Earth Island Institute v. Crystal Geyser Water Company et al
Plaintiff: Earth Island Institute
Defendant: Nestle USA, Inc., PepsiCo, Inc., Danone North America, Crystal Geyser Water Company, Colgate-Palmolive Company, The Procter & Gamble Company, Mars, Incorporated, The Coca-Cola Company, The Clorox Company and Mondelez International, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv02212
Filed: April 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Referring Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER (as modified) by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #72 Stipulation REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFF EARTH ISLAND INSTITUTE'S #69 MOTION TO REMAND. Responses due by 6/8/2020; Replies due by 7/1/2020 and Motion Hearing set for 7/16/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (Disregard Docket No. #73 ). Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 5/29/2020. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2020)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 DISREGARD, SEE DOCKET NO. #74 . ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #72 Stipulation REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFF EARTH ISLAND INSTITUTE'S MOTION TO REMAND. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2020) Modified on 5/29/2020 (ndrS, COURT STAFF).
May 28, 2020 Filing 72 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFF EARTH ISLAND INSTITUTE'S MOTION TO REMAND re #69 Motion to Remand, filed by PepsiCo, Inc., Colgate-Palmolive Company, Crystal Geyser Water Company, Danone North America, Earth Island Institute, Mars, Incorporated, Mondelez International, Inc., Nestle USA, Inc., The Clorox Company, The Coca-Cola Company, The Proctor & Gamble Company. (Tulumello, Andrew) (Filed on 5/28/2020) Modified on 5/29/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #70 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Metcalf, Jane. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2020)
May 18, 2020 Filing 70 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Jane Metcalf ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14479248.) filed by The Coca-Cola Company. (Metcalf, Jane) (Filed on 5/18/2020) Modified on 5/19/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2020 Filing 69 MOTION to Remand filed by Earth Island Institute. Motion Hearing set for 7/9/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 5/15/2020. Replies due by 5/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 5/1/2020)
May 1, 2020 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance of Eric James Buescher as Counsel, filed by Earth Island Institute (Buescher, Eric) (Filed on 5/1/2020) Modified on 5/4/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting #66 Stipulation Regarding Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff Earth Island Institute's Motion to Remand. Motions due by 5/1/2020; Responses due by 6/1/2020 and Replies due by 6/22/2020. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2020)
April 30, 2020 Filing 66 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff Earth Island Institute's Motion to Remand, filed by Colgate-Palmolive Company, Crystal Geyser Water Company, Danone North America, Earth Island Institute, Mars, Incorporated, Mondelez International, Inc., Nestle USA, Inc., PepsiCo, Inc., The Clorox Company, The Coca-Cola Company, The Procter & Gamble Company (Tulumello, Andrew) (Filed on 4/30/2020) Modified on 5/1/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
April 17, 2020 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance of Allexanderia V. Bingham as Counsel, filed by Danone North America (Bingham, Allexanderia) (Filed on 4/17/2020) Modified on 4/20/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
April 17, 2020 Filing 64 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for July 7. 2020, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by June 30th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:20-cv-02212-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2020)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by The Clerk on 4/17/20. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2020)
April 16, 2020 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance of Gregory George Sperla as Counsel, filed by Danone North Amercia (Sperla, Gregory) (Filed on 4/16/2020) Modified on 4/17/2020 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
April 16, 2020 Filing 61 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2020)
April 15, 2020 Filing 60 Certificate of Interested Entities by Earth Island Institute (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 4/15/2020)
April 15, 2020 Filing 59 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Earth Island Institute (Molumphy, Mark) (Filed on 4/15/2020)
April 15, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Noorjahan Rahman (Rahman, Noorjahan) (Filed on 4/15/2020)
April 15, 2020 Filing 57 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by PepsiCo, Inc... (Tulumello, Andrew) (Filed on 4/15/2020)
April 10, 2020 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Trice on Behalf of Defendant The Coca-Cola Company (Trice, Brandon) (Filed on 4/10/2020)
April 10, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven A. Zalesin on Behalf of Defendant The Coca-Cola Company (Zalesin, Steven) (Filed on 4/10/2020)
April 6, 2020 Filing 54 Certificate of Interested Entities by Crystal Geyser Water Company identifying Corporate Parent Otsuka America, Inc., Other Affiliate Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Otsuka Holdings Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Sampo America Insurance Company for Crystal Geyser Water Company. (Tatro, Rene) (Filed on 4/6/2020)
April 6, 2020 Filing 53 STIPULATION Extending Time for Defendant Mondelez Global LLC, erroneously sued as Mondelez International, Inc., to Respond to [2-2] Complaint filed by PepsiCo, Inc. filed by Mondelez International, Inc.. (Goodman, Mark) (Filed on 4/6/2020)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #47 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (sklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2020)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #46 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (sklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2020)
April 6, 2020 #Electronic filing error re: #48 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Crystal Geyser Water Company. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this d ocument in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2020)
April 3, 2020 Filing 50 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to [2-2] Complaint filed by PepsiCo, Inc.. (Tulumello, Andrew) (Filed on 4/3/2020)
April 3, 2020 Filing 49 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mondelez International, Inc. re #25 Certificate of Interested Entities, #11 Notice of Appearance, #12 Notice of Appearance, #24 Certificate of Interested Entities (Assayag, Anne) (Filed on 4/3/2020)
April 3, 2020 Filing 48 Certificate of Interested Entities by Crystal Geyser Water Company (Tatro, Rene) (Filed on 4/3/2020)
April 3, 2020 #Electronic filing error re: #34 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Crystal Geyser Water Company. Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this d ocument in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2020)
April 3, 2020 Filing 47 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14340988.) filed by The Coca-Cola Company. (Trice, Brandon) (Filed on 4/3/2020)
April 3, 2020 Filing 46 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14340968.) filed by The Coca-Cola Company. (Zalesin, Steven) (Filed on 4/3/2020)
April 3, 2020 Filing 45 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Procter & Gamble Company (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 4/3/2020)
April 3, 2020 Filing 44 Certificate of Interested Entities by The Procter & Gamble Company (Kiernan, David) (Filed on 4/3/2020)
April 3, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Juliet Arlene Markowitz (Markowitz, Juliet) (Filed on 4/3/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nestle USA, Inc. re #26 Notice of Appearance (Jura, Perlette) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nestle USA, Inc. re #15 Certificate of Interested Entities, #13 Notice of Appearance, #14 Notice of Appearance (Jura, Perlette) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PepsiCo, Inc. re 3 Case Assigned by Intake,,, (Tulumello, Andrew) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PepsiCo, Inc. re #4 Notice (Other) Filing Notice of Removal of Action With State Court (Tulumello, Andrew) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Colgate-Palmolive Company re #17 Certificate of Interested Entities, #19 Notice of Appearance, #16 Notice of Appearance, #18 Certificate of Interested Entities (Sestito, Dawn) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PepsiCo, Inc. re #2 Notice of Removal,, #1 Certificate of Interested Entities (Tulumello, Andrew) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Danone North America identifying Corporate Parent Danone, S.A. for Danone North America. (Agrusa, Angela) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Rene Pierre Tatro (Tatro, Rene) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 34 Certificate of Interested Entities by Crystal Geyser Water Company (Tatro, Rene) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 33 Certificate of Interested Entities by Danone North America identifying Other Affiliate Danone US, LLC, Other Affiliate WWF Operating Company, LLC for Danone North America. (Agrusa, Angela) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Coca-Cola Company (Lafayette, Gary) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 31 Certificate of Interested Entities by The Coca-Cola Company (Lafayette, Gary) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary T. Lafayette (Lafayette, Gary) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Angela Christine Agrusa (Agrusa, Angela) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by George J. Gigounas (Gigounas, George) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 27 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/29/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/6/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Joseph Hamburger for Nestle USA, Inc. (Hamburger, Bradley) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mondelez International, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Mondelez Global LLC for Mondelez International, Inc.. (Goodman, Mark) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 24 Certificate of Interested Entities by Mondelez International, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Mondelez Global LLC for Mondelez International, Inc.. (Goodman, Mark) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mars, Incorporated (Horniak, David) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 22 Certificate of Interested Entities by Mars, Incorporated (Horniak, David) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by David Michael Horniak (Horniak, David) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen David Raber (Raber, Stephen) (Filed on 4/2/2020)
April 1, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Blair Goetz for Defendant Colgate-Palmolive Company (Goetz, Richard) (Filed on 4/1/2020)
April 1, 2020 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Colgate-Palmolive Company (Sestito, Dawn) (Filed on 4/1/2020)
April 1, 2020 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Entities by Colgate-Palmolive Company (Sestito, Dawn) (Filed on 4/1/2020)
April 1, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Dawn Sestito for Defendant Colgate-Palmolive Company (Sestito, Dawn) (Filed on 4/1/2020)
April 1, 2020 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nestle USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Nestle Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Nestle S.A., Other Affiliate NIMCO US, Inc., Other Affiliate Nestle US Holdco, Inc., Other Affiliate Societe des Produits Nestle S.A. for Nestle USA, Inc.. (Jura, Perlette) (Filed on 4/1/2020)
April 1, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Perlette Michele Jura for Nestle USA, Inc. (Jura, Perlette) (Filed on 4/1/2020)
April 1, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr for Nestle USA, Inc. (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 4/1/2020)
April 1, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Kelts Assayag as counsel for Defendant Mondelez Global LLC, erroneously sued as Mondelez International, Inc. (Assayag, Anne) (Filed on 4/1/2020)
April 1, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Craig Goodman as counsel for Defendant Mondelez Global LLC, erroneously sued as Mondelez International, Inc. (Goodman, Mark) (Filed on 4/1/2020)
April 1, 2020 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Entities by The Clorox Company (Alexander, Mary) (Filed on 4/1/2020)
April 1, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Clorox Company (Alexander, Mary) (Filed on 4/1/2020)
April 1, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Danielle Lankenau on behalf of The Clorox Company (Lankenau, Shannon) (Filed on 4/1/2020)
April 1, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Mont Howard on behalf of The Clorox Company (Howard, Robert) (Filed on 4/1/2020)
April 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Tough on behalf of The Clorox Company (Tough, Margaret) (Filed on 4/1/2020)
April 1, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Rose Alexander on behalf of The Clorox Company (Alexander, Mary) (Filed on 4/1/2020)
April 1, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by PepsiCo, Inc. re #2 Notice of Removal,, Filing Notice of Removal of Action With State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Tulumello, Andrew) (Filed on 4/1/2020)
April 1, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/15/2020. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2020)
April 1, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14333093) from Superior Court of California, Cty of San Mateo. Their case number is 20-CIV-01213. (). Filed byPepsiCo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of C. Chapla, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tulumello, Andrew) (Filed on 4/1/2020)
April 1, 2020 Filing 1 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PepsiCo, Inc. (and Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons) (Tulumello, Andrew) (Filed on 4/1/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Earth Island Institute v. Crystal Geyser Water Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nestle USA, Inc.
Represented By: Perlette Michele Jura
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: Bradley Joseph Hamburger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PepsiCo, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Santo Tulumello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danone North America
Represented By: Angela Christine Agrusa
Represented By: Allexanderia V. Bingham
Represented By: George J. Gigounas
Represented By: Gregory George Sperla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Geyser Water Company
Represented By: Rene Pierre Tatro
Represented By: Juliet Arlene Markowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colgate-Palmolive Company
Represented By: Richard Blair Goetz
Represented By: Dawn Sestito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Procter & Gamble Company
Represented By: David Craig Kiernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mars, Incorporated
Represented By: David Michael Horniak
Represented By: Stephen David Raber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Coca-Cola Company
Represented By: Steven A. Zalesin
Represented By: Brandon Trice
Represented By: Gary T. Lafayette
Represented By: Jane Marie Metcalf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Clorox Company
Represented By: Shannon Danielle Lankenau
Represented By: Mary Rose Alexander
Represented By: Margaret Tough
Represented By: Robert Mont Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mondelez International, Inc.
Represented By: Anne Kelts Assayag
Represented By: Mark Craig Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earth Island Institute
Represented By: Eric James Buescher
Represented By: Noorjahan Rahman
Represented By: Tyson Carl Redenbarger
Represented By: Tamarah P. Prevost
Represented By: Mark Cotton Molumphy
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?