Scottsdale Insurance Company v. Fineman
Plaintiff: Scottsdale Insurance Company
Defendant: David Fineman
Case Number: 4:2020cv00368
Filed: January 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. RE David Fineman (Rojas, Valerie) (Filed on 3/3/2020)
March 2, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. Service waived by David Fineman waiver sent on 2/24/2020, answer due 4/24/2020. (Rojas, Valerie) (Filed on 3/2/2020)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 01/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2020)
January 30, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2020)
January 29, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Scottsdale Insurance Company.. (Rojas, Valerie) (Filed on 1/29/2020)
January 21, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to David Fineman. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2020)
January 17, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/24/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/1/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
January 17, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/31/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Scottsdale Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Scottsdale Insurance Company. re #1 Complaint, #2 Proposed Summons (Rojas, Valerie) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Rojas, Valerie) (Filed on 1/16/2020)
January 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David Fineman ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14080516.). Filed byScottsdale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 to Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 to Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4 to Complaint, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rojas, Valerie) (Filed on 1/16/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scottsdale Insurance Company v. Fineman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scottsdale Insurance Company
Represented By: Valerie Diane Rojas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Fineman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?