Pacific Recovery Solutions et al v. United Behavioral Health et al
Plaintiff: MIRIAM HAMIDEH PHD CLINICAL PSYCHOLOGIST, INC., SUMMIT ESTATE INC., PACIFIC RECOVERY SOLUTIONS, BRIDGING THE GAPS, INC., Miriam Hamideh PhD Clinical Psychologist Inc., Miriam Hamideh PhD Clinical Psychologist Inc. doing business as PCI Westlake Centers, Summit Estate Inc. doing business as Summit Estate Outpatient and Pacific Recovery Solutions doing business as Westwind Recovery
Defendant: VIANT, INC. and United Behavioral Health
Case Number: 4:2020cv02249
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14512646.) filed by United Behavioral Health. (Lipton, Joshua) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 26, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re: Geoffrey M. Sigler ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14503770.) filed by United Behavioral Health. (Sigler, Geoffrey) (Filed on 5/26/2020) Modified on 5/27/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2020 Filing 28 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #27 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related Pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-11 ) filed byUnited Behavioral Health. (Blas, Lauren) (Filed on 5/21/2020)
May 18, 2020 Filing 27 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related Pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-11 filed by Bridging the Gaps, Inc., Miriam Hamideh PhD Clinical Psychologist Inc., Pacific Recovery Solutions, Summit Estate Inc.. Responses due by 5/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Lavin, Matthew) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 13, 2020 Filing 26 [Proposed] STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by United Behavioral Health, Pacific Recovery Solutions, Miriam Hamideh PhD Clinical Psychologist Inc., Summit Estate Inc., Bridging the Gaps, Inc., and Viant, Inc. (Blas, Lauren) (Filed on 5/13/2020) Modified on 5/14/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
May 12, 2020 Filing 25 Certificate of Interested Entities by United Behavioral Health identifying Corporate Parent UnitedHealth Group, Incorporated for United Behavioral Health. (Blas, Lauren) (Filed on 5/12/2020)
May 8, 2020 Filing 24 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Viant, Inc... (Arvidson, Carys) (Filed on 5/8/2020)
May 8, 2020 #Electronic filing error. No caption Page.. Please refer to Civil Local Rules 3-4 re first page requirement and re-file in its entirety. Re: #23 Summons Returned Executed filed by Summit Estate Inc., Bridging the Gaps, Inc., Miriam Hamideh PhD Clinical Psychologist Inc., Pacific Recovery Solutions (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2020)
May 7, 2020 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Summit Estate Inc., Pacific Recovery Solutions, Miriam Hamideh PhD Clinical Psychologist Inc., Bridging the Gaps, Inc.. Viant, Inc. served on 4/15/2020, answer due 5/6/2020. (Lavin, Matthew) (Filed on 5/7/2020)
May 6, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Carys Anne Arvidson (Arvidson, Carys) (Filed on 5/6/2020)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 05/05/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2020)
May 4, 2020 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2020)
May 1, 2020 Filing 19 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United Behavioral Health.. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 5/1/2020)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING re #16 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by United Behavioral Health. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/302020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2020)
April 30, 2020 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant Viant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 5/14/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2020)
April 29, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION to Extend Defendants' Time to Respond to Complaint filed by United Behavioral Health. (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
April 29, 2020 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant UBH shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 5/13/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2020)
April 28, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Lynn Richardson (Richardson, Heather) (Filed on 4/28/2020)
April 28, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Margaret Blas (Blas, Lauren) (Filed on 4/28/2020)
April 27, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Summit Estate Inc., Pacific Recovery Solutions, Miriam Hamideh PhD Clinical Psychologist Inc., Bridging the Gaps, Inc.. United Behavioral Health served on 4/14/2020, answer due 5/5/2020. (Lavin, Matthew) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
April 16, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bridging the Gaps, Inc., Miriam Hamideh PhD Clinical Psychologist Inc., Pacific Recovery Solutions, Summit Estate Inc... (Lilienstein, David) (Filed on 4/16/2020)
April 16, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Lilienstein (Lilienstein, David) (Filed on 4/16/2020)
April 16, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Katie Joy Spielman (Spielman, Katie) (Filed on 4/16/2020)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order, signed 4/15/2020, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Matthew Lanvin.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2020)
April 14, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14372699.) filed by Bridging the Gaps, Inc., Miriam Hamideh PhD Clinical Psychologist Inc., Pacific Recovery Solutions, Summit Estate Inc.. (Lavin, Matthew) (Filed on 4/14/2020)
April 6, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Viant, Inc.. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2020)
April 6, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to United Behavioral Health. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2020)
April 3, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Mitchell, Wendy) (Filed on 4/3/2020)
April 3, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/3/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/10/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2020)
April 3, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/17/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2020)
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United Behavioral Health, Viant, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14337953.). Filed by Summit Estate Inc., Pacific Recovery Solutions, Miriam Hamideh PHD Clinical Psychologist, Inc., Bridging The Gaps Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mitchell, Wendy) (Filed on 4/2/2020) Modified on 4/3/2020 (msrS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacific Recovery Solutions et al v. United Behavioral Health et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIRIAM HAMIDEH PHD CLINICAL PSYCHOLOGIST, INC.
Represented By: Wendy Aline Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUMMIT ESTATE INC.
Represented By: Wendy Aline Mitchell
Represented By: Matthew M. Lavin
Represented By: Katie Joy Spielman
Represented By: David M. Lilienstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PACIFIC RECOVERY SOLUTIONS
Represented By: Wendy Aline Mitchell
Represented By: Matthew M. Lavin
Represented By: Katie Joy Spielman
Represented By: David M. Lilienstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIDGING THE GAPS, INC.
Represented By: Wendy Aline Mitchell
Represented By: Matthew M. Lavin
Represented By: Katie Joy Spielman
Represented By: David M. Lilienstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miriam Hamideh PhD Clinical Psychologist Inc.
Represented By: Wendy Aline Mitchell
Represented By: Matthew M. Lavin
Represented By: Katie Joy Spielman
Represented By: David M. Lilienstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miriam Hamideh PhD Clinical Psychologist Inc. doing business as PCI Westlake Centers
Represented By: Wendy Aline Mitchell
Represented By: Matthew M. Lavin
Represented By: Katie Joy Spielman
Represented By: David M. Lilienstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summit Estate Inc. doing business as Summit Estate Outpatient
Represented By: Wendy Aline Mitchell
Represented By: Matthew M. Lavin
Represented By: Katie Joy Spielman
Represented By: David M. Lilienstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Recovery Solutions doing business as Westwind Recovery
Represented By: Wendy Aline Mitchell
Represented By: Matthew M. Lavin
Represented By: Katie Joy Spielman
Represented By: David M. Lilienstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIANT, INC.
Represented By: Carys Anne Arvidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Behavioral Health
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Sigler
Represented By: Lauren Margaret Blas
Represented By: Heather Lynn Richardson
Represented By: Joshua Lipton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?