Bautista et al v. Juul Labs, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Salvadora Correa, Luz Perez Bautista and Maria de la Luz Perez Bautista
Defendant: David M. Ho, Long Ying International, Inc., Juul Labs, Inc. and Coalition For Reasonable Vaping Regulation
Case Number: 4:2020cv01613
Filed: March 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Document not properly linked. [err102] NOTE: for future reference, please submit proposed orders as an attachment to the motions and not as a separa te filing. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary Re: #34 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings and #36 Proposed Order filed by Long Ying International, Inc.; #37 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings and #38 Proposed Order filed by Juul Labs, Inc. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2020)
April 30, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Joinder re #34 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings and #37 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Coalition For Reasonable Vaping Regulation (Hertz, Bradley) (Filed on 4/30/2020) Modified on 5/1/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2020 Filing 38 Proposed Order re #37 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Juul Labs, Inc.. (Lipshutz, Joshua) (Filed on 4/30/2020) Modified on 5/1/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Juul Labs, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/25/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 5/14/2020. Replies due by 5/21/2020. (Lipshutz, Joshua) (Filed on 4/30/2020) Modified on 5/1/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2020 Filing 36 Proposed Order re #34 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Long Ying International, Inc.. (Prather, Edwin) (Filed on 4/30/2020) Modified on 5/1/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2020 Filing 35 Declaration of David M. Ho in Support of #34 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings, filed by Long Ying International, Inc.. (Related document(s) #34 ) (Prather, Edwin) (Filed on 4/30/2020) Modified on 5/1/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Long Ying International, Inc.. Responses due by 5/14/2020. Replies due by 5/21/2020. (Prather, Edwin) (Filed on 4/30/2020) Modified on 5/1/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2020 Filing 33 Certificate of Interested Entities by David M. Ho (Prather, Edwin) (Filed on 4/30/2020)
April 30, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance of Edwin Ken Prather and Sybil L. Renick as Counsel, filed by David M. Ho (Prather, Edwin) (Filed on 4/30/2020) Modified on 5/1/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons, filed by Long Ying International, Inc.. (Prather, Edwin) (Filed on 4/30/2020) Modified on 5/1/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance of Edwin Ken Prather and Sybil L. Renick as Counsel, filed by Long Ying International, Inc.. (Prather, Edwin) (Filed on 4/30/2020) Modified on 5/1/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
April 13, 2020 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certification of Interested Persons (None Other Than Named Parties, filed by Coalition For Reasonable Vaping Regulation (Hertz, Bradley) (Filed on 4/13/2020) Modified on 4/14/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
April 6, 2020 Filing 28 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options, filed by Salvadora Correa (Kaufmann, Aaron) (Filed on 4/6/2020) Modified on 4/7/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
March 31, 2020 #Electronic filing error. REMINDER: Judge name or initials are incorrect. Counsel need not re-file the document, but should reference the correct judge name/initials on future fili ngs (4:20-CV-1613-HSG). Re: #26 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b)of discussion of ADR options filed by Maria de la Luz Perez Bautista, #27 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b)of discussion of ADR options filed by Luz Perez Bautista. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2020)
March 30, 2020 Filing 27 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options of Plaintiff Luz Perez Bautista (Kaufmann, Aaron) (Filed on 3/30/2020)
March 30, 2020 Filing 26 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options of plaintiff Maria de la Luz Bautista Perez (Kaufmann, Aaron) (Filed on 3/30/2020)
March 26, 2020 Filing 25 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint Pursuant to L.R. 6-1 filed by Juul Labs, Inc., Luz Perez Bautista, Maria de la Luz Perez Bautista, Coalition for Reasonable Vaping Regulation, Salvadora Correa. (Lipshutz, Joshua) (Filed on 3/26/2020) Modified on 3/27/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2020 Filing 24 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for June 2, 2020, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by May 26th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:20-cv-01613-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2020)
March 25, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance of Bradley William Hertz and James Ross Sutton by Bradley William Hertz. (Hertz, Bradley) (Filed on 3/25/2020) Modified on 3/26/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Signed by the Clerk on 03/25/2020. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2020)
March 24, 2020 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2020)
March 24, 2020 Filing 20 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Juul Labs, Inc... (Lipshutz, Joshua) (Filed on 3/24/2020)
March 24, 2020 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Juul Labs, Inc. and Certification of Interested Entities (Lipshutz, Joshua) (Filed on 3/24/2020)
March 24, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Seth Lipshutz Counsel for Defendant JUUL Labs, Inc. (Lipshutz, Joshua) (Filed on 3/24/2020)
March 24, 2020 Filing 17 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Luz Perez Bautista, Maria de la Luz Perez Bautista, Salvadora Correa.. (Kaufmann, Aaron) (Filed on 3/24/2020)
March 19, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria de la Luz Perez Bautista, Salvadora Correa, Luz Perez Bautista. Coalition For Reasonable Vaping Regulation served on 3/12/2020, answer due 4/2/2020. (Kaufmann, Aaron) (Filed on 3/19/2020)
March 19, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria de la Luz Perez Bautista, Salvadora Correa, Luz Perez Bautista. Juul Labs, Inc. served on 3/10/2020, answer due 3/31/2020. (Kaufmann, Aaron) (Filed on 3/19/2020)
March 10, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Giselle Olmedo on behalf of Plaintiffs (Olmedo, Giselle) (Filed on 3/10/2020)
March 10, 2020 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 3/24/2020. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2020)
March 9, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Coalition For Reasonable Vaping Regulation, David M. Ho, Juul Labs, Inc., Long Ying International, Inc.. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2020)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 5/26/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/2/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/9/20. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2020)
March 9, 2020 Filing 10 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 5/ 26/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/2/2020 01:30 PM. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2020)
March 9, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by George Alejandro Warner (Warner, George) (Filed on 3/9/2020)
March 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Carole Vigne (Vigne, Carole) (Filed on 3/9/2020)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore for all further proceedings. Judge William H. Orrick no longer assigned to case, clerical error case not part of MDL Juul.. Signed by Clerk on 3/6/20. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2020)
March 4, 2020 FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE. DIRECT FILED MEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 2913: Bautista, et al v. Juul Labs, Inc., Opened in California Northern District as 3:20-cv-01613-WHO. cc: JPMDL (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2020) Modified on 3/6/2020 (wsnS, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2020 Filing 6 Case assigned to Judge William H. Orrick. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2020)
March 4, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Kaufmann, Aaron) (Filed on 3/4/2020)
March 4, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Kaufmann, Aaron) (Filed on 3/4/2020)
March 4, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Kaufmann, Aaron) (Filed on 3/4/2020)
March 4, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Kaufmann, Aaron) (Filed on 3/4/2020)
March 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Putative Class Action and Collective Action for Damages for: (1) Failure to Pay Wages Owed at Separation, Calif. Labor Code Sections 201, 203; (2) Failure to Furnish Accurate Wage Statements, Calif. Labor Code Section 226; (3) Failure to Pay Minimum Wages Under California Law, Calif. Labor Code Sections 1194, 1194.2; (4) Failure to Pay San Francisco Minimum Wage, S.F. Admin Code Section 12R; (5) Failure to Pay Overtime Wages, Calif. Labor Code Sections 510, 1194; (6) Failure to Reimburse Business Expenses, Calif. Labor Code Section 2802; (7) Failure to Provide Meal Periods, Calif. Labor Code Sections 226.7, 512; (8) Violations of Unfair Competition Law, Calif. Bus. & Profs. Code Section 17200 et seq.; (9) Failure to Pay Overtime Wages, FLSA, 29 U.S.C. Section 207 against All Defendants, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-14246649). Filed by Maria de la Luz Perez Bautista, Salvadora Correa, Luz Perez Bautista. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Kaufmann, Aaron) (Filed on 3/4/2020) Modified on 3/6/2020 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bautista et al v. Juul Labs, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Ho
Represented By: Edwin Ken Prather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long Ying International, Inc.
Represented By: Edwin Ken Prather
Represented By: Sybil Lee Renick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juul Labs, Inc.
Represented By: Peter C. Squeri
Represented By: Joshua Seth Lipshutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coalition For Reasonable Vaping Regulation
Represented By: James Ross Sutton
Represented By: Bradley William Hertz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvadora Correa
Represented By: Aaron D. Kaufmann
Represented By: Giselle Olmedo
Represented By: George Alejandro Warner
Represented By: Carole Vigne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luz Perez Bautista
Represented By: Aaron D. Kaufmann
Represented By: Giselle Olmedo
Represented By: George Alejandro Warner
Represented By: Carole Vigne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria de la Luz Perez Bautista
Represented By: Aaron D. Kaufmann
Represented By: Giselle Olmedo
Represented By: George Alejandro Warner
Represented By: Carole Vigne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?