Penrose Hill, Limited et al v. Mabray
Plaintiff: Philip James and Penrose Hill, Limited
Defendant: Paul Mabray
Case Number: 4:2020cv01169
Filed: February 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint byPaul Mabray. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel) (Filed on 3/26/2020)
March 18, 2020 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Paul Mabray.. (Matteo-Boehm, Rachel) (Filed on 3/18/2020)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #13 Gershon Akerman's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2020)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #12 Karen Bitar's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2020)
March 12, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Gershon Akerman (Filing fee $310, receipt number 0971-14273404) filed by Philip James, Penrose Hill, Limited. (Shoda, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/12/2020) Modified on 3/13/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
March 12, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Re: Karen Bitar (Filing fee $310, receipt number 0971-14273359) filed by Philip James, Penrose Hill, Limited. (Shoda, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/12/2020) Modified on 3/13/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
March 9, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANT Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 3/23/2020. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2020)
March 5, 2020 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Entities by Paul Mabray (Keating, Katherine) (Filed on 3/5/2020)
March 5, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant Paul Mabray to Respond to Complaint filed by Paul Mabray, Penrose Hill, Limited, Philip James. (Keating, Katherine) (Filed on 3/5/2020) Modified on 3/6/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
February 28, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Philip James, Penrose Hill, Limited.. (Shoda, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/28/2020)
February 24, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Philip James, Penrose Hill, Limited re #6 Summons Issued, #3 Proposed Summons, #1 Complaint, Proof of Service: Summons and Complaint (Shoda, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/24/2020)
February 18, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Paul Mabray. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2020)
February 18, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/13/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/20/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2020)
February 14, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/28/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2020)
February 14, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Shoda, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/14/2020)
February 14, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Philip James, Penrose Hill, Limited re #1 Complaint, (Shoda, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/14/2020)
February 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14181132). Filed by Penrose Hill, Limited, Philip James. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Shoda, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/14/2020) Modified on 2/18/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Penrose Hill, Limited et al v. Mabray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Mabray
Represented By: Douglas Antonio Alvarez
Represented By: Rachel E. Matteo-Boehm
Represented By: Katherine Anne Keating
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip James
Represented By: Jennifer L. Shoda
Represented By: Gershon Akerman
Represented By: Karen Bitar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penrose Hill, Limited
Represented By: Jennifer L. Shoda
Represented By: Gershon Akerman
Represented By: Karen Bitar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?