Recology, Inc. v. Berkley Regional Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Recology, Inc.
Defendant: Berkley Regional Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv01150
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/21/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/28/2020 at 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/26/2020. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2020)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by The Clerk on 2/25/20. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2020)
February 24, 2020 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2020)
February 24, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Berkley Regional Insurance Company.. (Keeley, Michael) (Filed on 2/24/2020)
February 20, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Berkley Regional Insurance Company (Haddad, Georges) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
February 20, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byBerkley Regional Insurance Company. (Haddad, Georges) (Filed on 2/20/2020) Modified on 2/21/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
February 18, 2020 Filing 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/7/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/14/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2020)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Michael Keeley. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2020)
February 14, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 310.00, receipt number 0971-14181782.) filed by Berkley Regional Insurance Company. (Keeley, Michael) (Filed on 2/14/2020) Modified on 2/18/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2020 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/28/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2020)
February 14, 2020 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet by Berkley Regional Insurance Company . (Haddad, Georges) (Filed on 2/14/2020)
February 13, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Berkley Regional Insurance Company (Haddad, Georges) (Filed on 2/13/2020) Modified on 2/18/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Berkley Regional Insurance Company (Haddad, Georges) (Filed on 2/13/2020)
February 13, 2020 Filing 2 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Entities by Berkley Regional Insurance Company (Haddad, Georges) (Filed on 2/13/2020) Modified on 2/18/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-19-579839. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0971-14177418). Filed by Berkley Regional Insurance Company. (Haddad, Georges) (Filed on 2/13/2020) Modified on 2/18/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Recology, Inc. v. Berkley Regional Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Recology, Inc.
Represented By: Craig A. Pinedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkley Regional Insurance Company
Represented By: Georges A. Haddad
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Sachs
Represented By: Michael Keeley
Represented By: Barbara Rose Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?