Windom v. Internal Revenue Service
Plaintiff: Cameron Windom
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 4:2020cv01506
Filed: February 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Referring Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7426
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2020 Filing 11 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 4/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2020)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 4/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2020)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/27/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/3/2020 03:00 PM in Oakland, Chambers.Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 3/4/2020. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2020)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong for all further proceedings re #7 Order. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2020)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS; SCREENING COMPLAINT UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1915. Re: Dkt. No. #2 . Because there is not consent of all the parties, it is requested for this case to be reassigned to a District Court judge. Re: Dkt. No. #2 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 3/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2020)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ON SUA SPONTE REFERRAL FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2020)
March 2, 2020 Filing 5 REFERRAL FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP of cases 5:20-cv-01506 NC and 3:18-cv-07660 RS. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 3/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2020)
March 2, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: Plaintiff is requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 3/16/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2020)
February 28, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/27/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/3/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2020)
February 28, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Cameron Windom. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2020)
February 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Internal Revenue Service. Filed by Cameron Windom. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2020) Modified on 3/2/2020 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Windom v. Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cameron Windom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?