Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Toll Brothers, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Defendant: Toll Brothers, Inc. and Shapell Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv03656
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint byShapell Industries, Inc., Toll Brothers, Inc.. (Wong, Nichole) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE re Docket No. #6 . Notice is hereby given that the initial case management conference previously set for September 1st will be held telephonically. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.). This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929Access Code: 6064255The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
June 26, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint filed by Shapell Industries, Inc., Toll Brothers, Inc., Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Plante, Brian) (Filed on 6/26/2020) Modified on 6/29/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Shapell Industries, Inc. served on 6/8/2020, answer due 6/29/2020. (Aguilera, A.) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. Toll Brothers, Inc. served on 6/9/2020, answer due 6/30/2020. (Aguilera, A.) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 3, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Shapell Industries, Inc., Toll Brothers, Inc. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2020)
June 3, 2020 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. (Aguilera, A.) (Filed on 6/3/2020)
June 2, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (Aguilera, A.) (Filed on 6/2/2020)
June 2, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/25/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/1/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2020)
June 2, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2020)
June 2, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America.. (Aguilera, A.) (Filed on 6/2/2020)
June 2, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Toll Brothers, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, Corporate Parent Shapell Industries, Inc. for Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Aguilera, A.) (Filed on 6/2/2020)
June 2, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Aguilera, A.) (Filed on 6/2/2020)
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against Shapell Industries, Inc., Toll Brothers, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14528411). Filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Aguilera, A.) (Filed on 6/2/2020) Modified on 6/2/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Please Complete Section Where Answer Must be Served on and Remove Does from "to" portion of the Summons. [err201] Re: #2 Proposed Summons filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2020)
June 2, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Please enter the name and address in the section: "The answer or motion must be served on the plaintiff or plaintiffs attorney, whose name and addres s are:" [err201] This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #7 Proposed Summons filed by Travelers Property Casualty Company of America. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America v. Toll Brothers, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toll Brothers, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Christophe Plante
Represented By: Nichole Marie Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shapell Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Christophe Plante
Represented By: Nichole Marie Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: Lindsee Blair Falcone
Represented By: Raymond Earl Brown
Represented By: A. Eric Aguilera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?