Winant et al v. General Electric Company et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Winant and Diane Winant
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC (fka Foster Wheeler Corporation), IMO Industries Inc., Dixie Packing & Gasket Company, Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, John Crane, Inc., Crane Co., General Electric Company, Asbestos Corporation Limited, Electrolux Home Products, Inc., Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, VIAD CORP, Hopeman Brothers, Inc., CBS Corporation (fka Viacom Inc., fka Westinghouse Electric Corporation), Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Foster Wheeler LLC, CBS Corporation, Viacom Inc., Foster Wheeler Corporation and Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Case Number: 4:2020cv02189
Filed: March 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER ON DEFENDANT JOHN CRANE INC'S MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER FRCP 12(B)(6). Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/29/20. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2020) Modified on 5/29/2020 (jswlc3S, COURT STAFF).
May 28, 2020 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Xiao Jing Diego Wu Min (Wu Min, Xiao Jing) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 28, 2020 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by James G Scadden (Scadden, James) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 26, 2020 Filing 64 Certificate of Interested Entities by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Buffalo Pumps Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual, Corporate Parent Utica National Insurance Group, Corporate Parent Resolute Management Inc., Corporate Parent Firemans Fund for Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Powell, Glen) (Filed on 5/26/2020)
May 26, 2020 Filing 63 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byAir & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Powell, Glen) (Filed on 5/26/2020)
May 26, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] Certificate of Interested Entities and Corporate Disclosure Statement Must be File Separately. This filing will not be pr ocessed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety Re: ONLY #62 -1 Certificate of Interested Entities and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Parker-Hannifin Corporation. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2020)
May 22, 2020 Filing 62 ANSWER to Complaint byParker-Hannifin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Disclosure Statement and Certification of Interested Parties, #2 Proof of Service)(Adams, Joseph) (Filed on 5/22/2020)
May 21, 2020 Filing 61 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint to Add Defendant filed by Diane Winant, Thomas Winant. Motion Hearing set for 7/10/2020 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 6/4/2020. Replies due by 6/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Donadio, David) (Filed on 5/21/2020) Modified on 5/22/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2020 Filing 60 Defendant Crane Co.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants byCrane Co.. (Davis, Geoffrey) (Filed on 5/20/2020)
May 14, 2020 Filing 59 Statement of Non-Opposition re #26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Procedure 12(B)(2) filed byThomas Winant. (Related document(s) #26 ) (Donadio, David) (Filed on 5/14/2020)
May 11, 2020 Filing 58 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS Corporation identifying Corporate Parent ViacomCBS, Inc., Other Affiliate National Amusement, Inc., Other Affiliate Viacom Inc., fka Westinghouse Electric Corporation for CBS Corporation. (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 11, 2020 Filing 57 Certificate of Interested Entities and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hopeman Brothers, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Cross, Reno) (Filed on 5/11/2020) Modified on 5/12/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 11, 2020 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Reno Cross (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Cross, Reno) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 11, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents Re: #52 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by CBS Corporation. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2020)
May 8, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Elizabeth Anselmo on behalf of Defendant ViacomCBS, Inc. (Anselmo, Emily) (Filed on 5/8/2020)
May 8, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Paige Gardiner on behalf of Defendant ViacomCBS, Inc. (Gardiner, Katherine) (Filed on 5/8/2020)
May 8, 2020 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles T. Sheldon on behalf of Defendant ViacomCBS, Inc. (Sheldon, Charles) (Filed on 5/8/2020)
May 8, 2020 Filing 52 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS Corporation (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 5/8/2020)
May 8, 2020 Filing 51 Certificate of Interested Entities by CBS Corporation (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 5/8/2020)
May 8, 2020 Filing 50 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byCBS Corporation. (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 5/8/2020)
May 8, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek S. Johnson on behalf of Defendant ViacomCBS, Inc. (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 5/8/2020)
May 6, 2020 Filing 48 ANSWER to Complaint byHopeman Brothers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Cross, Reno) (Filed on 5/6/2020)
May 6, 2020 Filing 47 Certificate of Interested Entities by Electrolux Home Products, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate AB Electrolux, Other Affiliate Electrolux Holdings, Inc. for Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (Gage, Nicole) (Filed on 5/6/2020)
April 30, 2020 Filing 46 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Crane Co. to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint filed by Crane Co., Thomas Winant, Diane Winant. (Davis, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/30/2020) Modified on 4/30/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 28, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Alan Steig (Steig, Thomas) (Filed on 4/28/2020)
April 28, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy David Milbrodt (Milbrodt, Jeremy) (Filed on 4/28/2020)
April 28, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Carla Lynn Crochet (Crochet, Carla) (Filed on 4/28/2020)
April 28, 2020 Filing 42 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ingersoll-Rand Company identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll-Rand PLC for Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 4/28/2020)
April 28, 2020 Filing 41 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byIngersoll-Rand Company. (Galfayan, Arpi) (Filed on 4/28/2020)
April 28, 2020 Filing 40 Certificate of Interested Entities by Foster Wheeler LLC identifying Corporate Parent Amec Foster Wheeler plc for Foster Wheeler LLC. (Park, Charles) (Filed on 4/28/2020)
April 28, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Elizabeth Anselmo on behalf of Defendant General Electric Company (Anselmo, Emily) (Filed on 4/28/2020)
April 28, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Paige Gardiner on behalf of Defendant General Electric Company (Gardiner, Katherine) (Filed on 4/28/2020)
April 28, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles T. Sheldon on behalf of Defendant General Electric Company (Sheldon, Charles) (Filed on 4/28/2020)
April 28, 2020 Filing 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 4/28/2020)
April 28, 2020 Filing 35 Certificate of Interested Entities by General Electric Company (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 4/28/2020)
April 28, 2020 Filing 34 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byGeneral Electric Company. (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 4/28/2020)
April 28, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek S. Johnson on behalf of Defendant General Electric Company (Johnson, Derek) (Filed on 4/28/2020)
April 28, 2020 Filing 32 DEFENDANT THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANYS ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byThe Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Young, Kristi) (Filed on 4/28/2020)
April 28, 2020 Filing 31 Certificate of Interested Entities by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company identifying Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group for The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Young, Kristi) (Filed on 4/28/2020)
April 28, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristi L.K. Young BY DEFENDANT THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY (Young, Kristi) (Filed on 4/28/2020)
April 28, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Anne Cormier BY DEFENDANT THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY (Cormier, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/28/2020)
April 28, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. I.E. Amec Foster Wheeler plc. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #28 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Foster Wheeler LLC. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2020)
April 27, 2020 Filing 28 ***DOCKETING ERROR, DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED*** Certificate of Interested Entities by Foster Wheeler LLC identifying Corporate Parent DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLCS, Corporate Parent DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLCS for Foster Wheeler LLC. (Park, Charles) (Filed on 4/27/2020) Modified on 4/28/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2020 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint byElectrolux Home Products, Inc.. (Gage, Nicole) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
April 27, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by John Crane, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/5/2020 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 5/11/2020. Replies due by 5/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF CARRIE LIN IN SUPPORT OF SPECIALLY-APPEARING DEFENDANT JOHN CRANE INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. PROCEDURE 12(B)(2), #2 Proposed Order)(Lin, Carrie) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
April 27, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents . Re: #24 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Foster Wheeler LLC. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
April 24, 2020 Filing 25 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Foster Wheeler LLC.. (Park, Charles) (Filed on 4/24/2020)
April 24, 2020 Filing 24 ***DOCKETING ERROR, DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED*** Certificate of Interested Entities by Foster Wheeler LLC (FED. R. CIV. P. 7.1; NDCA L.R. 3-15) (Park, Charles) (Filed on 4/24/2020) Modified on 4/28/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 24, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles S. Park DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLCS (Park, Charles) (Filed on 4/24/2020)
April 24, 2020 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Foster Wheeler LLC (Park, Charles) (Filed on 4/24/2020)
April 24, 2020 Filing 21 DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLCS ANSWER to Complaint FOR ASBESTOS PERSONAL INJURY/PRODUCTS LIABILITY/LOSS OF CONSORTIUM byFoster Wheeler LLC. (Park, Charles) (Filed on 4/24/2020)
April 21, 2020 Filing 20 Certificate of Interested Entities by IMO Industries Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation, Corporate Parent Colfax Fluid Handling LLC, Corporate Parent IMO Holdings Inc for IMO Industries Inc.. (Bailey, Bobbie) (Filed on 4/21/2020)
April 21, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance of Frederick W. Gatt and Olga G. Pena by Bobbie Rae Bailey. (Bailey, Bobbie) (Filed on 4/21/2020) Modified on 4/22/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 21, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint byIMO Industries Inc.. (Bailey, Bobbie) (Filed on 4/21/2020)
April 21, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents (MetLife, Inc.) Re: #17 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2020)
April 20, 2020 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Metropolitan Life Insurance Company for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Aspericueta, Erika) (Filed on 4/20/2020)
April 20, 2020 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Entities by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Aspericueta, Erika) (Filed on 4/20/2020) Modified on 4/21/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 20, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byMetropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Aspericueta, Erika) (Filed on 4/20/2020)
April 20, 2020 Filing 14 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by VIAD CORP identifying Other Affiliate Blackrock, inc for VIAD CORP. (Davis, Whitney) (Filed on 4/20/2020)
April 20, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents . Re: #11 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by VIAD CORP. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2020)
April 17, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Whitney A. Davis (Davis, Whitney) (Filed on 4/17/2020)
April 17, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by VIAD CORP.. (Davis, Whitney) (Filed on 4/17/2020)
April 17, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by VIAD CORP. (Davis, Whitney) (Filed on 4/17/2020) Modified on 4/20/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 17, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND byVIAD CORP. (Davis, Whitney) (Filed on 4/17/2020)
April 3, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Joy Wai Jun Chu (Chu, Kimberly) (Filed on 4/3/2020)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 4/2/20. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Asbestos Corporation Limited, CBS Corporation, Crane Co., Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc., Dixie Packing & Gasket Company, Inc., Electrolux Home Products, Inc., Foster Wheeler LLC, General Electric Company, Hopeman Brothers, Inc., IMO Industries Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, John Crane, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, VIAD CORP. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 7/3/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/10/2020 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 1, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Jeffrey S. White. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2020)
March 31, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Donadio, David) (Filed on 3/31/2020)
March 31, 2020 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Thomas Winant.. (Donadio, David) (Filed on 3/31/2020)
March 31, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Thomas Winant (Donadio, David) (Filed on 3/31/2020)
March 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Asbestos Personal Injury/Products Liability/Loss of Consortium; Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14330067.). Filed byDiane Winant, Thomas Winant. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Donadio, David) (Filed on 3/31/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winant et al v. General Electric Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC (fka Foster Wheeler Corporation)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries Inc.
Represented By: Olga Guadalupe Pena
Represented By: Frederick W. Gatt
Represented By: Bobbie Rae Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dixie Packing & Gasket Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Thomas Alan Steig
Represented By: Arpi Galfayan
Represented By: Jeremy David Milbrodt
Represented By: Carla Lynn Crochet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: Jennifer Anne Cormier
Represented By: Kristi L.K. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane, Inc.
Represented By: Carrie S. Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Geoffrey M Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Emily Elizabeth Anselmo
Represented By: Katherine Paige Gardiner
Represented By: Derek S. Johnson
Represented By: Charles T. Sheldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asbestos Corporation Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Represented By: Lance Douglas Wilson
Represented By: Nicole Elisabet Gage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker-Hannifin Corporation
Represented By: Joseph Blaise Adams
Represented By: Marte J. Bassi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: James G Scadden
Represented By: Glen R. Powell
Represented By: Xiao Jing Diego Wu Min
Represented By: Michael J. Pietrykowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIAD CORP
Represented By: Whitney A. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopeman Brothers, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Blaise Adams
Represented By: Jonathan Eric Meislin
Represented By: Robert Stanley Kraft
Represented By: John Edward Rosenthal
Represented By: Reno Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation (fka Viacom Inc., fka Westinghouse Electric Corporation)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Erika Aspericueta
Represented By: Steven John Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Represented By: Edward R. Hugo
Represented By: Charles S. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Emily Elizabeth Anselmo
Represented By: Katherine Paige Gardiner
Represented By: Derek S. Johnson
Represented By: Charles T. Sheldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom Inc.
Represented By: Emily Elizabeth Anselmo
Represented By: Katherine Paige Gardiner
Represented By: Derek S. Johnson
Represented By: Charles T. Sheldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Corporation
Represented By: Edward R. Hugo
Represented By: Charles S. Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: Emily Elizabeth Anselmo
Represented By: Katherine Paige Gardiner
Represented By: Derek S. Johnson
Represented By: Charles T. Sheldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Winant
Represented By: David R. Donadio
Represented By: Kimberly Joy Wai Jun Chu
Represented By: Alan R. Brayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Winant
Represented By: David R. Donadio
Represented By: Kimberly Joy Wai Jun Chu
Represented By: Alan R. Brayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?