Turner v. Weslo
Plaintiff: Stephen Turner
Defendant: Weslo
Case Number: 4:2019cv07598
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER to File Dismissal Within 60 Days. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 1/13/2020. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/13/2020: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
January 9, 2020 Filing 9 Joint Notice of Settlement by Weslo and Stephen Turner. (Smith, Stephen) (Filed on 1/9/2020) Modified on 1/9/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
December 11, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Weslo. (Attachments: #1 USM-285)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2019)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 12/10/2019 a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2019) Modified on 12/10/2019 (shyS, COURT STAFF).
November 29, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Stephen Turner. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2019)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE Regarding Resources Available to Pro Se Litigants. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/11/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/18/2020 01:30 PM. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Stephen Turner. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Weslo filed by Stephen Turner. Consent/Declination due by 12/3/2019. (No Process) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Weslo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weslo
Represented By: Stephen Henry Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?