Strickland et al v. Ujiri et al
Plaintiff: Kelly Strickland and Alan Strickland
Defendant: Toronto Raptors, National Basketball Association, Inc., Masai Ujiri and Maple Leaf Sports & Entertainment Ltd.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00981
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand byNational Basketball Association, Inc.. (Conrad, Mark) (Filed on 4/2/2020) Modified on 4/3/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 2, 2020 Filing 18 Defendants Masai Ujiri, Toronto Raptors and Maple Leaf Sports & Entertainment's Joint ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND byMaple Leaf Sports & Entertainment Ltd., Toronto Raptors, Masai Ujiri. (Cotchett, Joseph) (Filed on 4/2/2020) Modified on 4/3/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
March 24, 2020 Filing 17 Rule 7.1 Disclosures and Corporate Disclosure Statement & Certification of Interested Entities or Persons by Maple Leaf Sports & Entertainment Ltd., Toronto Raptors identifying Corporate Parent Rogers Communications, Inc., Corporate Parent Bell Canada Enterprises, Inc. for Maple Leaf Sports & Entertainment Ltd.. (Townsend, Emanuel) (Filed on 3/24/2020) Modified on 3/25/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
March 24, 2020 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Entities by Masai Ujiri (Townsend, Emanuel) (Filed on 3/24/2020)
March 20, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Tamarah P. Prevost (Prevost, Tamarah) (Filed on 3/20/2020)
March 19, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph W. Cotchett on Behalf of Defendants Masai Ujiri, Toronto Raptors, and Maple Leaf Sports & Entertainment (Cotchett, Joseph) (Filed on 3/19/2020)
March 19, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Emanuel Ben Levi Townsend on Behalf of Defendants Masai Ujiri, Toronto Raptors, and Maple Leaf Sports & Entertainment (Townsend, Emanuel) (Filed on 3/19/2020)
March 19, 2020 Filing 12 Rule 7.1 Disclosures and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons by National Basketball Association, Inc. (Conrad, Mark) (Filed on 3/19/2020) Modified on 3/20/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/20/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
March 17, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Defendants' Deadline to Respond to the Complaint filed by National Basketball Association, Inc. Kelly Strickland, and Alan Strickland. (Conrad, Mark) (Filed on 3/17/2020) Modified on 3/18/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
March 17, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney C. Aasen (Aasen, Courtney) (Filed on 3/17/2020)
March 17, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark R. Conrad (Conrad, Mark) (Filed on 3/17/2020)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 2/27/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2020)
February 26, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2020)
February 26, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Alan Strickland.. (Beyler, Brett) (Filed on 2/26/2020)
February 26, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Maple Leaf Sports & Entertainment Ltd., National Basketball Association, Inc., Toronto Raptors, Masai Ujiri. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2020)
February 25, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Beyler, Brett) (Filed on 2/25/2020)
February 10, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/1/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/8/2020 02:00 PM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2020)
February 10, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/24/2020. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2020)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES AND DAMAGES against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14156907.). Filed byAlan Strickland. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet )(Beyler, Brett) (Filed on 2/7/2020) Modified on 2/10/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strickland et al v. Ujiri et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toronto Raptors
Represented By: Emanuel Ben Levi Townsend
Represented By: Tamarah P. Prevost
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Basketball Association, Inc.
Represented By: Courtney C. Aasen
Represented By: Mark R. Conrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Masai Ujiri
Represented By: Emanuel Ben Levi Townsend
Represented By: Tamarah P. Prevost
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maple Leaf Sports & Entertainment Ltd.
Represented By: Emanuel Ben Levi Townsend
Represented By: Tamarah P. Prevost
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Strickland
Represented By: Grant Anderson Winter
Represented By: Brett Daniel Beyler
Represented By: David Philip Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Strickland
Represented By: Brett Daniel Beyler
Represented By: Grant Anderson Winter
Represented By: David Philip Mastagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?