F/V AL-W, Inc. et al v Burns
Plaintiff: Kenneth D. Burns and F/V AL-W, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv03319
Filed: May 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Marine
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2020 Filing 17 PATRICK SEWELL'S ANSWER to Complaint IN LIMITATION, COUNTERCLAIM PATRICK SEWELLS CLAIM FOR DAMAGES against All Plaintiffs byPatrick Sewell. (Attachments: #1 PATRICK SEWELLS CLAIM FOR DAMAGES)(Berschler, Arnold) (Filed on 7/6/2020)
July 1, 2020 Filing 16 Notice of Publication by Kenneth D. Burns, F/V AL-W, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ou, Chih Yu) (Filed on 7/1/2020) Modified on 7/2/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
May 27, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE TO CLAIMANTS OF FILING OF LIMITATION PROCEEDING. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2020)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #13 Ex Parte Application to Change Publication Outlet and Extend Claim Filing Deadline Against Plaintiffs-in-Limitation. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2020)
May 26, 2020 Filing 13 Ex Parte Application to Change Publication Outlet and Extend Claim Filing Deadline Against Plaintiffs-in-Limitation filed by Kenneth D. Burns, F/V AL-W, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Order [Proposed] Notice to Claimants)(Ou, Chih Yu) (Filed on 5/26/2020)
May 18, 2020 Filing 12 Notice to Claimants of Filing of Limitation Proceeding re #11 Order DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF NOTICE AND PUBLICATION THEREOF (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DIRECTING ISSUANCE OF NOTICE AND PUBLICATION THEREOF. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/18/20. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/18/20. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 18, 2020 Filing 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 8/7/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/14/2020 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 15, 2020 Filing 8 Case assigned to Judge Jeffrey S. White. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2020)
May 15, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kenneth D. Burns, F/V AL-W, Inc... (Ou, Chih Yu) (Filed on 5/15/2020)
May 15, 2020 Filing 6 Ex Parte Application for Issuance of Notice and Order, and Publication Thereof filed by Kenneth D. Burns, F/V AL-W, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Directing Issuance of Notice and Publication Thereof, #2 Proposed Order Notice to Claimants of Filing of Limitation Proceeding)(Ou, Chih Yu) (Filed on 5/15/2020)
May 15, 2020 Filing 5 Declaration of Kenneth D. Burns Regarding Value of Vessel filed byKenneth D. Burns, F/V AL-W, Inc.. (Ou, Chih Yu) (Filed on 5/15/2020)
May 15, 2020 Filing 4 Corrected Ad Interim Stipulation for Value filed by Kenneth D. Burns, F/V AL-W, Inc. (Ou, Chih Yu) (Filed on 5/15/2020) Modified on 5/18/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 15, 2020 Filing 3 ***SEE AMENDED DOCUMENT AT DOCKET ENTRY #4 *** Ad Interim Stipulation for Value filed by Kenneth D. Burns, F/V AL-W, Inc. (Ou, Chih Yu) (Filed on 5/15/2020) Modified on 5/18/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 15, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Kenneth D. Burns, F/V AL-W, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate United Trollers Fund, Other Affiliate United Marine Fund, Other Affiliate Patrick Sewell, Other Affiliate Kenneth D. Burns for F/V AL-W, Inc., Kenneth D. Burns. (Ou, Chih Yu) (Filed on 5/15/2020)
May 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability against All Parties ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14475324.). Filed byF/V AL-W, Inc., Kenneth D. Burns. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ou, Chih Yu) (Filed on 5/15/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: F/V AL-W, Inc. et al v Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth D. Burns
Represented By: Chih Yu Ou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F/V AL-W, Inc.
Represented By: Chih Yu Ou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?