Vizcarra v. Unilever United States, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lisa Vizcarra
Defendant: Unilever United States, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv02777
Filed: April 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2020 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING THE 6/16/2020 HEARING RE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT AT DKT. NO. 20. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2020)
June 10, 2020 Filing 21 Proposed Order re #20 MOTION for Leave to File Statement of Recent Decision by Unilever United States, Inc.. (Yoo, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/10/2020)
June 10, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Motion did not include a proposed order. Please file a proposed order using the proposed order event. Re: #20 MOTION for Leave to File Statement of Recent Decision filed by Unilever United States, Inc. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2020)
June 9, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to File Statement of Recent Decision filed by Unilever United States, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Statement of Recent Decision, #2 Exhibit Prescott v. Nestle - Order Granting Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint)(Yoo, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/9/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION AND VACATING HEARING. Notice is hereby given that the Court takes the pending #7 MOTION to Dismiss under submission. The hearing previously scheduled for 6/16/2020 at 2:00 p.m. is vacated. The Court will issue a written order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 1, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher A. Nedeau (Nedeau, Christopher) (Filed on 6/1/2020)
May 28, 2020 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Unilever United States, Inc.. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
May 27, 2020 Filing 16 Proposed Summons. (Sheehan, Spencer) (Filed on 5/27/2020)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Spencer Sheehan. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2020)
May 27, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Hyojoo Yoo CORRECTION OF DOCKET #12 (Yoo, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/27/2020)
May 27, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY (re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint ) filed byUnilever United States, Inc.. (Yoo, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/27/2020)
May 27, 2020 Filing 12 ***DISREGARD, RE-FILED AT DOCKET NO. #14 *** NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Hyojoo Yoo (Yoo, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/27/2020) Modified on 5/28/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
May 22, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]. Correct event is "proposed order." Event can be found under civil events > Other filings > Other documents > proposed order. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #11 Opposition/Response to Motion filed by Lisa Vizcarra (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2020)
May 21, 2020 Filing 11 Propose Order (re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint ) filed by Lisa Vizcarra. (Nam, Sue) (Filed on 5/21/2020) Modified on 5/22/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2020 Filing 10 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint ) filed byLisa Vizcarra. (Nam, Sue) (Filed on 5/20/2020)
May 20, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Sue Jung Nam (Nam, Sue) (Filed on 5/20/2020)
May 18, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14483083.) filed by Lisa Vizcarra. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit true and correct copy of a certificate of good standing)(Sheehan, Spencer) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 6, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Unilever United States, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/16/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 5/20/2020. Replies due by 5/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration of Courtney Ozer, #3 Exhibit 1 to Ozer Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 to Ozer Declaration, #5 Exhibit 3 to Ozer Declaration, #6 Proposed Order)(Swain, Philip) (Filed on 5/6/2020)
May 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip C. Swain (Swain, Philip) (Filed on 5/6/2020)
April 23, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/13/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/20/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2020) Modified on 4/23/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
April 22, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by Lisa Vizcarra . (Reese, Michael) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
April 22, 2020 #Electronic filing error. The Nature of Suit on the Civil Cover Sheet does not match your docket entry. Please resubmit with correct Nature of Suit. No judge assignment will be mad e until the document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re: #1 Complaint filed by Lisa Vizcarra (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2020)
April 21, 2020 Filing 2 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Lisa Vizcarra.. (Reese, Michael) (Filed on 4/21/2020)
April 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Unilever United States, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14397172.). Filed byLisa Vizcarra. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reese, Michael) (Filed on 4/21/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vizcarra v. Unilever United States, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unilever United States, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Hyojoo Yoo
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Represented By: Philip C. Swain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Vizcarra
Represented By: Michael Robert Reese
Represented By: Spencer Sheehan
Represented By: George Volney Granade
Represented By: Sue Jung Nam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?