American Immigration Council et al v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: American Immigration Council, Human Rights Watch and American Immigration Lawyers Association
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection and United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Case Number: 4:2020cv03266
Filed: May 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/16/2020. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2020)
June 30, 2020 Filing 20 DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to Amended Complaint byUnited States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Davis, Julie) (Filed on 6/30/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Immigration Council, American Immigration Lawyers Association, Human Rights Watch (Enzminger, David) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 16, 2020 Filing 18 First Amended Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Filed by American Immigration Council, Human Rights Watch, American Immigration Lawyers Association. (Attachments: #1 First Amended Complaint, filed pursuant to FRCP Rule 15(a)(1)(B) and with consent of opposition)(Enzminger, David) (Filed on 6/16/2020) Modified on 6/17/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 22, 2020 Filing 17 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Immigration Council, American Immigration Lawyers Association, Human Rights Watch. (Enzminger, David) (Filed on 5/22/2020) Modified on 5/26/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Immigration Council, American Immigration Lawyers Association, Human Rights Watch (Enzminger, David) (Filed on 5/21/2020)
May 20, 2020 Filing 15 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by American Immigration Council, American Immigration Lawyers Association, Human Rights Watch.. (Enzminger, David) (Filed on 5/20/2020)
May 18, 2020 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 15, 2020 Filing 13 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 This is a proposed summons for all Defendants to this case. Although not named in the complaint, U.S. Attorney General William Barr and the U.S.A.O. of the Northern District of California are required to be served summons by FRCP Rule 4 for this type of FOIA litigation.)(Kellerman, Dillon) (Filed on 5/15/2020)
May 15, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Only ONE summons will be issued. Please list all defendants on ONE summons and re-file in its entirety. [err201] This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety Re: #10 - #12 Proposed Summons filed by American Immigration Council, American Immigration Lawyers Association, Human Rights Watch. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2020)
May 14, 2020 Filing 12 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 The main document is a proposed summons for defendant U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services.)(Kellerman, Dillon) (Filed on 5/14/2020)
May 14, 2020 Filing 11 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 The main document is a proposed summons for defendant Immigration & Customs Enforcement of the Department of Homeland Security.)(Kellerman, Dillon) (Filed on 5/14/2020)
May 14, 2020 Filing 10 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 The main document is a proposed summons for defendant U.S. Customs and Border Protection.)(Kellerman, Dillon) (Filed on 5/14/2020)
May 14, 2020 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 The main document is a proposed summons for U.S.A.O in the Northern District of California. Under FRCP Rule 4, Plaintiffs are required to serve summons on N.D. Cal. U.S.A.O. for this type of FOIA litigation.)(Kellerman, Dillon) (Filed on 5/14/2020)
May 14, 2020 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 The main document is a proposed summons for U.S. Attorney General William Barr. Under FRCP Rule 4, Plaintiffs are required to serve summons on AG Barr for this type of FOIA litigation.)(Kellerman, Dillon) (Filed on 5/14/2020)
May 14, 2020 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/19/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2020)
May 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David P. Enzminger (Enzminger, David) (Filed on 5/14/2020)
May 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Dillon Singh Kellerman (Kellerman, Dillon) (Filed on 5/14/2020)
May 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan E. Stewart (Stewart, Morgan) (Filed on 5/14/2020)
May 14, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John Erik Schreiber AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR PLAINTIFFS (Schreiber, John) (Filed on 5/14/2020)
May 14, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/28/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2020)
May 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory And Injunctive Relief against All Defendants (no process) ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14468314.). Filed byAmerican Immigration Council, Human Rights Watch, American Immigration Lawyers Association. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Romm, Leah) (Filed on 5/13/2020) Modified on 5/14/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Immigration Council et al v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Julie Bibb Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: Julie Bibb Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Julie Bibb Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Immigration Council
Represented By: Leah Romm
Represented By: Dillon Singh Kellerman
Represented By: David P. Enzminger
Represented By: John Erik Schreiber
Represented By: Morgan E. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Human Rights Watch
Represented By: Leah Romm
Represented By: Dillon Singh Kellerman
Represented By: David P. Enzminger
Represented By: John Erik Schreiber
Represented By: Morgan E. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Immigration Lawyers Association
Represented By: Leah Romm
Represented By: Dillon Singh Kellerman
Represented By: David P. Enzminger
Represented By: John Erik Schreiber
Represented By: Morgan E. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?