Cooks v. Contra Costa County
Plaintiff: Peter James Cooks
Defendant: Contra Costa County
Case Number: 4:2020cv02695
Filed: April 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J Hamilton
Referring Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED MOTION TO WAIVE FILING FEE by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #15 Motion to Waive Filing Fee. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2020)
May 20, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION Waiver of Filing Fee re Electronic Filing Error, #3 Notice (Other), #1 Complaint filed by Peter James Cooks. Responses due by 6/3/2020. Replies due by 6/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Amended Motion to Waive Filing Fee)(Cooks, Roderick) (Filed on 5/20/2020)
May 20, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Peter James Cooks re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certified Mail Receipt, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service Certified Mail Receipt)(Cooks, Roderick) (Filed on 5/20/2020)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/13/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/20/2020 at 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/18/2020. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 18, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] This filing will not be processed by the clerks office re #3 Motion to Waive Filing Fee filed by Peter James Cooks. Co rrect event is Motion and Related Filing > Motions - General > Miscellaneous Relief. Pursuant to Local Rule 7-2(c) each motion must be accompanied by a proposed order. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 18, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE. YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED that Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 11-3, counsel for plaintiff is reminded to submit the appropriate application to appear pro hac vice or otherwise demonstrate that they are admitted to practice before this court. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by The Clerk on 5/18/20. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 15, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2020)
May 15, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Peter James Cooks.. (Cooks, Roderick) (Filed on 5/15/2020)
May 13, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 5/27/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2020)
April 24, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Contra Costa County. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2020)
April 23, 2020 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Cooks, Roderick) (Filed on 4/23/2020)
April 20, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/10/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/17/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2020)
April 20, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/4/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2020)
April 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Peter James Cooks re #1 Complaint Motion to Waive Filing Fee (Cooks, Roderick) (Filed on 4/18/2020)
April 18, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Peter James Cooks . (Cooks, Roderick) (Filed on 4/18/2020)
April 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byPeter James Cooks. (Cooks, Roderick) (Filed on 4/18/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooks v. Contra Costa County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contra Costa County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter James Cooks
Represented By: Roderick Twain Cooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?