Continental Insurance Company v. Cosco Shipping Lines (North America) Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Continental Insurance Company
Defendant: Cosco Shipping Lines (North America) Inc. and Cosco Shipping Lines Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 4:2020cv03324
Filed: May 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 49:81
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Continental Insurance Company (Kirsch, Joshua) (Filed on 7/7/2020)
June 2, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Continental Insurance Company. Cosco Shipping Lines Co., Ltd. served on 5/27/2020, answer due 6/17/2020. (Simons, Nathaniel) (Filed on 6/2/2020)
June 2, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Continental Insurance Company. Cosco Shipping Lines (North America) Inc. served on 5/27/2020, answer due 6/17/2020. (Simons, Nathaniel) (Filed on 6/2/2020)
May 18, 2020 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/19/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 18, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Cosco Shipping Lines (North America) Inc., Cosco Shipping Lines Co., Ltd.. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2020)
May 15, 2020 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/29/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2020)
May 15, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Continental Insurance Company.. (Simons, Nathaniel) (Filed on 5/15/2020)
May 15, 2020 Filing 4 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Continental Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate CNA Financial Corporation, Other Affiliate Continental Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Loews Corporation, Other Affiliate Continental Casualty Company for Continental Insurance Company. (Simons, Nathaniel) (Filed on 5/15/2020)
May 15, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Continental Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate WK Webster (Overseas) Ltd., Other Affiliate Rooster Products, Inc. for Continental Insurance Company. (Simons, Nathaniel) (Filed on 5/15/2020)
May 15, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Simons, Nathaniel) (Filed on 5/15/2020)
May 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damage to Ocean Cargo against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14476186.). Filed byContinental Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Simons, Nathaniel) (Filed on 5/15/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Continental Insurance Company v. Cosco Shipping Lines (North America) Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cosco Shipping Lines (North America) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cosco Shipping Lines Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Continental Insurance Company
Represented By: Nathaniel Merton Simons
Represented By: Joshua E. Kirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?