Pacific Maritime Association v. International Longshore and Warehouse Union, Local 10
Plaintiff: Pacific Maritime Association
Defendant: International Longshore and Warehouse Union, Local 10
Case Number: 4:2019cv07826
Filed: November 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 21 Request for Judicial Notice re #20 Reply to Opposition/Response, filed byPacific Maritime Association. (Related document(s) #20 ) (Meckley, Eric) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY (re #7 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award and to Enforce Arbitration Award ) filed byPacific Maritime Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lieutenant Colonel Curtis Yankie in Support of PMA's Reply, #2 Declaration of Samuel Rice in Support of PMA's Reply)(Meckley, Eric) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 13, 2019 Filing 19 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #7 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award and to Enforce Arbitration Award ) filed byInternational Longshore and Warehouse Union, Local 10. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Melvin Mackay, #2 Proposed Order)(Morton, Eleanor) (Filed on 12/13/2019)
December 11, 2019 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 3/2/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for MONDAY, 3/9/2020 02:00 PM before Hon. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2019)
December 9, 2019 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE RE-SETTING MOTION HEARING DATE TO FEBRUARY 4, 2020. Set/Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award and to Enforce Arbitration Award. Due to the Court's calendar the Motion Hearing that was RE-NOTICED for 1/28/2020 is CONTINUED to Tuesday 2/4/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. The 1/28/2020 hearing is VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2019)
December 6, 2019 Filing 16 Renotice motion hearing re #7 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award and to Enforce Arbitration Award filed byPacific Maritime Association. (Related document(s) #7 ) (Meckley, Eric) (Filed on 12/6/2019)
December 6, 2019 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING RE-NOTICE OF MOTION FOR DKT. NO. 7. Plaintiff Pacific Maritime Association is to file a one page Re-Notice of Motion (use re-notice event in ECF) for the Motion for Order Confirming and Enforcing Labor Arbitration Awards #7 and set it for Tuesday January 21, 2020 at 2:00 PM before Hon. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers, or for a Tuesday following the January 21, 2020 date. The briefing schedule is maintained. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2019)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 12/06/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2019)
December 5, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019)
December 4, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Pacific Maritime Association of Summons and Complaint (Meckley, Eric) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
December 4, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by International Longshore and Warehouse Union, Local 10.. (Morton, Eleanor) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
December 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Joseph Palma (Palma, Andrew) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
December 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Eleanor I. Morton (Morton, Eleanor) (Filed on 12/4/2019)
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff/Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 12/9/2019. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
November 29, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award and to Enforce Arbitration Award filed by Pacific Maritime Association. Motion Hearing set for 1/9/2020 01:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 12/13/2019. Replies due by 12/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William Bartelson, #2 Declaration of Jaime Villanueva, #3 Proposed Order)(Meckley, Eric) (Filed on 11/29/2019)
November 29, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to International Longshore and Warehouse Union, Local 10. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2019)
November 29, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 2/ 26/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/4/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2019)
November 29, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/13/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2019)
November 29, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Meckley, Eric) (Filed on 11/29/2019)
November 29, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Pacific Maritime Association identifying Other Affiliate Marine Terminals Corp. for Pacific Maritime Association. (Meckley, Eric) (Filed on 11/29/2019)
November 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Confirmation and Enforcement of Labor against International Longshore and Warehouse Union, Local 10( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13936001.). Filed byPacific Maritime Association. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Meckley, Eric) (Filed on 11/29/2019) Modified on 11/29/2019 (fff, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacific Maritime Association v. International Longshore and Warehouse Union, Local 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Longshore and Warehouse Union, Local 10
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Palma
Represented By: Eleanor I. Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Maritime Association
Represented By: Eric Meckley
Represented By: Clifford Douglas Sethness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?