Miller v. GEICO General Insurance Co., et al
Plaintiff: Kara Miller
Defendant: DOES 1-25, inclusive. and GEICO General Insurance Co.,
Case Number: 4:2020cv01320
Filed: February 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Referring Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/16/20. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/5/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/12/2020 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2020)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Judge William H. Orrick no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 3/16/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2020)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/13/2020. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2020)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 5/26/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/09/2020. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2020)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 03/09/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2020)
March 6, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2020)
March 6, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by GEICO General Insurance Co.,.. (Bennett, Preston) (Filed on 3/6/2020)
February 24, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/19/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/26/2020 01:30 PM. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2020)
February 24, 2020 Answer to Removal Complaint by GEICO General Insurance Co. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2020)
February 21, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/6/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 21, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by GEICO General Insurance Co., identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway for GEICO General Insurance Co.,. re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Bennett, Preston) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 21, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by GEICO General Insurance Co., . (Bennett, Preston) (Filed on 2/21/2020)
February 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is HG19037573. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14203585). Filed byGEICO General Insurance Co.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - GEICOs Answer to Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Kara Millers Responses to GEICOs Special Interrogatories, Set Two, #4 Exhibit D - Preston Bennett Declaration in Support, #5 Exhibit E - State Court Documents, #6 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Bennett, Preston) (Filed on 2/21/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. GEICO General Insurance Co., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-25, inclusive.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Co.,
Represented By: Preston Blake Bennett
Represented By: John T. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kara Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?