SMTM Technology, LLC v. Apple, Inc.
Plaintiff: SMTM Technology, LLC
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv08133
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Filing 29 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: #1 complaint with exhibits)(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2020)
January 23, 2020 Filing 28 Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple, Inc. (Winnard, Douglas) (Filed on 1/23/2020)
January 23, 2020 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byApple, Inc.. (Winnard, Douglas) (Filed on 1/23/2020)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Lauren Abendshien. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Alan E. Littmann. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 15, 2020 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SMTM Technology, LLC OF ORDER REASSIGNING CASE (Cotchett, Joseph) (Filed on 1/15/2020)
January 15, 2020 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SMTM Technology, LLC OF CONSENT OR DECLINATION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE JURISDICTION (Cotchett, Joseph) (Filed on 1/15/2020)
January 15, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Lauren Abendshien ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14071956.) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Abendshien, Lauren) (Filed on 1/15/2020)
January 15, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Alan E. Littmann ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14071908.) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Littmann, Alan) (Filed on 1/15/2020)
January 13, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Jordan Winnard (Winnard, Douglas) (Filed on 1/13/2020)
January 13, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Thomas Pieja (Pieja, Michael) (Filed on 1/13/2020)
January 13, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Frederick Baum (Baum, Kenneth) (Filed on 1/13/2020)
January 10, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Winter Weil (Weil, Kelly) (Filed on 1/10/2020)
January 9, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul William Reidl (Reidl, Paul) (Filed on 1/9/2020)
January 9, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SMTM Technology, LLC OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT as to Apple Inc (Cotchett, Joseph) (Filed on 1/9/2020) Modified on 1/10/2020 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 9, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS TIME TO ANSWER PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 6-1 filed by SMTM Technology, LLC and Apple, Inc. (Cotchett, Joseph) (Filed on 1/9/2020) Modified on 1/10/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
January 6, 2020 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 3/16/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for Monday, 3/23/2020 02:00 PM before Hon. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 12/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
December 30, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2019)
December 27, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by SMTM Technology, LLC.. (Cotchett, Joseph) (Filed on 12/27/2019)
December 13, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Apple, Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2019)
December 13, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: All parties are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. by 12/27/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2019)
December 13, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (Cotchett, Joseph) (Filed on 12/13/2019)
December 13, 2019 Filing 6 Civil Cover Sheet by SMTM Technology, LLC . (Cotchett, Joseph) (Filed on 12/13/2019)
December 13, 2019 #Electronic filing error.*An Error Exists on this page. Acrobat not displaying page correctly* This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in i ts entirety. Re: #2 Proposed Summons filed by SMTM Technology, LLC (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2019)
December 13, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/11/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/18/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2019)
December 13, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Case has been randomly assigned to judge, however incorrect Civil Cover Sheet used at case opening of JS44 (Rev. 09/19). Complete and re-file correct Civ il Cover Sheet JS-CAND 44 (Rev. 07/19 and re-file as a separate docket entry re #1 . #3 Complaint, filed by SMTM Technology, LLC (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2019)
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/27/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2019)
December 13, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by SMTM Technology, LLC (Cotchett, Joseph) (Filed on 12/13/2019)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Cotchett, Joseph) (Filed on 12/13/2019)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Apple, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13977268.). Filed bySMTM Technology, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cotchett, Joseph) (Filed on 12/13/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMTM Technology, LLC v. Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Lauren C Abendshien
Represented By: Michael Thomas Pieja
Represented By: Alan E. Littmann
Represented By: Douglas Jordan Winnard
Represented By: Kenneth Frederick Baum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SMTM Technology, LLC
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Represented By: Gina Stassi
Represented By: Kelly Winter Weil
Represented By: Paul William Reidl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?