Archer et al v. Carnival Corporation & PLC et al
Plaintiff: Michael R. Neky, Marlene Archer, Michael Guisti, Jacqueline Graham, Gina M. Pallota, Robert Graham, Pamela Guisti, Valerie Pasquini Willsea and Robert Archer
Defendant: Princess Cruise Lines Ltd., Fairline Shipping International Corporation, Ltd. and Carnival Corporation & PLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv02381
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Referring Judge: Phyllis J Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE : Case transferred from California Northern has been opened in CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA as case 2:20-cv-04203. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2020) Modified on 5/13/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
May 5, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION FOR TRANSFER OF VENUE OF ACTION AND DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT FAIRLINE SHIPPING INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, LTD. AND by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #10 Stipulation. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2020)
May 4, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER For Transfer of Action and Dismissal Without Prejudice of Claims Against Fairline Shipping International Corp., Ltd. filed by Marlene Archer, Robert Archer, Jacqueline Graham, Robert Graham, Michael Guisti, Pamela Guisti, Michael R. Neky, Gina M. Pallota, Valerie Pasquini Willsea, Princess Cruise Lines Ltd., Carnival Corporation & PLC. (Cabraser, Elizabeth) (Filed on 5/4/2020) Modified on 5/5/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE. Join Case Management Statement due by 7/9/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/16/2020 at 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/14/2020. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2020)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 04/14/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2020)
April 13, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2020)
April 13, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Marlene Archer, Robert Archer, Jacqueline Graham, Robert Graham, Michael Guisti, Pamela Guisti, Michael R. Neky, Gina M. Pallota, Valerie Pasquini Willsea.. (Alexander, Mary) (Filed on 4/13/2020)
April 9, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Carnival Corporation & PLC, Fairline Shipping International Corporation, Ltd., Princess Cruise Lines Ltd. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2020)
April 9, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/2/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/9/2020 01:30 PM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2020)
April 8, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/22/2020. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2020)
April 8, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Cabraser, Elizabeth) (Filed on 4/8/2020)
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14354902.). Filed byMichael Guisti, Jacqueline Graham, Valerie Pasquini Willsea, Gina M. Pallota, Marlene Archer, Michael R. Neky, Robert Archer, Robert Graham, Pamela Guisti. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cabraser, Elizabeth) (Filed on 4/8/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Archer et al v. Carnival Corporation & PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael R. Neky
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: Jonathan David Selbin
Represented By: Brendan D. S. Way
Represented By: Mary E. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlene Archer
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: Jonathan David Selbin
Represented By: Brendan D. S. Way
Represented By: Mary E. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Guisti
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: Jonathan David Selbin
Represented By: Brendan D. S. Way
Represented By: Mary E. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Graham
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: Jonathan David Selbin
Represented By: Brendan D. S. Way
Represented By: Mary E. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina M. Pallota
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: Jonathan David Selbin
Represented By: Brendan D. S. Way
Represented By: Mary E. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Graham
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: Jonathan David Selbin
Represented By: Brendan D. S. Way
Represented By: Mary E. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Guisti
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: Jonathan David Selbin
Represented By: Brendan D. S. Way
Represented By: Mary E. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Pasquini Willsea
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: Jonathan David Selbin
Represented By: Brendan D. S. Way
Represented By: Mary E. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Archer
Represented By: Elizabeth Joan Cabraser
Represented By: Jonathan David Selbin
Represented By: Brendan D. S. Way
Represented By: Mary E. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Princess Cruise Lines Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairline Shipping International Corporation, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carnival Corporation & PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?