Sutter Hill Ventures v. Sutter Rock Capital Corp.
Plaintiff: Sutter Hill Ventures
Defendant: Sutter Rock Capital Corp.
Case Number: 4:2020cv01775
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2020 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Entities and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sutter Hill Ventures identifying Other Affiliate Michael Speiser, Other Affiliate William Bull, Other Affiliate Sutter Hill Management Co., LLC, Other Affiliate Chris Basso, Other Affiliate Brian Blond, Other Affiliate Stefan Dyckerhoff, Other Affiliate Divanny Lamas, Other Affiliate Doug Mohr, Other Affiliate Chad Peets, Other Affiliate Sam Pullara, Other Affiliate Andy Sheehan, Other Affiliate Jim White for Sutter Hill Ventures. (Harrington, Kelley) (Filed on 3/26/2020) Modified on 3/27/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for June 23, 2020, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by June 16th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:20-cv-01775-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2020)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Signed by the Clerk on 03/25/2020. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2020)
March 25, 2020 Filing 6 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Trademark (cc: form to register). (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2020) Modified on 3/25/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
March 24, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2020)
March 23, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sutter Hill Ventures.. (Crittenden, John) (Filed on 3/23/2020)
March 13, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/9/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/16/2020 01:30 PM. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2020)
March 13, 2020 #Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Angela Lucille Dunning and Kelley B. Harrington. The docket shows a different address from what is appearing on #1 Complaint. Please update your personal profile on ECF. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2020)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/26/2020. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2020)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for (1) Federal Trademark Infringement Under 15 U.S.C. Section 1114; (2) Unfair Competition and False Designation of Origin Under 15 U.S.C. Section 1125; (3) Unfair Competition Under Cal. Bus. & Prof. Code Section 17200; and (4) Common Law Trademark Infringement against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14273840.). Filed bySutter Hill Ventures. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Crittenden, John) (Filed on 3/12/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sutter Hill Ventures v. Sutter Rock Capital Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sutter Hill Ventures
Represented By: John W. Crittenden
Represented By: Angela Lucille Dunning
Represented By: Kelley B Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sutter Rock Capital Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?