EEON Foundation v. Google Inc. et al
Petitioner: EEON Foundation
Respondent: Alphabet Inc., YouTube, Inc. and Google Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv01317
Filed: February 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Referring Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 27:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2020 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE UPDATING TELEPHONIC INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. Notice is hereby given that Counsel shall join the conference line (888) 684-8852 promptly at the date and time specified. The access code to join the conference is 7281326. Please be advised that conferences in other cases may precede and/or follow the conference scheduled in this case. When connecting, you may hear music and/or another conference; please be patient and wait for your case to be called before making an appearance. When your case management conference concludes, please exit without delay to clear the line for other proceedings. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2020)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE A DECLARATION. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 4/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/8/2020: #2 Certificate/Proof of Service) (amgS, COURT STAFF).
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE: Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/14/2020. Initial Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 5/21/2020 02:45 PM in Oakland, Chambers. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 3/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2020)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by The Clerk on 3/20/20. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2020)
March 20, 2020 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2020)
March 20, 2020 Filing 13 Clerk's DECLINATION OF DEFAULT as to Google Inc., YouTube, Inc., and Alphabet Inc. Service of summons not complete under California Code of Civil Procedure 416.10. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (Related documents(s) #12 ) (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2020)
March 19, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by EEON Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2020)
March 18, 2020 Filing 11 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 34611148184. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2020)
March 18, 2020 Filing 10 Affidavit and Response to #8 Order Regarding Filing Fee by EEON Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2020)
March 9, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by EEON Foundation.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2020)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING FILING FEE re #2 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award and #4 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 03/06/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2020)
February 24, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Petitioner shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 3/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2020)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE AND ORDER: The attached notice and order notifies the plaintiff of resources available, attaches the district's handbook for litigants who do not have a lawyer, includes a flyer for contacting the court's help desk and instructs the plaintiff about serving the defendants. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 02/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service, #2 Self Help Flyer, #3 Pro Se Handbook)(ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2020)
February 21, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #1 ORDER TO FILE AS A CIVIL CASE, #3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #4 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING CASE ASSIGNMENT. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 21, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING CASE ASSIGNMENT. (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Application for Refund) (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 21, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/14/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/21/2020 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Notice of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial) (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 21, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by EEON Foundation. Responses due by 3/6/2020. Replies due by 3/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law)(wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER TO FILE AS A CIVIL CASE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on February 20, 2020. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EEON Foundation v. Google Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Alphabet Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: YouTube, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Google Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: EEON Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?