Dunn-Ruiz v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sonia Dunn-Ruiz
Defendant: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv08121
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J Hamilton
Referring Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446pl
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE Remanding case to Superior Court, Contra Costa County. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2020)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO REMAND AND VACATING HEARING by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #13 Motion to Remand. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2020)
January 24, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY (re #13 MOTION to Remand ) filed bySonia Dunn-Ruiz. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Shalaby, #2 Exhibit A)(Shalaby, Andrew) (Filed on 1/24/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 16 Request for Judicial Notice re #14 Opposition/Response to Motion , filed byVolkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #14 ) (Winterman, Craig) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Craig L. Winterman in Opposition to #13 MOTION to Remand , filed byVolkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Related document(s) #13 ) (Winterman, Craig) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 14 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #13 MOTION to Remand ) filed byVolkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Winterman, Craig) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 7, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand filed by Sonia Dunn-Ruiz. Motion Hearing set for 2/12/2020 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 1/21/2020. Replies due by 1/28/2020. (Shalaby, Andrew) (Filed on 1/7/2020)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND RESPONSIVE PLEADING; ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #11 Stipulation. Amended Pleadings due by 2/28/2020. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2020)
December 31, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to File First Amended Complaint and Responsive Pleading filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. and Sonia Dunn-Ruiz. (Winterman, Craig) (Filed on 12/31/2019) Modified on 1/2/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/19/2020 at 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/27/19. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2019)
December 26, 2019 Filing 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2019)
December 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by The Clerk on 12/24/19. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2019)
December 23, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2019)
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sonia Dunn-Ruiz.. (Shalaby, Andrew) (Filed on 12/17/2019)
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Wagdy Shalaby (Shalaby, Andrew) (Filed on 12/17/2019)
December 12, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED Civil Cover Sheet by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (Winterman, Craig) (Filed on 12/12/2019)
December 12, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/26/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2019)
December 12, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect Revision of Civil Cover Sheet used [err201]. Current Revision is JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 07/19). Please complete correct Civil Cover Sh eet and e-file an an Amended Civil Cover Sheet only. Event is located at: Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2019)
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Volkswagen AG for Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Winterman, Craig) (Filed on 12/12/2019)
December 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Action from Superior Court of State of California, County of Contra Costa. Their case number is C19-02214. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0971-13974711). Filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Winterman, Craig) (Filed on 12/12/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunn-Ruiz v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
Represented By: Craig Lee Winterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonia Dunn-Ruiz
Represented By: Andrew Wagdy Shalaby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?