Woods v. Carone et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Woods
Defendant: Wellpath and Lt. Carrie Carone
Case Number: 4:2019cv08313
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: PSLC JNE
Referring Judge: Sallie Kim
2 Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Filing 10 Mail sent to Joseph Woods returned as undeliverable re #5 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2020)
February 5, 2020 Filing 8 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/5/20. (CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ATTACHED) ***Civil Case Terminated.(jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2020)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/5/20. (CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ATTACHED)(jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2020)
January 31, 2020 Filing 9 Mail sent to Joseph Woods returned as undeliverable re Conformed Copies of #1 Complaint, #3 Clerk's Notice re: IFP, #4 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2020)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 01/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2020)
January 27, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2020)
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to a United States Magistrate Judge. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 1/27/2020. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 Prisoner's Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Joseph Woods. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Under The Civil Rights Act, 42 U.S.C. Section 1983 (no process) against Lt. Carrie Carone & Wellpath, (Filing Fee: Ifpp entered on 12/20/2019). Filed by Joseph Woods. (Attachments: #(1) Envelope) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods v. Carone et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellpath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Carrie Carone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?