Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company v. The Continental Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: The Continental Insurance Company and National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford
Case Number: 4:2020cv02046
Filed: March 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY (re #14 MOTION to Dismiss), filed by National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford, The Continental Insurance Company. (Tafe, Edward) (Filed on 5/13/2020) Modified on 5/14/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
May 6, 2020 Filing 17 HALLMARK SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S OPPOSITION TO #14 MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF HALLMARK SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS)(Morison, William) (Filed on 5/6/2020) Modified on 5/7/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 22, 2020 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Entities by National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford, The Continental Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Continental Corporation, Corporate Parent CNA Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent Loews Corporation, Corporate Parent Continental Casualty Company for National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford, The Continental Insurance Company. (Tafe, Edward) (Filed on 4/22/2020) Modified on 4/23/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 22, 2020 Filing 15 Request for Judicial Notice re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed byNational Fire Insurance Company of Hartford, The Continental Insurance Company. (Related document(s) #14 ) (Tafe, Edward) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
April 22, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford, The Continental Insurance Company. Motion Hearing set for 5/28/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 5/6/2020. Replies due by 5/13/2020. (Tafe, Edward) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
April 7, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2020)
April 6, 2020 Filing 12 Proposed Summons. (Morison, William) (Filed on 4/6/2020)
April 6, 2020 Filing 11 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: (1) INDEMNIFICATION (2) UNJUST ENRICHMENT (with jury demand) against The Continental Insurance Company and National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford. Filed by Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Morison, William) (Filed on 4/6/2020) Modified on 4/7/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2020 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Entities by Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent American Hallmark Insurance Company of Texas, Corporate Parent Hallmark Financial Services, Inc. for Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company. (Morison, William) (Filed on 3/25/2020) Modified on 3/26/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2020 Filing 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/16/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/23/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2020)
March 25, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents . Re: #4 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2020)
March 25, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to The Continental Insurance Company. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2020)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case.. Signed by the Clerk on 03/25/2020. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2020)
March 24, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2020)
March 24, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company.. (Morison, William) (Filed on 3/24/2020)
March 24, 2020 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company (Morison, William) (Filed on 3/24/2020)
March 24, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/7/2020. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2020)
March 24, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Morison, William) (Filed on 3/24/2020)
March 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against The Continental Insurance Company. $400.00 filing fee paid, Receipt No. 0971-14309545. Filed by Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Morison, William) (Filed on 3/24/2020) Modified on 3/25/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company v. The Continental Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hallmark Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: William Campbell Morison
Represented By: Henry Ming-Cheng Su
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Continental Insurance Company
Represented By: Edward James Tafe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Fire Insurance Company of Hartford
Represented By: Edward James Tafe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?