Freeberg et al v. Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Melanie Freeberg and Armand Garcia
Defendant: Prestige Default Services, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, National Association for CWHEQ Revolving Home Equity Loan Trust - Series 2007-A, The Bank of New York Mellon F/K/A The Bank of New York as Successor Indenture Trustee to JP Chase Bank, The Bank of New York Mellon and The Bank of New York as Successor Indenture Trustee to JP Chase Bank
Case Number: 4:2020cv01177
Filed: February 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2020 Filing 19 Refund Status re #13 Application for Refund, #14 Application for Refund, #17 Application for Refund, #12 Application for Refund, #16 Application for Refund, #15 Application for Refund Approved. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2020)
March 6, 2020 Filing 18 Answer to Removal Complaint bySpecialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Harvey, Jacqueline) (Filed on 3/6/2020)
March 5, 2020 Filing 17 Application for Refund re #1 Notice of Removal,, Receipt Number 0971-14183737 Correct Receipt Number is 0971-14183757 by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Holtzman, David) (Filed on 3/5/2020)
March 5, 2020 Filing 16 Application for Refund re #1 Notice of Removal,, Receipt Number 0971-14183723 Correct Receipt Number is 0971-14183757 by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Holtzman, David) (Filed on 3/5/2020)
March 5, 2020 Filing 15 Application for Refund re #1 Notice of Removal,, Receipt Number 0971-14183715 Correct Receipt Number is 0971-14183757 by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Holtzman, David) (Filed on 3/5/2020)
March 5, 2020 Filing 14 Application for Refund re #1 Notice of Removal,, Receipt Number 0971-14183705 Correct Receipt Number is 0971-14183757 by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Holtzman, David) (Filed on 3/5/2020)
March 5, 2020 Filing 13 Application for Refund re #1 Notice of Removal,, Receipt Number 0971-14183668 Correct Receipt Number is 0971-14183757 by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Holtzman, David) (Filed on 3/5/2020)
March 5, 2020 Filing 12 Application for Refund re #1 Notice of Removal,, Receipt Number 0971-14183623 Correct Receipt Number is 0971-14183757 by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Holtzman, David) (Filed on 3/5/2020)
March 2, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 5/19/2020 by 5:00 PM. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/26/2020 2:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2020)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 3/2/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2020)
February 28, 2020 Filing 9 Refund Status re #5 Application for Refund DECLINED. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2020)
February 28, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2020)
February 28, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Melanie Freeberg, Armand Garcia.. (Davidson, Thornton) (Filed on 2/28/2020)
February 27, 2020 Filing 6 Refund Status re #4 Application for Refund Approved. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2020)
February 25, 2020 Filing 5 Application for Refund re #1 Notice of Removal,, Receipt Number 0971-14183623; 0971-14183668; 0971-14183705; 0971-14183715; 0971-14183723; 0971-14183737 by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Harvey, Jacqueline) (Filed on 2/25/2020)
February 24, 2020 Filing 4 Application for Refund re #1 Notice of Removal,, Receipt Number 0971-14183745 Correct Receipt Number is 0971-14183757 by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Holtzman, David) (Filed on 2/24/2020)
February 20, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/7/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/14/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2020)
February 18, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/3/2020. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2020)
February 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Action from Superior Court of the State of California, County of Alameda. Their case number is RG20049850. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0971-14183757). Filed by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service) (Holtzman, David) (Filed on 2/14/2020) Modified on 2/20/2020 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freeberg et al v. Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prestige Default Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: David Ilan Holtzman
Represented By: Jacqueline Nicole Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Association for CWHEQ Revolving Home Equity Loan Trust - Series 2007-A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon F/K/A The Bank of New York as Successor Indenture Trustee to JP Chase Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York as Successor Indenture Trustee to JP Chase Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Freeberg
Represented By: Thornton Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armand Garcia
Represented By: Thornton Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?