Paxton et al v. Quinlan, et al
Appellant: John Charles Paxton and Elizabeth O. Paxton
Appellee: James B. Kraus, Dillingham & Murphy, LLP., Andrew M. Zacks, Scott A. Freedman, Brendan Quinlan, William F. Murphy and Zacks Freedman & Patterson, P.C.
Case Number: 4:2020cv01655
Filed: March 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton denying #6 Motion to Stay. (pjhlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2020)
June 15, 2020 Filing 12 Appellee's BRIEF Appellant Reply Brief due by 7/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Creason, J.) (Filed on 6/15/2020)
June 15, 2020 Filing 11 Appellee's BRIEF Appellant Reply Brief due by 7/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Romeo, Mark) (Filed on 6/15/2020)
May 29, 2020 Filing 10 Proposed Order re #8 Opposition/Response to Motion, #6 MOTION to Stay re #4 Appellant's Brief, Appellants Motion to Suspend Proceedings in Bankruptcy Court by Elizabeth O. Paxton, John Charles Paxton. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Michel, James) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 26, 2020 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Entities by Elizabeth O. Paxton, John Charles Paxton (Michel, James) (Filed on 5/26/2020)
May 26, 2020 Filing 8 JOINT RESPONSE (re #6 MOTION to Stay re #4 Appellant's Brief, Appellants Motion to Suspend Proceedings in Bankruptcy Court ) filed byDillingham & Murphy, LLP., Scott A. Freedman, James B. Kraus, William F. Murphy, Brendan Quinlan, Andrew M. Zacks, Zacks Freedman & Patterson, P.C.. (Romeo, Mark) (Filed on 5/26/2020) Modified on 5/27/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
May 26, 2020 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Entities by Scott A. Freedman, James B. Kraus, Andrew M. Zacks, Zacks Freedman & Patterson, P.C. (Romeo, Mark) (Filed on 5/26/2020)
May 19, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay re #4 Appellant's Brief, Appellants Motion to Suspend Proceedings in Bankruptcy Court filed by Elizabeth O. Paxton, John Charles Paxton. Responses due by 5/26/2020. Replies due by 6/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order Awarding Damages, entered 02/12/2020, #2 Exhibit 2 - Judgment, entered 02/19/2020, #3 Exhibit 3 - Order to Show Cause, entered 02/28/2020, #4 Exhibit 4 - Order Denying Relief from Order Awarding Damages and Judgment, entered 03/03/2020, #5 Exhibit 5 - Tentative Ruling on Order to Show Cause, entered 05/12/2020, #6 Exhibit 6 - Order Following Hearing on Order to Show Cause, entered 05/14/2020)(Michel, James) (Filed on 5/19/2020)
May 15, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION Motion for Judicial Notice re #4 Appellant's Brief, filed by Elizabeth O. Paxton, John Charles Paxton. Responses due by 5/22/2020. Replies due by 5/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Michel, James) (Filed on 5/15/2020)
May 15, 2020 Filing 4 Appellant's BRIEF Appellee Brief due by 6/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Excerpts Vol 1, #2 Appendix Excerpts Vol 2, #3 Appendix Excerpts Vol 3, #4 Appendix Excerpts Vol 4, #5 Appendix Excerpts Vol 5, #6 Appendix Excerpts Vol 6, #7 Appendix Excerpts Vol 7, #8 Appendix Excerpts Vol 8)(Michel, James) (Filed on 5/15/2020)
April 15, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF USBC RECORD ON APPEAL: Bankruptcy Record on Appeal is Available Electronically at https://ecf.canb.uscourts.gov/. The Record on Appeal was docketed in three parts at BK docket entries 203, 231 and 232. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2020)
March 6, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - Bankruptcy Case (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2020)
March 6, 2020 Filing 1 CERTIFICATE OF USBC RECORD ON APPEAL: Bankruptcy Record on Appeal is Available Electronically at https://ecf.canb.uscourts.gov/ by Elizabeth O. Paxton, John Charles Paxton. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 BK Docket Sheet)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paxton et al v. Quinlan, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: John Charles Paxton
Represented By: James Anthony Michel
Represented By: Martha Jill Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Elizabeth O. Paxton
Represented By: James Anthony Michel
Represented By: Martha Jill Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: James B. Kraus
Represented By: Mark Joseph Romeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Dillingham & Murphy, LLP.
Represented By: William Francis Murphy
Represented By: J. Cross Creason, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Andrew M. Zacks
Represented By: Mark Joseph Romeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Scott A. Freedman
Represented By: Mark Joseph Romeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Brendan Quinlan
Represented By: William Francis Murphy
Represented By: J. Cross Creason, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: William F. Murphy
Represented By: William Francis Murphy
Represented By: J. Cross Creason, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Zacks Freedman & Patterson, P.C.
Represented By: Mark Joseph Romeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?