Nguyen
Defendant: AJE Investment Group, LLC
Trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee / SF
Appellant: Phuong T. Nguyen
Case Number: 4:2020cv02668
Filed: April 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO PERFECT RECORD re #2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - Bankruptcy Case.Appellant shall designate the record and file a statement of issues to be presented in this appeal by June 5, 2020.Appellee shall file all cross designations to portions of the bankruptcy record on appeal and a statement of issues to be presented and within fourteen (14) days of appellants filing. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/15/2020. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
April 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Reilly Dennis Wilkinson (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Wilkinson, Reilly) (Filed on 4/24/2020)
April 17, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - Bankruptcy Case (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2020)
April 17, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - Bankruptcy Case. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2020)
April 17, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 20-30181-DM. File received. Filed byPhuong T. Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Court's Certificate of Mailing, #3 Docket Report, #4 Order Being Appealed)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee / SF
Represented By: Trevor Ross Fehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Phuong T. Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AJE Investment Group, LLC
Represented By: Reilly Dennis Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?