Pazoki v. Wolf et al
Plaintiff: Mehdi Pazoki
Defendant: John Kramar, William P. Barr, Acting Director Kenneth T. Cuccinelli and Chad F. Wolf
Case Number: 4:2020cv03094
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2020 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to William P. Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, John Kramar, Chad F. Wolf, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2020)
June 18, 2020 Filing 16 Proposed Summons. (Yasrebi, Arash) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 18, 2020 Filing 15 Proposed Summons. (Yasrebi, Arash) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 18, 2020 Filing 14 Proposed Summons. (Yasrebi, Arash) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 17, 2020 #Electronic filing error. A maximum of THREE summons will be issued. Please list all defendants on ONE summons or multiple defendants on THREE summons and re-file in its entirety. Re: #13 Proposed Summons filed by Mehdi Pazoki, #12 Proposed Summons filed by Mehdi Pazoki, #9 Proposed Summons filed by Mehdi Pazoki, #11 Proposed Summons filed by Mehdi Pazoki, #10 Proposed Summons filed by Mehdi Pazoki (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 13 Proposed Summons. (Yasrebi, Arash) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 12 Proposed Summons. (Yasrebi, Arash) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 11 Proposed Summons. (Yasrebi, Arash) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 10 Proposed Summons. (Yasrebi, Arash) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. (Yasrebi, Arash) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 3, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] The correct event is Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. The correct event can be found at: Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #8 Notice (Other) filed by Mehdi Pazoki (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2020)
June 3, 2020 Filing 8 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mehdi Pazoki (Yasrebi, Arash) (Filed on 6/3/2020) Modified on 6/4/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
June 3, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byMehdi Pazoki. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits)(Yasrebi, Arash) (Filed on 6/3/2020)
May 20, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 6/3/2020. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2020)
May 6, 2020 Filing 5 Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2020)
May 6, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to William P. Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, John Kramar, Chad F. Wolf, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2020)
May 5, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/19/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2020)
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Yasrebi, Arash) (Filed on 5/5/2020)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14441133.). Filed byMehdi Pazoki. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Yasrebi, Arash) (Filed on 5/5/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pazoki v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kramar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mehdi Pazoki
Represented By: Arash Yasrebi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?