung. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/11/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/18/2020 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
November 18, 2019 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/2/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Tamir Packin (Packin, Tamir) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Desmarais (Desmarais, John) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco Technology, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Cisco Systems, Inc., Other Affiliate Cisco Technology, Inc. for Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco Technology, Inc.. (Desmarais, John) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Desmarais, John) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Trade Secret Misappropriation against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13897582.). Filed byCisco Systems, Inc., Cisco Technology, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Desmarais, John) (Filed on 11/18/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cisco Systems, Inc. et al v. Chung et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cisco Systems, Inc.
Represented By: John M. Desmarais
Represented By: Tamir Packin
Represented By: Carson Olsheski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cisco Technology, Inc.
Represented By: John M. Desmarais
Represented By: Tamir Packin
Represented By: Carson Olsheski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jedd Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James He
Represented By: Leila N Sockolov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilson Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Puorro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plantronics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?