Wilson v. City of Walnut Creek et al
Plaintiff: Michael Geary Wilson
Defendant: City of Walnut Creek, Darryl R. Saffold, Sean Michael Conley, Gary Silva, Scott Brian Moorhouse and Thomas Edward Chaplin
Case Number: 4:2020cv02721
Filed: April 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION HEARING. You are hereby notified that the hearing re #12 Motion to Dismiss is VACATED. The matter is taken under submission on the papers. In the event that the court determines that oral argument is necessary, the court will issue a notice to the parties with instructions on the hearing procedure at a future date. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2020)
June 10, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT UNDER RULE 12(B)(6) filed by Thomas Edward Chaplin, City of Walnut Creek, Sean Michael Conley, Scott Brian Moorhouse, Darryl R. Saffold, Gary Silva. Motion Hearing set for 7/15/2020 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 6/24/2020. Replies due by 7/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Randolph S. Hom In Support of Defendants' MTD, #2 Proposed Order)(Hom, Randolph) (Filed on 6/10/2020) Modified on 6/11/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
May 22, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael Geary Wilson re #8 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, on all named DEFENDANTS (Wilson, Michael) (Filed on 5/22/2020)
May 21, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed Thomas Edward Chaplin served on 5/20/2020, answer due 6/10/2020; City of Walnut Creek served on 5/20/2020, answer due 6/10/2020; Sean Michael Conley served on 5/20/2020, answer due 6/10/2020; Scott Brian Moorhouse served on 5/20/2020, answer due 6/10/2020; Darryl R. Saffold served on 5/20/2020, answer due 6/10/2020; Gary Silva served on 5/20/2020, answer due 6/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 USM 285 - executed, #2 USM 285 - executed, #3 USM 285 - executed, #4 USM 285 - executed, #5 USM 285 - executed)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2020)
May 21, 2020 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #8 Summons Issued,. (Attachments: #1 Acknowledgment, #2 Acknowledgment, #3 Acknowledgment, #4 Acknowledgment, #5 Acknowledgment)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2020)
May 13, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Thomas Edward Chaplin, City of Walnut Creek, Sean Michael Conley, Scott Brian Moorhouse, Darryl R. Saffold, Gary Silva. (Attachments: #1 USM-285, #2 USM-285, #3 USM-285, #4 USM-285, #5 USM-285, #6 USM-285)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2020)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED AND ORDER DENYING MOTION by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton denying #4 Motion to Relate Case. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2020)
April 20, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/13/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/20/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2020)
April 20, 2020 Filing 4 WILSON'S ADMINSTRATIVE MOTION To Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Michael Geary Wilson. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2020)
April 20, 2020 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Michael Geary Wilson. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2020)
April 20, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Michael Geary Wilson. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2020)
April 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND OTHER RELIEF with Jury Demand against Thomas Edward Chaplin, City of Walnut Creek, Sean Michael Conley, Scott Brian Moorhouse, Darryl R. Saffold, Gary Silva. Filed by Michael Geary Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. City of Walnut Creek et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Walnut Creek
Represented By: Randolph S. Hom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darryl R. Saffold
Represented By: Randolph S. Hom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Michael Conley
Represented By: Randolph S. Hom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Silva
Represented By: Randolph S. Hom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Brian Moorhouse
Represented By: Randolph S. Hom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Edward Chaplin
Represented By: Randolph S. Hom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Geary Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?