Brown et al v. Google LLC et al
Plaintiff: Chasom Brown, William Byatt and Maria Nguyen
Defendant: Alphabet Inc. and Google LLC
Special Master: Douglas A. Brush
Interested Party: Benjamin Hewitt and Kimberley Woodruff
Not Classified By Court: PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP
Case Number: 4:2020cv03664
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan van Keulen
Referring Judge: Lucy H Koh
2 Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Right to Privacy Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 893 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Presented During March 2, 2023 filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 3/13/2023)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 892 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Google's March 2, 2023 Order to Show Cause Hearing Slides filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 March 2, 2023 Hearing Slides)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 3/13/2023)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 891 CLERK'S NOTICE: At the 3/2/2023 OSC hearing, the Court directed both sides to promptly file their hearing slides under seal (see Dkt. 883). The slides must be filed under seal no later than 10 a.m. on 3/13/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2023)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 890 RESPONSE re #877 Order on Stipulation, #861 Discovery Order Joint Submission Pursuant to Dkts. 861 & 877 by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Redacted), #2 Exhibit B (Redacted))(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 3/3/2023)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 889 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Submission Pursuant to Dkts. 861 & 877 filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tracy Gao in Support of Administrative Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Joint Submission Pursuant to Dkts. 861 & 877 (Unredacted), #4 Exhibit A (Unredacted), #5 Exhibit B (Unredacted))(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 3/3/2023)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 888 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/2/23 before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen by Google LLC, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Tse, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/3/2023)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 887 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/02/2023 before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (McGee, Ryan) (Filed on 3/3/2023)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 886 AMENDED COMPLAINT Fourth Amended Complaint against Google LLC. Filed byWilliam Byatt, Maria Nguyen, Chasom Brown. (Mao, Mark) (Filed on 3/2/2023)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 885 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/2/2023. Motion Hearing on Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment set for 5/12/2023 at 01:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Joint Statement due by 6/23/2023. Compliance deadline set for 9/22/2023 at 09:01 AM. (bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2023)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 884 Order by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #872 Joint Stipulation And Proposed Order Regarding Plaintiffs Motion For Issue Certification Under Rule 23(C)(4). Motions due by 3/14/2023. Responses due by 4/11/2023. Replies due by 4/25/2023. Motion Hearing set for 5/12/2023 at 01:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2023)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 883 Minute Entry for UNDER SEAL proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen: Order to Show Cause Hearing held on 3/2/2023.The Court directed each side to promptly file its hearing slides under seal.Matter taken under submission; Court to issue order.Total Time in Court: 10:04am-12:09pm/12:32pm-1:28pm (3 hours 1 min). Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. Plaintiff Attorney: David Boies, Alex Boies, Mark Mao, Amanda Bonn, Alex Frawley, John Yanchunis, Ryan McGee, Beko Reblitz-Richarson, Logan Wright & Mariah Noah with Consultants: Dr. Lillian Dai, Jay Bhatia & Chris Thompson (IT: Matthew Boles). Defendant Attorney: Andrew Schapiro, Stephen Broome, Viola Trebicka, Josef Ansorge, Carl Spilly & Joseph Margolies with In House Counsel: Toni Baker. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/2/2023)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 882 ORDER of USCA as to #812 USCA Case Number (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2023)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 881 ORDER granting #879 Administrative Motion to Seal Courtroom for 3/2/2023 Discovery Hearing; Redaction Order. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 3/1/2023. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2023)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 880 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE: LEAVE TO FILE FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Fourth Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Redlined Complaint)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 2/28/2023)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 879 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Seal the Courtroom for the March 2, 2023 Hearing filed by Google LLC. Responses due by 3/1/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 2/28/2023)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 878 ORDER granting (874) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:20-cv-03664-YGR; granting (988) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:20-cv-05146-YGR. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 2/27/2023. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2023)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 877 ORDER granting (876) Stipulation in case 4:20-cv-03664-YGR; (989) Stipulation in case 4:20-cv-05146-YGR; extending deadline for discovery submission. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 2/27/2023. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2023)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 876 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #861 Discovery Order filed by Google LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 2/24/2023)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 875 ORDER granting #688 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 2/23/2023. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2023)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 874 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of February 14, 2023 Hearing Transcript (Dkt. 868) filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tracy Gao in Support of Administrative Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 February 14, 2023 Hearing Transcript (Redacted))(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 2/23/2023)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 873 CLERK'S NOTICE RE APPEARANCES FOR 3/2/2023 IN PERSON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING. Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at SVKcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than March 1, 2023 at 12:00 PM PST. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2023)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 872 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation And Proposed Order Regarding Plaintiffs Motion For Issue Certification Under Rule 23(C)(4) filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Mao, Mark) (Filed on 2/23/2023)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 871 ORDER RE MARCH 2, 2023 HEARING ON ORDER FOR GOOGLE TO SHOW CAUSE RE FURTHER DISCOVERY SANCTIONS. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 2/23/2023. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2023)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 870 Transcript of Proceedings held on February 14, 2023, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Raynee H. Mercado, CSR, telephone number 510-565-7228, cacsr8258@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #863 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/23/2023. (Related document(s) #863 ) (Mercado, Raynee) (Filed on 2/22/2023)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 869 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING HEARING. Notice is hereby given that the hearing previously set for 2/28/2023 is vacated. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2023)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 868 Sealed Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/14/2023, before Judge Susan Van Keulen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 3/6/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/16/2023. (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 2/16/2023)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 867 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on February 14, 2023 before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen, for Court Reporter not listed - San Jose. (Frawley, Alexander) (Filed on 2/15/2023) Transcriber Summer Fisher email: Summer_Fisher@cand.uscourts.gov Modified on 2/16/2023 (kab, COURT STAFF).
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 866 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2/14/2023 before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen by Google LLC, for Court Reporter not listed - San Jose. (Olson, Alyssa) (Filed on 2/15/2023) Transcriber - Summer Fisher, email: summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov Modified on 2/16/2023 (sp, COURT STAFF).
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 865 Minute Entry for UNDER SEAL proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen: Hearing re Preservation Tables held on 2/14/2023 via Zoom with case 4:20-cv-05146-YGR.Court to issue order. The transcript from today's sealed proceedings may be released to parties upon request.Digital Recording Time: Zoom 2:04-3:41pm (1 hour 37 mins). Plaintiff Attorney: Mark Mao, John Yanchunis & Ryan McGee. (Plaintiff Attorney in case 4:20-cv-05146-YGR: David Straite, Ann Davis, Jay Barnes & Sharon Cruz). Defendant Attorney: Andrew Schapiro, Stephen Broome, Viola Trebicka, Josef Ansorge & Tracy Gao with In House Counsel: Toni Baker. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/15/2023)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 864 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on February 14, 2023 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen, for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Frawley, Alexander) (Filed on 2/15/2023)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 863 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2/14/2023 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Google LLC, for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Olson, Alyssa) (Filed on 2/15/2023)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 862 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Further Case Management Conference held on 2/14/2023.Plaintiffs' supplemental brief on an issue class under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(c)(4) & Plaintiffs' supplemental brief on whether they will seek injunctive relief for UCL claims due by 2/28/2023. Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/1/2023. Defendants' Cross Motion Combined with Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion with allowancefor additional 10 pages due by 3/21/2023. Defendant's reply in support of Cross-Motion due by 4/26/2023. Plaintiff's Combined Reply in support of Motion and Opposition to Cross Motion with allowance for additional 10 pages due by 4/12/2023. Hearing on Motions for Summary Judgment special set for 5/15/2023 01:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Compliance Deadline re hired retired Judge and advisal to the Court regarding trial related deadlines regarding exchanges due by 6/30/2023 09:01 AM. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/17/2023. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/24/2023 01:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. Compliance due by 9/22/2023 09:01 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 10/13/2023 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Jury Selection set for 11/6/2023 08:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Jury Trial set to begin on 11/6/2023 08:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Total Time in Court: 1:27. Court Reporter: Raynee Mercado. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/14/2023)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 861 ORDER FOLLOWING FEBRUARY 14, 2023 HEARING RE PRESERVATION OF MAPPING AND LINKING TABLES. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 2/14/2023. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2023)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 860 ORDER granting #856 Administrative Motion to Seal Courtroom for 2/14/2023 Discovery Hearing. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 2/13/2023. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2023)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 859 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d Plaintiff's Statement of Recent Decision re Order to Show Cause filed byChasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #784 ) (Mao, Mark) (Filed on 2/13/2023)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 858 RESPONSE re #784 Order to Show Cause, Google LLCs Reply in Support of Its Response to the Courts October 27, 2022 Order to Show Cause by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Carl Spilly (Redacted), #2 Exhibit 1 to Spilly Declaration (Redacted), #3 Exhibit 2 to Spilly Declaration (Redacted), #4 Exhibit 3 to Spilly Declaration (Redacted), #5 Exhibit 4 to Spilly Declaration (Redacted), #6 Exhibit 5 to Spilly Declaration (Redacted), #7 Exhibit 6 to Spilly Declaration (Redacted), #8 Exhibit 7 to Spilly Declaration (Redacted), #9 Exhibit 8 to Spilly Declaration (Redacted), #10 Exhibit 9 to Spilly Declaration, #11 Exhibit 10 to Spilly Declaration (Redacted), #12 Exhibit 11 to Spilly Declaration (Redacted), #13 Exhibit 12 to Spilly Declaration, #14 Declaration of Steven Ellis (Redacted), #15 Exhibits A-D to Ellis Declaration (Redacted), #16 Declaration of Konstantinos Psounis (Redacted), #17 Exhibit A to Psounis Declaration)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 2/10/2023)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 857 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Google LLCs Reply in Support of Its Response to the Courts October 27, 2022 Order to Show Cause (Dkt. 784) filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jospeh H. Margolies in Support of Google LLC's Administrative Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Google LLCs Reply in Support of Its Response to the Courts October 27, 2022 Order to Show Cause (Dkt. 784) (Unredacted), #4 Declaration of Carl Spilly (Unredacted), #5 Exhibit 1 to Spilly Declaration (Unredacted), #6 Exhibit 2 to Spilly Declaration (Unredacted), #7 Exhibit 3 to Spilly Declaration (Unredacted), #8 Exhibit 4 to Spilly Declaration (Unredacted), #9 Exhibit 5 to Spilly Declaration (Unredacted), #10 Exhibit 6 to Spilly Declaration (Unredacted), #11 Exhibit 7 to Spilly Declaration (Unredacted), #12 Exhibit 8 to Spilly Declaration (Unredacted), #13 Exhibit 10 to Spilly Declaration (Unredacted), #14 Exhibit 11 to Spilly Declaration (Unredacted), #15 Declaration of Steven Ellis (Unredacted), #16 Exhibits A-D to Ellis Declaration (Unredacted), #17 Declaration of Konstantinos Psounis (Unredacted))(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 2/10/2023)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 856 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Seal the Courtroom for February 14, 2023 Hearing filed by Google LLC. Responses due by 2/13/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tracy Gao, #2 Proposed Order)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 2/10/2023)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 855 CLERK'S NOTICE RE-SETTING TIME OF 2/14/23 ZOOM HEARING.The Hearing re Preservation Tables set for 2/14/2023 at 10:00 AM will be heard at 2:00 PM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/svkCourt Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at SVKcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than February 13, 2023 at 12:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2023)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 854 REPLY (re #832 MOTION to Clarify That All Statutes of Limitations Remain Tolled Based on the Court's Certification Order ) PLAINTIFFS REPLY ISO MOTION TO CLARIFY THAT ALL STATUTES OF LIMITATIONS REMAIN TOLLED BASED ON THE COURT'S CERTIFICATION ORDER filed byChasom Brown, William Byatt. (Mao, Mark) (Filed on 2/8/2023)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 853 ORDER TO PROVIDE CHAMBERS COPIES OF BRIEFING ON (1) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE ADDITIONAL SANCTIONS AND (2) GOOGLE'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO DEPRECATE. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 2/6/2023. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2023)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 852 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING.Hearing re Preservation Tables set for 2/14/2023 10:00 AM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/svk Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at SVKcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than February 13, 2023 at 12:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated b y the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2023)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 851 CLERK'S NOTICE: Google is to promptly submit the video recording referred to in Dkt. #849 at 1:19 to SvKCRD@cand.uscourts.gov for the Courts review. Google need only submit one copy of the video, though it is requested in both the Brown and Calhoun matters. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2023)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 850 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #832 MOTION to Clarify That All Statutes of Limitations Remain Tolled Based on the Court's Certification Order ) filed byGoogle LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 2/1/2023)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 849 RESPONSE re #830 Document Sealed,, Terminate Motions, Joint Status Report Pursuant to Dkt. No. 830 by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Viola Trebicka, #2 Exhibit 1 to Trebicka Declaration (Redacted), #3 Exhibit 2 to Trebicka Declaration (Redacted, #4 Exhibit 3 to Trebicka Declaration (Redacted, #5 Exhibit 4 to Trebicka Declaration (Redacted, #6 Exhibit 5 to Trebicka Declaration (Redacted, #7 Exhibit 6 to Trebicka Declaration (Redacted))(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 1/31/2023)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 848 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Status Report Pursuant to Dkt. No. 830 filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tracy Gao in Support of Administrative Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Joint Status Report Pursuant to Dkt. No. 830 (Unredacted), #4 Exhibit 1 to Trebicka Declaration (Unredacted), #5 Exhibit 2 to Trebicka Declaration (Unredacted), #6 Exhibit 3 to Trebicka Declaration (Unredacted), #7 Exhibit 4 to Trebicka Declaration (Unredacted), #8 Exhibit 5 to Trebicka Declaration (Unredacted), #9 Exhibit 6 to Trebicka Declaration (Unredacted))(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 1/31/2023)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 847 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING IN PERSON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Notice is hereby given that the case management conference previously set for 2/13/2023 is continued to 2/14/2023 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2023)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 846 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING IN PERSON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Notice is hereby given that the Further Case Management Conference previously set for 1/30/2023 is continued to 2/13/2023 at 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2023)
January 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 845 ORDER granting #844 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 1/30/2023. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2023)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 844 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Plaintiffs' Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause (Redacted) CORRECTION OF DOCKET #834 )(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 1/27/2023)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 843 Declaration of Joseph H. Margolies in Support of #833 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Response (Redacted), #3 Exhibit Mao Decl. Ex. 1 (Redacted), #4 Exhibit Mao Decl. Ex. 2 (Redacted), #5 Exhibit Mao Decl. Ex. 3 (Redacted), #6 Exhibit Mao Decl. Ex. 4 (Redacted), #7 Exhibit Mao Decl. Ex. 6 (Redacted), #8 Exhibit Mao Decl. Ex. 7 (Redacted), #9 Exhibit Thompson Decl. (Redacted), #10 Exhibit Bhatia Decl. (Redacted))(Related document(s) #833 ) (Margolies, Joseph) (Filed on 1/27/2023)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 842 Transcript of Proceedings held on 01/05/2021, before Judge Van Keulen. Court Reporter Irene L. Rodriguez, email address Irene_Rodriguez@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 1/27/2023)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 841 ORDER ON #781 #799 #805 #817 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 1/26/2023. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2023)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 840 ORDER granting #836 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of 1/10/2023 Hearing Transcript. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 1/25/2023. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2023)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 839 ORDER Granting #837 Joint Submission re Sealing Portions of 1/17/23 Order re Preservation. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 1/25/2023. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2023)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 838 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting #829 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2023)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 837 RESPONSE re #831 Order Joint Submission re: Sealing Portions of the January 17, 2020 Order on (1) Googles Motion for Relief Regarding Preservation, and (2) Parties Joint Submission re Preservation in Light of Class Certification Order (Dkt. 830) by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Order on (1) Googles Motion for Relief Regarding Preservation, and (2) Parties Joint Submission re Preservation in Light of Class Certification Order (Dkt. 830) (Redacted))(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 1/24/2023)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 836 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Transcript of Sealed Proceedings, January 10, 2023 filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tracy Gao, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Transcript of Sealed Proceedings, January 10, 2023 (Redacted), #4 Transcript of Sealed Proceedings, January 10, 2023 (Unredacted))(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 1/23/2023)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 835 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Joint Filing re Dkt. #803 filed by Google LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 1/23/2023)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 834 *** DOCUMENT LOCKED *** RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Chasom Brown (DKT. 784). (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mao, #2 Declaration of Thompson, #3 Declaration of Bhatia)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 1/20/2023) Modified on 1/30/2023 (cv, COURT STAFF).
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 833 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed filed by Chasom Brown. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs Response to Googles OSC Response, #2 Declaration of Mao, #3 Declaration of Thompson, #4 Declaration of Bhatia)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 1/20/2023)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 832 MOTION to Clarify That All Statutes of Limitations Remain Tolled Based on the Court's Certification Order filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 2/1/2023. Replies due by 2/8/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexander Frawley, #2 Proposed Order)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 1/18/2023)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 831 REDACTION ORDER re #830 Sealed Order. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 1/17/2023. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2023)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 830 Document sealed. ORDER ON (1) GOOGLE'S MOTION FOR RELIEF REGARDING PRESERVATION, AND (2) PARTIES' JOINT SUBMISSION RE PRESERVATION IN LIGHT OF CLASS CERTIFICATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 1/17/2023. (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2023)Fax emailed to lead counsel.
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 829 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Samuel Issacharoff ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number BCANDC-17902426.) filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Issacharoff, Samuel) (Filed on 1/17/2023)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 828 Sealed Transcript of Proceedings held on 01/10/2023, before Judge van Keulen. Court Reporter Irene L. Rodriguez, email address Irene_Rodriguez@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 1/13/2023)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 827 Declaration of Donald Seth Fortenbery in Support of #815 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO GOOGLES ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION (DKT. 810) RE: NEWLY REVEALED INCOGNITO-DETECTION BIT filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Plaintiffs' Response to Google's Administrative Motion (Dkt. 810) Re: Newly Revealed Incognito-Detection Bit (Redacted), #3 Exhibit 1 to Mark Mao Declaration in Support of Plaintiffs' Response (Redacted), #4 Exhibit 2 to Mark Mao Declaration in Support of Plaintiffs' Response (Redacted), #5 Exhibit 3 to Mark Mao Declaration in Support of Plaintiffs' Response (Redacted))(Related document(s) #815 ) (Fortenbery, Donald) (Filed on 1/11/2023)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 826 ORDER granting #825 Stipulation re Briefing on Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 1/11/2023. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2023)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 825 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #784 Order to Show Cause, Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order re Order to Show Cause filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Mao, Mark) (Filed on 1/11/2023)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 824 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 1/10/23 before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen by Google LLC, for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Tse, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/10/2023)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 823 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/10/2023 before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen, for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (McGee, Ryan) (Filed on 1/10/2023)
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 822 Minute Entry for UNDER SEAL proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen: Motion Hearing held on 1/10/2023 via Zoom with case 4:20-cv-05146-YGR.The Court ordered the transcript may be released to parties, as soon as it is available, after these proceedings. Court to issue short summary order. Total Time in Court: 10:07-11:07 am (1 hour). Court Reporter: Irene Rodriguez. Plaintiff Attorney: Mark Mao, Ryan McGee & Amanda Bonn. (Plaintiff Attorney in case 4:20-cv-05146-YGR: David Stratie, Ann Truong, Jay Barnes & Angelica Ornelas.)Defendant Attorney: Andrew Schapiro, Viola Trebicka, Tracy Gao, Seth Fortenberry, Stephen Broome & Josef Ansorge; Google in house counsel: Matthew Gubiotti & Toni Baker. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/10/2023)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 821 ORDER granting #819 Administrative Motion to Seal Courtroom for 1/10/23 Hearing. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 1/9/2023. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2023)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 820 CLERK'S NOTICE CONVERTING 1/10/23 IN PERSON HEARING TO ZOOM WEBINAR.The Motion Hearing on 1/10/23 at 10:00 AM will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/svk Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at SVKcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than January 9, 2023 at 2:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(jhf, COURT STA FF) (Filed on 1/9/2023)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 819 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Seal the Courtroom for January 10, 2023 Hearing filed by Google LLC. Responses due by 1/9/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Donald Seth Fortenbery, #2 Proposed Order)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 1/6/2023)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 818 Letter Brief re #813 Order on Stipulation Joint Submission re: Preservation in Light of Class Certification Order filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #813 ) (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 1/6/2023)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 817 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Submission re: Preservation in Light of Class Certification Order filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Donald Seth Fortenbery in Support of Administrative Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Joint Submission re: Preservation in Light of Class Certification Order (Unredacted))(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 1/6/2023)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 816 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #810 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Requesting Leave to Deprecate ) PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO GOOGLES ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION (DKT. 810) RE: NEWLY REVEALED INCOGNITO-DETECTION BIT filed byChasom Brown, William Byatt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark Mao, #2 Exhibit Redacted Exhibits 1 - 3, #3 Proposed Order)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 1/4/2023)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 815 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO GOOGLES ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION (DKT. 810) RE: NEWLY REVEALED INCOGNITO-DETECTION BIT filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs Opposition to Googles Admn Mtn, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 1/4/2023)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 814 CLERK'S NOTICE:The Motion Hearing set for 1/10/23 at 10:00am in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen will be held IN PERSON.Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at SVKcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than January 9, 2023 at 12:00PM PST. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2023)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 813 ORDER granting #811 STIPULATION REGARDING REQUEST TO FILE LETTER BRIEF. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 12/27/2021. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2022)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 812 USCA Case Number 22-80147 9th Circuit Court of Appeals - This is to acknowledge receipt of your Petition for Permission to Appeal underFederal Rule of Civil Procedure 23(f). (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2022)
December 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 811 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Request to File Letter Brief filed by Google LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 12/23/2022)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 810 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Requesting Leave to Deprecate filed by Google LLC. Responses due by 1/4/2023. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew H. Schapiro, #2 Exhibit 1 to Schapiro Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Schapiro Declaration, #4 Declaration of Borbala Benko in Support of Google LLC's Administrative Motion for Leave to Deprecate (Redacted), #5 Proposed Order)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 12/21/2022)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 809 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Donald Seth Fortenbery in Support of Administrative Motion to Seal, #2 Declaration of Borbala Benko in Support of Administrative Motion to Seal, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Google LLC's Administrative Motion Requesting Leave to Deprecate (Unredacted), #5 Declaration of Borbala Benko in Support of Google LLC's Administrative Motion Requesting Leave to Deprecate (Unredacted))(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 12/21/2022)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 808 ORDER re #807 JOINT DEPOSITION SCHEDULE IN RESPONSE TO DECEMBER 12, 2022 ORDER (DKT. #803 ). Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/19/2022. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2022)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 807 RESPONSE re #803 Order on Motion to Certify Class,, Order on Motion to Strike,,,,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, Joint [Proposed] Deposition Schedule in Response to December 12, 2022 Order by Google LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 12/19/2022)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 806 REPLY (re #782 MOTION Regarding Preservation re #657 Document Sealed,, Terminate Motions, #587 Document Sealed, Relief from Preservation Orders ) filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Viola Trebicka in Support of Google LLCs Reply in Support of Motion for Relief Regarding Preservation (Redacted), #2 Exhibit 1 to Trebicka Declaration (Redacted), #3 Exhibit 2 to Trebicka Declaration (Redacted, #4 Exhibit 3 to Trebicka Declaration (Redacted, #5 Exhibit 4 to Trebicka Declaration (Redacted, #6 Exhibit 5 to Trebicka Declaration (Redacted)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 12/15/2022)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 805 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Google LLCs Reply in Support of Motion for Relief Regarding Preservation filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Teuta Fani in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Google LLCs Reply in Support of Motion for Relief Regarding Preservation (Unredacted), #4 Declaration of Viola Trebicka in Support of Google LLCs Reply in Support of Motion for Relief Regarding Preservation (Unredacted), #5 Exhibit 1 to Trebicka Declaration (Unredacted), #6 Exhibit 2 to Trebicka Declaration (Unredacted), #7 Exhibit 3 to Trebicka Declaration (Unredacted), #8 Exhibit 4 to Trebicka Declaration (Unredacted), #9 Exhibit 5 to Trebicka Declaration (Unredacted))(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 12/15/2022)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 804 ORDER RE PENDING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/12/2022. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2022)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 803 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers GRANTING IN PART MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION; GRANTING IN PART DAUBERT MOTIONS; AND DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE GOOGLES NON-RETAINED EXPERTS. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/23/2023. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/30/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2022)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 802 Declaration of Tracy Gao in Support of #799 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER GOOGLES MATERIAL SHOULD BE SEALED filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Google's Motion for Relief Regarding Preservation (Redacted), #3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Ryan McGee in Support of Plaintiffs' Response (Redacted), #4 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Ryan McGee in Support of Plaintiffs' Response (Redacted), #5 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Ryan McGee in Support of Plaintiffs' Response (Redacted))(Related document(s) #799 ) (Gao, Xi) (Filed on 12/8/2022)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 801 ORDER TO PROVIDE CHAMBERS COPIES OF DECLARATIONS AND EXHIBITS ON #782 GOOGLES MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM PRESERVATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 12/6/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2022)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 800 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #782 MOTION Regarding Preservation re #657 Document Sealed,, Terminate Motions, #587 Document Sealed, Relief from Preservation Orders ) filed byChasom Brown, William Byatt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ryan J. McGee, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Proposed Order)(Yanchunis, John) (Filed on 12/1/2022)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 799 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER GOOGLES MATERIAL SHOULD BE SEALED filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unredacted Response In Opposition to Google's Motion for Relief Regarding Preservation, #2 Exhibit Redacted Response In Opposition to Google's Motion for Relief Regarding Preservation, #3 Exhibit Sealed Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Ryan J. McGee, #4 Exhibit Sealed Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Ryan J. McGee, #5 Exhibit Sealed Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Ryan J. McGee)(Yanchunis, John) (Filed on 12/1/2022)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 798 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Google LLC Google's Response to Court's October 27, 2022 Order. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Viola Trebicka, #2 Exhibit 1 to Trebicka Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Trebicka Declaration (Redacted), #4 Exhibit 3 to Trebicka Declaration (Redacted), #5 Declaration of Matthew Harren (Redacted), #6 Declaration of Vineet Kahlon (Redacted), #7 Exhibit A to Kahlon Declaration (Redacted), #8 Exhibit B to Kahlon Declaration, #9 Exhibit C to Kahlon Declaration (Redacted), #10 Declaration of Macie Kuzniar (Redacted), #11 Exhibit A to Kuzniar Declaration (Redacted), #12 Declaration of Eugene Lee (Redacted), #13 Exhibit A to Lee Declaration (Redacted), #14 Declaration of Xianzhi Liu (Redacted), #15 Exhibit A to Liu Declaration (Redacted), #16 Exhibit B to Liu Declaration (Redacted), #17 Declaration of Eric Maki (Redacted), #18 Exhibit to Maki Declaration (Redacted), #19 Declaration of Vasily Panferov (Redacted), #20 Declaration of Martin Sramek (Redacted), #21 Declaration of Konstantinos Psounis (Redacted), #22 Exhibit A to Psounis Declaration, #23 Exhibit B to Psounis Declaration (Redacted))(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 12/1/2022)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 797 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Teuta Fani, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Google LLC's Response to the Court's October 27, 2022 Order to Show Cause (Dkt. 784) (Unredacted), #4 Exhibit 2 to Trebicka Declaration (Unredacted), #5 Exhibit 3 to Trebicka Declaration (Unredacted), #6 Declaration of Matthew Harren (Unredacted), #7 Declaration of Vineet Kahlon (Unredacted), #8 Exhibit A to Kahlon Declaration (Unredacted), #9 Exhibit C to Kahlon Declaration (Unredacted), #10 Declaration of Macie Kuzniar (Unredacted), #11 Exhibit A to Kuzniar Declaration(Unredacted), #12 Declaration of Eugene Lee (Unredacted), #13 Exhibit A to Lee Declaration (Unredacted), #14 Exhibit B to Lee Declaration (Unredacted), #15 Declaration of Xianzi Liu (Unredacted), #16 Exhibit A to Liu Declaration (Unredacted), #17 Declaration of Eric Maki (Unredacted), #18 Exhibit A to Maki Declaration (Unredacted), #19 Declaration of Visaly Panferov (Unredacted), #20 Declaration of Martin Sramek (Unredacted), #21 Declaration of Konstantinos Psounis (Unredacted), #22 Exhibit B to Psounis Declaaration (Unredacted))(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 11/30/2022)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 796 RESPONSE re #795 Order, Terminate Motions, Set Deadlines/Hearings Joint Chart in Response to November 16, 2022 Order re Pending Motions to Seal by Google LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 11/29/2022)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 795 ORDER RE PENDING MOTIONS TO SEAL. Requested Chart due by 11/29/2022. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/16/2022. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2022)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 794 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF #793 CORRECTED MOTION TO STRIKE. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 11/15/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2022)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 793 Corrected Motion to Strike Exhibit A to Mao Declaration in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion for Relief CORRECTION OF DOCKET #693 filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Viola Trebicka)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 11/10/2022) Modified on 11/14/2022 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 792 ORDER granting ***AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT*** #791 Stipulation Continuing Deadlines for Google's Preservaton Motion at Dkt. 782. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 11/9/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2022)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 791 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #782 MOTION Regarding Preservation re #657 Document Sealed,, Terminate Motions, #587 Document Sealed, Relief from Preservation Orders filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt. (Yanchunis, John) (Filed on 11/9/2022)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 790 Renotice motion hearing re #782 MOTION Regarding Preservation re #657 Document Sealed,, Terminate Motions, #587 Document Sealed, Relief from Preservation Orders filed byGoogle LLC. (Related document(s) #782 ) (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 11/1/2022)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 789 ORDER granting #779 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 10/31/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2022)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 788 Order on #780 Joint Letter Brief re Google's Request to Delete Certain Pre-Class Period Data. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 10/31/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2022)
October 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 787 Transcript of the Official Electronic record of Remote Zoom Video Conference Proceedings held on October 27, 2022, before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Transcribed by Federal Official Court Reporter Ana Dub, CSR 7445, RDR, RMR, CRR, CCRR, CRG, CCG, telephone number 415-290-1651; ana_dub@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #785 Transcript Order, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/30/2023. (Related documents(s) #785 ) (amd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2022)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 786 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/27/22 before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen by Google LLC, for Court Reporter not listed - San Jose. (Tse, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/28/2022) Transcriber - Ana Dub, email: ann_dub@cand.uscourts.gov Modified on 10/28/2022 (sp, COURT STAFF).
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 785 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/27/2022 before Magistrate Judge by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen, for Court Reporter not listed - San Jose. (McGee, Ryan) (Filed on 10/27/2022) Transcriber - Ana Dub, email: ann_dub@cand.uscourts.gov. NOTE: party agreed to 3-day deliveryModified on 10/28/2022 (sp, COURT STAFF).
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 784 ORDER FOR GOOGLE TO SHOW CAUSE RE ADDITIONAL DISCOVERY SANCTIONS; ORDER FOLLOWING OCTOBER 27, 2022 STATUS CONFERENCE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 3/2/2023 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 10/27/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2022)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 783 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen: Status Conference held on 10/27/2022 via Zoom.Court to issue short order.Digital Recording Time: Zoom 10:00-10:38am (38 mins). Plaintiff Attorney: Amanda Bonn, Mark Mao, John Yanchunis & Ryan Sila. Defendant Attorney: Stephen Broome, Viola Trebicka & Carl Spilly. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/27/2022)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 782 MOTION Regarding Preservation re #657 Document Sealed,, Terminate Motions, #587 Document Sealed, Relief from Preservation Orders filed by Google LLC. Motion Hearing set for 11/22/2022 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Responses due by 11/10/2022. Replies due by 11/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Larry Greenfield (Unredacted), #2 Declaration of Benjamin Kornacki (Unredacted), #3 Declaration of Julian Kranz (Unredacted), #4 Declaration of Joshua Halsted (Unredacted), #5 Declaration of Patrick Quaid (Unredacted), #6 Declaration of Daryl Seah (Unredacted), #7 Declaration of Srilakshmi Pothana (Unredacted), #8 Declaration of Tracy Gao, #9 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Tracy Gao (Unredacted), #10 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Tracy Gao (Unredacted), #11 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Tracy Gao (Unredacted), #12 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Tracy Go, #13 Proposed Order)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 10/27/2022) Modified on 3/20/2023 (jhf, COURT STAFF).
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 781 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Google LLC's Motion for Relief Regarding Preservation filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tracy Gao in Support of Administrative Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Google LLC's Notice of Motion and Motion for Relief Regarding Preservation (Unredacted), #4 Declaration of Larry Greenfield (Unredacted), #5 Declaration of Benjamin Kornacki (Unredacted), #6 Declaration of Julian Kranz (Unredacted), #7 Declaration of Joshua Halsted (Unredacted), #8 Declaration of Patrick Quaid (Unredacted), #9 Declaration of Daryl Seah (Unredacted), #10 Declaration Declaration of Srilakshmi Pothana (Unredacted), #11 Exhibit 1 to Tracy Gao Declaration (Unredacted), #12 Exhibit 2 to Tracy Gao Declaration (Unredacted), #13 Exhibit 3 to Tracy Gao Declaration (Unredacted))(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 10/27/2022)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 780 Letter Brief Joint Submission re Google's Request to Delete Certain Pre-Class Period Data filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Google's Request to Delete Certain Dat, #2 Proposed Order Granting Google's Request to Delete Certain Dat)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 10/27/2022)
October 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 779 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Submission re Google's Request to Delete Certain Pre-Class Period Data filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Carl Spilly in Support of Administrative Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Unredacted Version of Joint Submission re Google's Request to Delete Certain Pre-Class Period Data)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 10/26/2022)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 778 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Conference set for 10/27/2022 10:00 AM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/svk Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at SVKcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than October 26, 2022 at 12:00 PM PDT.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2022)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 777 ORDER ON #733 GOOGLES MOTION TO STRIKE. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 10/20/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2022)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 776 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE RE #656 PENDING MOTION FOR FURTHER DISCOVERY SANCTIONS. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 10/20/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2022)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 775 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/11/2022, before Judge Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Pamlea Batalo Hebel, telephone number 626-688-7509; pamlea_batalo-hebel@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #773 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 11/3/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/14/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/11/2023. (Related documents(s) #773 ) (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 10/13/2022)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 774 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/11/22 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Google LLC, for Court Reporter Pam Batalo-Hebel. (Tse, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/12/2022)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 773 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/11/2022 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen, for Court Reporter not listed - Oakland. (Mao, Mark) (Filed on 10/12/2022)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 772 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: #609 MOTION to Certify Class, #662 MOTION to Strike Lasinski Opinion, #663 MOTION to Strike Nelson Opinion, #664 MOTION to Strike Schneier Report, #703 MOTION Exclude Portions of Rebuttal Expert Report of Konstantinos Psounis, #705 MOTION to Strike Hearing held on 10/11/2022. Total Time in Court: 2:24. Court Reporter: Pamela Hebel. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/11/2022)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 771 CLERK'S NOTICE RE: #733 Defendant Google, LLC's Motion to Strike Certain Exhibits and References. Please take notice the hearing set for 10/18/2022, at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen is VACATED. The hearing will be reset if necessary. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2022)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 770 ORDER granting #769 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 10/4/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2022)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 769 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Order on Plaintiffs' Renewed Request to Depose Sundar Pichai (Dkt. 758) filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Marie Hayrapetian, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Order on Plaintiffs' Renewed Request to Depose Sundar Pichai (Sealed), #4 Order on Plaintiffs' Renewed Request to Depose Sundar Pichai (Redacted))(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 10/3/2022)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 768 ORDER granting #593 #594 #616 #637 #638 #689 #716 #723 Administrative Motions for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 9/30/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2022)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 767 Declaration of Teuta Fani in Support of #754 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Reply in Support of Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude Portions of the Rebuttal Expert Report of Konstantinos Psounis (Dkt. 703) filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Portions of the Rebuttal Report of Konstantinos Psounis (Redacted))(Related document(s) #754 ) (Fani, Teuta) (Filed on 9/28/2022)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 766 ORDER granting #671 #691 #721 Administrative Motions to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 9/28/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2022)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 765 ORDER granting #762 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 9/28/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2022)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 764 Declaration of Donald Seth Fortenbery in Support of #752 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE NON-RETAINED EXPERT DECLARATIONS FOR WHOM GOOGLE PROVIDED NO EXPERT REPORT (DKT. 705) filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Non-Retained Expert Declarations for Whom Google Provided No Expert Report (Redacted))(Related document(s) #752 ) (Fortenbery, Donald) (Filed on 9/27/2022)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 763 ORDER ON #672 PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR RELIEF RE GOOGLE'S PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS IMPROPERLY WITHHELD AS PRIVILEGED; AND #693 GOOGLE'S MOTION TO STRIKE EX. A TO MAO DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 9/26/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2022)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 762 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document Docket 751-2 filed by Google LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 9/26/2022)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 761 Declaration of Alyssa G. Olson in Support of #744 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Opposition to Google's Motion to Strike CORRECTION OF DOCKET #751 , [751-1] and [751-2] filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Google's Motion to Strike (Redacted))(Related document(s) #744 ) (Olson, Alyssa) (Filed on 9/26/2022)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 760 ORDER on #634 #653 #677 Administrative Motions to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 9/26/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2022)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 759 REDACTION ORDER re #758 Sealed Order. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 9/26/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2022)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 758 Document sealed. ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS RENEWED REQUEST TO DEPOSE SUNDAR PICHAI RE DKT. #635 . Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 9/26/22. (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2022)Fax emailed to lead counsel.
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 757 REPLY (re #733 MOTION to Strike #671 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , #708 Reply to Opposition/Response, #672 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Relief re Google's Production of Documents Improperly Withheld as Privileged ) filed byGoogle LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 9/23/2022)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 756 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d in Support of Google's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Solis v American Airlines)(Related document(s) #665 ) (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 9/23/2022)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 755 REPLY (re #703 MOTION Exclude Portions of Rebuttal Expert Report of Konstantinos Psounis ) filed byChasom Brown. (Mao, Mark) (Filed on 9/21/2022)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 754 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Reply in Support of Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude Portions of the Rebuttal Expert Report of Konstantinos Psounis (Dkt. 703) filed by Chasom Brown. (Attachments: #1 Under Seal Reply in Support of Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude Portions of the Rebuttal Expert Report of Konstantinos Psounis (Dkt. 703))(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 9/21/2022)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 753 REPLY (re #705 MOTION to Strike ) PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE NON-RETAINED EXPERT DECLARATIONS FOR WHOM GOOGLE PROVIDED NO EXPERT REPORT filed byChasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Mao, Mark) (Filed on 9/21/2022)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 752 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE NON-RETAINED EXPERT DECLARATIONS FOR WHOM GOOGLE PROVIDED NO EXPERT REPORT (DKT. 705) filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Under Seal Reply In Support of Motion to Strike)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 9/21/2022)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 751 Declaration of Alyssa G. Olson in Support of #744 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Opposition to Google's Motion to Strike filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Google's Motion to Strike (Redacted), #3 Exhibit 1 to Mao Declaration (Redacted))(Related document(s) #744 ) (Olson, Alyssa) (Filed on 9/21/2022) **Locked per filer's request.** Modified on 9/23/2022 (ddk, COURT STAFF). DOCUMENT 751-2 REMOVED PURSUANT TO ORDER #765 (jy, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 750 Declaration of Jonathan Tse in Support of #712 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Plaintiffs Reply in Support of Motion for Class Certification (Redacted), #3 Exhibit 92 to Mao Declaration (Redacted), #4 Exhibit 93 to Mao Declaration (Redacted), #5 Exhibit 95 to Mao Declaration (Redacted), #6 Exhibit 97 to Mao Declaration (Redacted), #7 Exhibit 98 to Mao Declaration (Redacted))(Related document(s) #712 ) (Tse, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/16/2022)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 749 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #703 MOTION Exclude Portions of Rebuttal Expert Report of Konstantinos Psounis ) filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Josef Ansorge, #2 Exhibit 1 to Ansorge Declaration (Redacted), #3 Exhibit 2 to Ansorge Declaration (Redacted), #4 Exhibit 3 to Ansorge Declaration (Redacted), #5 Exhibit 4 to Ansorge Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Ansorge Declaration, #7 Proposed Order)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 9/14/2022)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 748 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Google LLC's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Portions of the Rebuttal Expert Report of Konstantinos Psounis filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tracy Gao, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Google LLC's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Portions of the Rebuttal Expert Report of Konstantinos Psounis (Sealed), #4 Exhibit 1 to Ansorge Declaration (Sealed), #5 Exhibit 2 to Ansorge Declaration (Sealed), #6 Exhibit 3 to Ansorge Declaration (Sealed))(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 9/14/2022)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 747 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #705 MOTION to Strike ) Non-Retained Expert Declarations for Whom Google Provided No Expert Report filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Schapiro, #2 Exhibit 1 to Schapiro Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Schapiro Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Schapiro Declaration (Redacted), #5 Exhibit 4 to Schapiro Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Schapiro Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to Schapiro Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7 to Schapiro Declaration, #9 Exhibit 8 to Schapiro Declaration, #10 Proposed Order)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 9/14/2022)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 746 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Google's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Non-Retained Expert Declarations for Whom Google Provided No Expert Report filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Donald Seth Fortenbery, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Google's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Non-Retained Expert Declarations for Whom Google Provided No Expert Report (Sealed), #4 Exhibit 3 to Schapiro Declaration (Sealed))(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 9/14/2022)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 745 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #733 MOTION to Strike #671 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , #708 Reply to Opposition/Response, #672 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Relief re Google's Production of Documents Improperly Withheld as Privileged ) filed byChasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Mao, #2 Exhibit 1 - Redacted, #3 Proposed Order)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 9/14/2022)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 744 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Opposition Brief - UNDER SEAL, #2 Exhibit 1- UNDER SEAL)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 9/14/2022)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 743 Declaration of Tracy Gao in Support of #704 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Non-Retained Expert Declarations For Whom Google Provided No Expert Report filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Non-Retained Expert Declarations For Whom Google Provided No Expert Report (Redacted), #3 Declaration of Alexander Frawley (Redacted), #4 Exhibit 11 to Frawley Declaration (Redacted))(Related document(s) #704 ) (Gao, Xi) (Filed on 9/13/2022)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 742 Declaration of Jonathan Tse in Support of #702 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Portions of Rebuttal Expert Report of Konstantinos Psounis, Declaration of Mark Mao, and Exhibits A-B filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Portions of the Expert Rebuttal Report of Konstantinos Psounis (Redacted), #3 Declaration of Mark Mao (Redacted), #4 Exhibit A to Mao Declaration (Redacted), #5 Exhibit B to Mao Declaration (Redacted), #6 [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Exclude Portions of the Rebuttal Expert Report of Konstantinos Psounis (Redacted))(Related document(s) #702 ) (Tse, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/13/2022)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 741 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting #727 JOINT STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR GOOGLE TO SUBMIT DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER GOOGLE'S MATERIAL IN PLAINTIFFS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION SHOULD BE SEALED (DKT. 712). (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2022)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 740 Declaration of Joseph H. Margolies in Support of #698 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs Response to Googles Motion to Exclude Opinions of Plaintiffs Damages Expert Michael J. Lasinski filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Redacted Opposition, #3 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit 8, #5 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit 9, #6 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit 10)(Related document(s) #698 ) (Margolies, Joseph) (Filed on 9/9/2022)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 739 Declaration of Alyssa G. Olson in Support of #699 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Google's Motion to Exclude Opinions of Plaintiffs' Expert Bruce Schneier (Redacted), #3 Exhibit 1 to Frawley Declaration (Redacted), #4 Exhibit 3 to Frawley Declaration (Redacted), #5 Exhibit 4 to Frawley Declaration (Redacted), #6 Exhibit 9 to Frawley Declaration (Redacted))(Related document(s) #699 ) (Olson, Alyssa) (Filed on 9/9/2022)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 738 ORDER RE: PENDING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/7/2022. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2022)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 737 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #735 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Supplemental Sanctions Brief ) PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO GOOGLES MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUR-REPLY filed byChasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 9/6/2022)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 736 Declaration of Donald Seth Fortenbery in Support of #721 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal to Consider Whether Google's Material Should be Sealed filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Google Motion to Strike Mao Declaration Exhibit A iso Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion for Relief (Redacted), #2 Exhibit 1 to Mao Declaration (Redacted), #3 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #721 ) (Fortenbery, Donald) (Filed on 9/6/2022)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 735 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Supplemental Sanctions Brief filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Google's Proposed Sur-Reply to Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Supplemental Sanctions Brief (Redacted), #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Viola Trebicka, #3 Exhibit A to Trebicka Declaration (Redacted), #4 Proposed Order)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 9/2/2022)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 734 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Google's Proposed Sur-Reply to Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Supplemental Sanctions Brief filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tracy Gao, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1 - Google's Proposed Sur-Reply to Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Supplemental Sanctions Brief (Sealed), #4 Exhibit A to Trebicka Declaration (Sealed))(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 9/2/2022)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 733 MOTION to Strike #671 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , #708 Reply to Opposition/Response, #672 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Relief re Google's Production of Documents Improperly Withheld as Privileged filed by Google LLC. Motion Hearing set for 10/18/2022 10:00 AM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Responses due by 9/16/2022. Replies due by 9/23/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sara Jenkins, #2 Declaration of Matthew Kellogg, #3 Declaration of Nathaniel Schneider, #4 Proposed Order)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 9/2/2022)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 732 Declaration of Jonathan Tse in Support of #707 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Supplemental Sanctions Brief Pursuant to Dkt. 624 filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Supplemental Sanctions Brief Pursuant to Dkt. 624 (Redacted), #3 Exhibit B to Mao Declaration (Redacted), #4 Exhibit C to Mao Declaration (Redacted), #5 Exhibit D to Mao Declaration (Redacted))(Related document(s) #707 ) (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 9/1/2022)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 731 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting #706 JOINT STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR GOOGLE TO SUBMIT DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS AUGUST 19 AND 23, 2022 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONSTO CONSIDER WHETHER PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS FILINGS SHOULD BE SEALED (DKTS. 698, 699, 702, 704). (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2022)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 730 REPLY (re #693 MOTION to Strike #672 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Relief re Google's Production of Documents Improperly Withheld as Privileged Exhibit A to Mao Declaration ) filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 8/31/2022)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 729 Order granting in part and denying in part #719 Administrative Motion. Per the parties' stipulation, the deadline for Google to file its Opposition to Plaintiffs Daubert motion and motion to strike (Dkts. 703, 705) is extended from September 6, 2022 to September14, 2022. The deadline for Plaintiffs to file their Reply in support of their Daubert motion and motion to strike is extended from September 13, 2022 to September 21, 2022. Based on the Court's availability and the number of pending motions, the hearing on Dockets Nos. 609, 662-664, 703 and 505 shall occur in person on October 11, 2022 at 2:00 pm in Courtroom One, US Courthouse, Oakland, CA. Entered by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 728 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers RE: #396 PENDING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2022)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 727 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #712 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal to Extend Time to Seal filed by Google LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 8/31/2022)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Reset Hearing as to #662 MOTION to Strike Lasinski Opinion, #663 MOTION to Strike Nelson Opinion, #664 MOTION to Strike Schneier Report, #609 MOTION to Certify Class . Motion Hearing set for 10/11/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2022)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Terminated 9/20 hearing placeholder. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2022)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines/Hearing as to #703 MOTION Exclude Portions of Rebuttal Expert Report of Konstantinos Psounis , #705 MOTION to Strike . Response due by 9/14/2022. Repy due by 9/21/2022. Motion Hearing set for 10/11/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2022)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 726 EXHIBITS re #725 Opposition/Response to Motion, Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Stephen A. Broome filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Stephen A. Broome)(Related document(s) #725 ) (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 8/30/2022)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 725 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #719 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Set Hearing Date re #609 MOTION to Certify Class and Other Pending Motions ) filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen A. Broome, #2 Proposed Order)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 8/30/2022)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 724 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers RE: #370 PENDING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL.(amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2022)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 723 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the August 4, 2022 Hearing Transcript filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan Tse, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Transcript of August 4, 2022 Hearing (Redacted), #4 Transcript of August 4, 2022 Hearing (Sealed))(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 8/30/2022)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 722 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #693 MOTION to Strike #672 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Relief re Google's Production of Documents Improperly Withheld as Privileged Exhibit A to Mao Declaration ) filed byChasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark Mao in Opposition to Google's Motion to Strike Exhibit A to Mao Declaration in Support of Plaintiff's Administrative Motion for Relief, #2 Exhibit 1 (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit 2 (Filed Under Seal), #4 Proposed Order)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 8/30/2022)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 721 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal to Consider Whether Google's Material Should be Sealed filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Version of Plaintiff's Opposition to Google's Motion to Strike [dkt. 693] (Sealed), #2 Exhibit 1 (Sealed), #3 Exhibit 2 (Sealed))(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 8/30/2022)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 720 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING 9/27/22 HEARING.The Motion #693 Hearing on 9/27/22 at 10:00 AM is vacated; hearing to be re-set if necessary. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2022)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 719 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Set Hearing Date re #609 MOTION to Certify Class and Other Pending Motions filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. Responses due by 9/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark Mao, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Proposed Order)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 8/29/2022)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 718 Declaration of Jonathan Tse in Support of #671 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion for Relief re Google's Production of Documents Improperly Withheld filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion for Relief (Redacted), #3 Exhibit A (Redacted), #4 Exhibit C (Redacted), #5 Exhibit 2 (Redacted), #6 Exhibit 3 (Redacted), #7 Exhibit 4 (Redacted), #8 Exhibit 5 (Redacted), #9 Exhibit 6 (Redacted), #10 Exhibit 10 (Redacted), #11 Exhibit 12 (Redacted), #12 Exhibit 13 (Redacted), #13 Exhibit 15 (Redacted), #14 Exhibit 16 (Redacted), #15 Exhibit 17 (Redacted))(Related document(s) #671 ) (Tse, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/29/2022)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 717 NOTICE by Google LLC Regarding August 4 Hearing and Steps Taken to Ensure Compliance (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Glenn Berntson (Redacted))(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 8/29/2022)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 716 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Google's Notice Regarding August 4 Hearing and Steps Taken to Ensure Compliance filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan Tse, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Google's Notice Regarding August 4 Hearing and Steps Taken to Ensure Compliance (Sealed), #4 Declaration of Glenn Berntson (Sealed))(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 8/29/2022)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 715 REPLY (re #662 MOTION to Strike Lasinski Opinion ) filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Viola Trebicka, #2 Exhibit 8 to Trebicka Declaration, #3 Exhibit 9 to Trebicka Declaration (Redacted))(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 8/26/2022)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 714 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Google's Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Opinions of Michael Laisinski filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan Tse in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Google's Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude Lasinski (Sealed), #4 Exhibit 9 to Trebicka Declaration (Sealed))(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 8/26/2022)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 713 REPLY (re #609 MOTION to Certify Class ) PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND APPOINTMENT OF CLASS REPRESENTATIVES AND CLASS COUNSEL filed byChasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Second Decl. of Mao, #2 Redacted - Exhibits. 92-98 to Second Decl. of Mao)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 8/26/2022)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 712 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted - Pltfs' Reply ISO Mtn for Class Cert. (Sealed), #2 Exhibit 92 to Second Decl. of Mao (Sealed), #3 Exhibit 93 to Second Decl. of Mao (Sealed), #4 Exhibit 94 to Second Decl. of Mao (Sealed), #5 Exhibit 95 to Second Decl. of Mao (Sealed), #6 Exhibit 96 to Second Decl. of Mao (Sealed), #7 Exhibit 97 to Second Decl. of Mao (Sealed), #8 Exhibit 98 to Second Decl. of Mao (Sealed))(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 8/26/2022)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 711 REPLY (re #664 MOTION to Strike Schneier Report ) filed byGoogle LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 8/26/2022)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 710 REPLY (re #663 MOTION to Strike Nelson Opinion ) filed byGoogle LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 8/26/2022)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 709 Declaration of Ryan J McGee in Support of #660 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Another Party's Materials re Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed byChasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #660 ) (McGee, Ryan) (Filed on 8/25/2022)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 708 REPLY (re #656 MOTION for Sanctions ) filed byChasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark C. Mao, #2 Exhibit B Redacted, #3 Exhibit C Redacted, #4 Exhibit D. Redacted)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 8/25/2022)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 707 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Reply UNDER SEAL, #2 Declaration of Mark C. Mao, #3 Exhibit B UNDER SEAL, #4 Exhibit C UNDER SEAL, #5 Exhibit D UNDER SEAL)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 8/25/2022)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 706 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to Seal (Dkts. 698, 699, 702, 704) filed by Google LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 8/25/2022)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 705 MOTION to Strike filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. Motion Hearing set for 9/27/2022 02:00 PM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 9/6/2022. Replies due by 9/13/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. Frawley, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of A. Frawley, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of A. Frawley, #4 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of A. Frawley, #5 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of A. Frawley, #6 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of A. Frawley, #7 Exhibits 3, 5, 6, 8, 9, and 11 to Declaration of A. Frawley (Filed Under Seal), #8 Proposed Order)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 8/23/2022)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 704 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 REDACTED Motion to Strike, #2 UNDER SEAL Motion to Strike, #3 REDACTED Decl of Frawley, #4 UNDER SEAL Decl. of Frawley, #5 Exhibit 3 UNDER SEAL, #6 Exhibit 5 UNDER SEAL, #7 Exhibit 6 UNDER SEAL, #8 Exhibit 8 UNDER SEAL, #9 Exhibit 9 UNDER SEAL, #10 Exhibit 11 UNDER SEAL)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 8/23/2022)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 703 MOTION Exclude Portions of Rebuttal Expert Report of Konstantinos Psounis filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt. Motion Hearing set for 9/27/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 9/6/2022. Replies due by 9/13/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark Mao, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 8/23/2022)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 702 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Portions of Rebuttal Expert Report of Konstantinos Psounis, Declaration of Mark Mao, and Exhibits A-B filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Portions of Rebuttal Expert Report of Konstantinos Psounis, #2 Unredacted Declaration of Mark Mao in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Portions of Rebuttal Expert Report of Konstantinos Psounis, #3 Unredacted Exhibit A to Declaration of Mark Mao ISO Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Portions of Rebuttal Expert Report of Konstantinos Psounis, #4 Unredacted Exhibit B to Declaration of Mark Mao ISO Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Portions of Rebuttal Expert Report of Konstantinos Psounis, #5 Unredacted [Proposed] Order re Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Portions of Rebuttal Expert Report of Konstantinos Psounis)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 8/23/2022)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 701 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #664 MOTION to Strike Schneier Report ) filed byChasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. Frawley, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 5, #4 Proposed Order)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 8/19/2022)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 700 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #662 MOTION to Strike Lasinski Opinion ) filed byChasom Brown, William Byatt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Proposed Order)(Yanchunis, John) (Filed on 8/19/2022)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 699 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Version of Opposition, #2 Unredacted Version of Opposition, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 8/19/2022)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 698 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs Response to Googles Motion to Exclude Opinions of Plaintiffs Damages Expert Michael J. Lasinski filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit)(Yanchunis, John) (Filed on 8/19/2022)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 697 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #663 MOTION to Strike Nelson Opinion ) filed byChasom Brown, William Byatt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Yanchunis, John) (Filed on 8/19/2022)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 696 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #656 MOTION for Sanctions ) filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Martin Sramek, #2 Declaration of Viola Trebicka, #3 Exhibit 1 to Trebicka Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 to Trebicka Declaration, #5 Exhibit 3 to Trebicka Declaration, #6 Exhibit 4 to Trebicka Declaration, #7 Exhibit 5 to Trebicka Declaration, #8 Exhibit 6 to Trebicka Declaration, #9 Exhibit 7 to Trebicka Declaration, #10 Exhibit 8 to Trebicka Declaration, #11 Exhibit 9 to Trebicka Declaration, #12 Exhibit 10 to Trebicka Declaration, #13 Exhibit 11 to Trebicka Declaration, #14 Exhibit 12 to Trebicka Declaration, #15 Proposed Order)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 8/18/2022)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 695 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Google's Opposition to Plaintiff's Supplemental Sanctions Brief filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan Tse, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Google's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Sanctions Brief, #4 Declaration of Martin Sramek, #5 Exhibit 1 to Trebicka Declaration, #6 Exhibit 2 to Trebicka Declaration, #7 Exhibit 3 to Trebicka Declaration, #8 Exhibit 4 to Trebicka Declaration, #9 Exhibit 5 to Trebicka Declaration, #10 Exhibit 7 to Trebicka Declaration, #11 Exhibit 10 to Trebicka Declaration)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 8/18/2022)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 694 Sealed Transcript of Digitally Recorded Videoconference Proceedings held on August 4, 2022, before Judge Susan van Keulen. Transcribed by Court Reporter, Marla F. Knox, RPR, CRR, RMR, Telephone number (602) 391-6990/email marla_knox@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (mfk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2022)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 693 *** POSTED IN ERROR *** please see #793 MOTION to Strike #672 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Relief re Google's Production of Documents Improperly Withheld as Privileged Exhibit A to Mao Declaration filed by Google LLC. Motion Hearing set for 9/27/2022 10:00 AM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge. Responses due by 8/30/2022. Replies due by 9/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 8/16/2022) Modified on 11/14/2022 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 692 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #672 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Relief re Google's Production of Documents Improperly Withheld as Privileged ) filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Carl Spilly, #3 Exhibit A - Redacted, #4 Exhibit B - Redacted)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 8/16/2022)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 691 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Google's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion for Relief filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A - Unredacted, #4 Exhibit B - Unredacted)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 8/16/2022)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 690 Declaration of Jonathan Tse in Support of #677 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Renewed Request to Depose Google CEO Sundar Pichai filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Redacted Reply, #3 Exhibit Unredacted Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Unredacted Exhibit EE)(Related document(s) #677 ) (Tse, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/16/2022)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 689 Joint Submission re Sealing Portions of #658 August 5, 2022 Order, filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alyssa G. Olson, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Order)(Related document(s) #658 ) (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 8/15/2022) Modified text on 8/16/2022 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 688 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document (Dkt. 643-5) filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 8/15/2022)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 687 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for SEALED proceedings held on 8/4/2022 before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen by Google LLC, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Tse, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/12/2022) TRANSCRIBER Marla Knox Modified on 8/15/2022 (sp, COURT STAFF).
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 686 ORDER GRANTING #683 STIPULATION FOR RELEASE OF AUGUST 4, 2022 HEARING TRANSCRIPT TO COUNSEL OF RECORD. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 8/12/22. (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2022)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 685 *DISREGARD* SEE ORDER at Dkt #686 . Modified on 8/12/2022 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 684 Declaration of Jonathan Tse in Support of #634 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit - Redacted Request, #3 Exhibit A - redacted, #4 Exhibit E - redacted, #5 Exhibit G - redacted, #6 Exhibit H - redacted, #7 Exhibit L - redacted, #8 Exhibit M - redacted, #9 Exhibit N - redacted, #10 Exhibit O - redacted, #11 Exhibit P - redacted, #12 Exhibit Q - redacted, #13 Exhibit R - redacted, #14 Exhibit S - redacted, #15 Exhibit T - redacted, #16 Exhibit V - redacted, #17 Exhibit Y - redacted, #18 Exhibit Z - redacted, #19 Exhibit - Proposed Order Redacted)(Related document(s) #634 ) (Tse, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/11/2022)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 683 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 652 Discovery Hearing,,, AUTHORIZING RELEASE OF AUGUST 4, 2022 HEARING TRANSCRIPT filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Yanchunis, John) (Filed on 8/11/2022)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 682 Declaration of Jonathan Tse in Support of #655 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Google Motion to Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Sanctions Brief filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Redacted Brief, #3 Exhibit Redacted Thompson Declaration, #4 Exhibit Redacted Mao Declaration, #5 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit A to Mao Declaration, #6 Exhibit Redacted Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #655 ) (Tse, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/11/2022)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 681 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting #670 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2022)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 680 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for SEALED proceedings held on 08/04/2022 before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Yanchunis, John) (Filed on 8/10/2022) TRANSCRIBER Marla Knox Modified on 8/15/2022 (sp, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 679 ORDER granting #676 Stipulation for Extensions of Time re Sealing Declarations and Opposition to Administrative Motion. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 8/10/2022.(svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2022)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 678 REPLY (re #635 MOTION for Discovery PLAINTIFFS RENEWED REQUEST TO DEPOSE GOOGLE CEO SUNDAR PICHAI ) filed byChasom Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EE, #2 Declaration of Rossana Baeza)(Reblitz-Richardson, Beko) (Filed on 8/9/2022)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 677 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Chasom Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Their Renewed Request to Depose Google CEO Sundar Pichai, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit EE, #4 Proposed Order)(Reblitz-Richardson, Beko) (Filed on 8/9/2022)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 676 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #671 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , #660 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Another Party's Materials re Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Chasom Brown. (Ram, Michael) (Filed on 8/9/2022)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 675 NOTICE by Google LLC of Withdrawal of Attorney William Burck (Burck, William) (Filed on 8/9/2022)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 674 ORDER granting #641 #645 #649 Administrative Motions to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 8/9/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2022)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 673 Declaration of Teuta Fani in Support of #649 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Response to Google Motion for Relief filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Redacted Response, #3 Exhibit Redacted Mao Declaration)(Related document(s) #649 ) (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 8/8/2022)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 672 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Relief re Google's Production of Documents Improperly Withheld as Privileged filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. Responses due by 8/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark Mao in support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion for Relief re Google's Production of Documents Improperly Withheld as Privileged, #2 Exhibit A-C, and 1-19 Filed Under Seal, #3 Proposed Order)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 8/8/2022)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 671 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Plaintiff's Administrative Motion for Relief re Google's Production of Documents Improperly Withheld as Privileged, #2 Unredacted Plaintiff's Administrative Motion for Relief re Google's Production of Documents Improperly Withheld as Privileged, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit 1, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit 4, #10 Exhibit 5, #11 Exhibit 6, #12 Exhibit 7, #13 Exhibit 8, #14 Exhibit 9, #15 Exhibit 10, #16 Exhibit 11, #17 Exhibit 12, #18 Exhibit 13, #19 Exhibit 14, #20 Exhibit 15, #21 Exhibit 16, #22 Exhibit 17, #23 Exhibit 18, #24 Exhibit 19)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 8/8/2022)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 670 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17421159.) filed by Google LLC. (Margolies, Joseph) (Filed on 8/8/2022)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 669 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING HEARING. Notice is hereby given that the hearing on the #662 MOTION to Strike Lasinski Opinion & #663 MOTION to Strike Nelson Opinion previously noticed for 8/19/2022 is continued to 9/20/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2022)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Terminated 8/19 hearing. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2022)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 668 EXHIBITS re #664 MOTION to Strike Schneier Report Proposed Order filed byGoogle LLC. (Related document(s) #664 ) (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 8/5/2022)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 667 EXHIBITS re #663 MOTION to Strike Nelson Opinion Proposed Order filed byGoogle LLC. (Related document(s) #663 ) (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 8/5/2022)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 666 EXHIBITS re #665 Opposition/Response to Motion to Certify Class filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Broome Exhibits 1-20, #2 Exhibit Broome Exhibits 21-40, #3 Exhibit Broome Exhibits 41-55, #4 Exhibit Broome Exhibits 56-68, #5 Exhibit Broome Exhibits 69-84, #6 Exhibit Broome Exhibits 85-95, #7 Exhibit Broome Exhibits 96-105, #8 Exhibit Broome Exhibits 106-125, #9 Exhibit Broome Exhibits 126-156, #10 Declaration Ansorge Declaration, #11 Exhibit Ansorge Exhibits 1-2, #12 Declaration McPhie Declaration, #13 Exhibit McPhie Exhibits 1-20, #14 Exhibit McPhie Exhibits 21-24, #15 Exhibit McPhie Exhibits 25-28, #16 Exhibit McPhie Exhibits 29-39, #17 Declaration Ganem Declaration, #18 Declaration Bernston Declaration, #19 Declaration Levitte Declaration, #20 Exhibit Amir Expert Report, #21 Exhibit Psounis Expert Report, #22 Exhibit Schwartz Expert Report, #23 Exhibit Strombom Expert Report, #24 Exhibit Zervas Expert Report)(Related document(s) #665 ) (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 8/5/2022)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 665 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #609 MOTION to Certify Class ) filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 8/5/2022)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 664 MOTION to Strike Schneier Report filed by Google LLC. Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2022 02:00 PM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 8/19/2022. Replies due by 8/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen Broome, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 8/5/2022)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 663 MOTION to Strike Nelson Opinion filed by Google LLC. Motion Hearing set for 8/19/2022 11:59 PM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 8/19/2022. Replies due by 8/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Carl Spilly, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 8/5/2022)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 662 MOTION to Strike Lasinski Opinion filed by Google LLC. Motion Hearing set for 8/19/2022 11:59 PM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 8/19/2022. Replies due by 8/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Viola Trebicka, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Errata 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 8/5/2022)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 661 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Daubert motions filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan Tse, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit - Lasinski Daubert and exhibits, #4 Exhibit - Schenier Daubert)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 8/5/2022)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 660 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Another Party's Materials re Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan Tse, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 10 (Broome), #4 Exhibit 11 (Broome), #5 Exhibit 12 (Broome), #6 Exhibit 13 (Broome), #7 Exhibit 14 (Broome), #8 Exhibit 16 (Broome), #9 Exhibit 21 (Broome), #10 Exhibit 25 (Broome), #11 Exhibit - McPhie Decl)(Tse, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/5/2022)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 659 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Motion for Class Certification filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan Tse, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit - Class Cert Opposition, #4 Exhibit - Broome exhibits, #5 Exhibit - Ansorge Decl and exhibits, #6 Exhibit - McPhie Decl and exhibits, #7 Exhibit - Berntson Decl, #8 Exhibit - Levitte Decl, #9 Exhibit - Amir report and exhibits, #10 Exhibit - Psounis report, #11 Exhibit - Schwartz report, #12 Exhibit - Strombom report, #13 Exhibit - Zervas Report)(Tse, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/5/2022)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 658 REDACTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 8/5/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2022)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 657 Document sealed. ORDER ON (1) GOOGLE'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS FOR EXTENSION/CLARIFICATION OF PRESERVATION PLAN ORDERS; AND (2) CALHOUN PLAINTIFFS' ADMNISTRATIVE MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION OF PRESERVATION PLAN ORDER Re: Brown Dkt. 642; Calhoun Dkt. 787, 810. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 8/5/22. (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2022)Fax emailed to lead counsel.
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 656 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. Responses due by 8/18/2022. Replies due by 8/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Redacted Version of Thompson Declaration, #2 Declaration Redacted Version of Mao Declaration, #3 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit A to the Mao Declaration, #4 Proposed Order Redacted Version of Proposed Order)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 8/4/2022)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 655 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Version of Motion for Sanctions, #2 Unredacted Version of Motion for Sanctions, #3 Redacted Version of Thompson Declaration, #4 Unredacted Version of Thompson Declaration, #5 Redacted Version of Mao Declaration, #6 Unredacted Version of Mao Declaration, #7 Redacted Version of Exhibit A to the Mao Declaration, #8 Unredacted Version Exhibit A to the Mao Declaration, #9 Redacted Version of Proposed Order, #10 Unredacted Version of Proposed Order)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 8/4/2022)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 654 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #635 MOTION for Discovery PLAINTIFFS RENEWED REQUEST TO DEPOSE GOOGLE CEO SUNDAR PICHAI ) filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Proposed Order)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 8/4/2022)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 653 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Google's Response to Plaintiffs' Renewed Request to Depose Sundar Pichai filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Unredacted Version of Google's Response to Plaintiffs' Renewed Request, #3 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 3, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 5, #6 Proposed Order)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 8/4/2022)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 652 Minute Entry for UNDER SEAL proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen: Discovery Hearing held on 8/4/2022 via Zoom.Order to issue.Digital Recording Time: Zoom 9:02-11:19am/12:05-12:34pm (2 hours 46 mins). Plaintiff Attorney: Mark Mao, John Yanchunis, Ryan McGee & Alex Frawley; Plaintiff Representative: Christopher Thompson. Defendant Attorney: Andrew Schapiro, Viola Trebicka, Josef Ansorge, Stephen Broome, Brett Watkins & Jomaire Crawford; Defendant Representatives: Dr. Glenn Berntson, Patrick Quaid, Ben Kornacki, Toni Baker & Nora Puckett. Special Masters: Douglas Brush & Timothy Schmidt. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/4/2022)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 651 CLERK'S NOTICE. In anticipation of the August 4, 2022 hearing, Google is to submit a Word version of the charts in Dkt. 641-3 and 645-3 to SVKCRD@cand.uscourts.gov. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2022)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 650 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #642 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Relief from July 30, 2022 Deadline re #630 Document Sealed , #646 Supplemental ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION UPDATING THE COURT ON GOOGLE'S PRESERVATION IMPLEMENTATION EFFORTS AND SEEKING RELIEF FROM THE JULY 30 DEADLINE IN DKT. 630 ) filed byChasom Brown, William Byatt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark Mao, #2 Proposed Order)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 8/1/2022)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 649 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs' Response to Google's Administrative Motion Dkts. 642, 646, #2 Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Response to Google's Administrative Motion Dkts. 642, 646, #3 Unredacted Version of Mark Mao In Support of Plaintiffs' Response to Google's July 27 Administrative Motion Dkt 642, #4 Redacted Version of Mark Mao In Support of Plaintiffs' Response to Google's July 27 Administrative Motion Dkt 642)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 8/1/2022)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 648 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING SEALED DISCOVERY HEARING ON 8/4/22 AT 9:00 AM VIA ZOOM.Discovery Hearing set for 8/4/2022 09:00 AM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. This proceeding will be held via a Sealed Zoom meeting.Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at SVKcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than August 3, 2022 at 12:00 PM PDT.Parties will then be emailed Judge van Keulen's private Zoom Meeting Link to appear.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2022)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 647 Document sealed. ORDER SETTING VIDEO HEARING ON GOOGLE'S REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION/CLARIFICATION OF PRESERVATION PLAN ORDERS. Re Dkt. Brown 641-3; Calhoun 786-3. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 8/1/22. (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2022)Fax emailed to counsel.
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 646 Supplemental ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION UPDATING THE COURT ON GOOGLE'S PRESERVATION IMPLEMENTATION EFFORTS AND SEEKING RELIEF FROM THE JULY 30 DEADLINE IN DKT. 630 filed by Google LLC. Responses due by 8/2/2022. (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 7/29/2022)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 645 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Google's Supplement to Administrative Motion re Preservation Implementation Efforts and Seeking Relief filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed, #4 Redacted Version of Document Sought to be Sealed)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 7/29/2022)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 644 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on April 21, 2022 before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2022)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 643 Declaration of JONATHAN TSE in Support of #608 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (DKTS. 608, 609) filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Class Certification Motion, #3 Exhibit Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit Trial Plan, # 5 *** DOCUMENT REMOVED PURSUANT TO ORDER ECF875 *** Exhibit Mao Exhibits 1-46, #6 Exhibit Mao Exhibits 51-60, #7 Exhibit Mao Exhibits 61-86, #8 Exhibit Hochman Expert Report, #9 Exhibit Hochman Rebuttal Report, #10 Exhibit Keegan Rebuttal Report, #11 Exhibit Lasinski Expert Report, #12 Exhibit Schneier Expert Report, #13 Exhibit Schneier Rebuttal Report)(Related document(s) #608 ) (Tse, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/27/2022) Modified on 8/15/2022 (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/24/2023 (kab, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 642 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Relief from July 30, 2022 Deadline re #630 Document Sealed filed by Google LLC. Responses due by 8/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin Kornacki, #2 Declaration of Josef Ansorge, #3 Proposed Order)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 7/27/2022)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 641 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Google's Motion re July 15, 2022 Order filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan Tse, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit - Unredacted Motion, #4 Exhibit - Unredacted Kornacki Declaration)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 7/27/2022)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 640 ORDER granting #639 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to File Declaration in Support of Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 7/27/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2022)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 639 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #634 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal to Extend Time to Seal filed by Google LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 7/26/2022)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 638 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the May 3, 2022 Hearing Transcript (Dkt. 627) filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tse, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Redacted Transcript)(Tse, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/25/2022)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 637 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of July 15, 2022 Order Clarifying Preservation Plan (Dkt. 630) filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF HAYRAPETIAN, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Redacted Order)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 7/22/2022)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 636 CLERK'S NOTICE The Court sets the following briefing schedule on Plaintiffs' Renewed Request to Depose Sundar Pichai [Dkt. #635 ]: Response due 8/4/22.Reply due 8/9/22. The Court will set a hearing if necessary. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2022)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 635 MOTION for Discovery PLAINTIFFS RENEWED REQUEST TO DEPOSE GOOGLE CEO SUNDAR PICHAI filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. Responses due by 8/4/2022. Replies due by 8/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rossana Baeza, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z, #28 Exhibit AA, #29 Exhibit BB, #30 Exhibit CC, #31 Exhibit DD, #32 Proposed Order)(Reblitz-Richardson, Beko) (Filed on 7/21/2022)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 634 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Chasom Brown. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Rossana Baeza, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs' Renewed Request to Depose Google CEO Sundar Pichai, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit F, #12 Exhibit G, #13 Exhibit G, #14 Exhibit H, #15 Exhibit H, #16 Exhibit I, #17 Exhibit I, #18 Exhibit J, #19 Exhibit J, #20 Exhibit K, #21 Exhibit K, #22 Exhibit L, #23 Exhibit L, #24 Exhibit M, #25 Exhibit M, #26 Exhibit N, #27 Exhibit N, #28 Exhibit O, #29 Exhibit O, #30 Exhibit P, #31 Exhibit P, #32 Exhibit Q, #33 Exhibit Q, #34 Exhibit R, #35 Exhibit R, #36 Exhibit S, #37 Exhibit S, #38 Exhibit T, #39 Exhibit T, #40 Exhibit U, #41 Exhibit U, #42 Exhibit V, #43 Exhibit V, #44 Exhibit W, #45 Exhibit W, #46 Exhibit X, #47 Exhibit X, #48 Exhibit Y, #49 Exhibit Y, #50 Exhibit Z, #51 Exhibit Z, #52 Exhibit AA, #53 Exhibit AA, #54 Exhibit BB, #55 Exhibit BB, #56 Exhibit CC, #57 Exhibit CC, #58 Exhibit DD, #59 Exhibit DD, #60 Exhibit Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Renewed Request to Depose Google CEO Sundar Pichai, #61 Proposed Order)(Reblitz-Richardson, Beko) (Filed on 7/21/2022)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 633 ORDER granting #612 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 7/15/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2022)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 632 Redaction Order re #630 Sealed Order. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 7/15/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2022)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 631 ORDER ON AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 7/15/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2022)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 630 Document sealed. ORDER CLARIFYING PRESERVATION PLAN Re: Dkt. Nos. 591, 612. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 7/15/22. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1).(jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2022)Fax emailed counsel.
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 629 NOTICE by Chasom Brown, William Byatt re 628 Clerk's Notice, regarding Request for Fees and Costs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter Regarding Fees and Costs)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 7/14/2022)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 628 CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiffs are directed to file on ECF their 7/13/22 cover letter to the Court re their request for fees and costs (without attachments), accompanied by an appropriate administrative motion for leave to file under seal if necessary. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2022)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 627 Sealed Transcript of Proceedings held on 5-3-22, before Judge Susan van Keulen. Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge, email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 7/25/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/4/2022. (las, ) (Filed on 7/7/2022)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 626 ORDER TO SUBMIT DOCUMENTS FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 7/6/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2022)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 625 RESPONSE re #603 Discovery Order Submission re Plaintiffs' Request for Fees and Costs by Google LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 7/1/2022)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 624 ORDER ON #615 PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR FURTHER BRIEFING RE DISCOVERY SANCTIONS. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 7/1/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2022)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 623 Declaration of Jonathan Tse in Support of #614 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Google's Material Should be Sealed filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Redacted Motion, #3 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #614 ) (Tse, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/30/2022)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 622 ORDER GRANTING #621 STIPULATION REGARDING THE ADMISSIBILITY OF CERTAIN DOCUMENTS RELATING TO GOOGLE EMPLOYEE SABINE BORSAY. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 6/29/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2022)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 621 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and (Proposed) Order Regarding the Admissibility of Certain Documents Relating to Google Employee Sabine Borsay filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt. (Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 6/29/2022)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 620 CLERK'S NOTICE: While the Court considers the Parties' submissions at Dkt. Nos. 615 and 618, it will not adopt the immediate deadlines proposed by Plaintiffs. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2022)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 619 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting #617 JOINT STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR GOOGLE TO SUBMIT DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SEAL. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2022)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 618 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #615 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Permission from the Court for limited further briefing regarding Google's response to the Court's sanctions order re #588 Document Sealed, #593 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF ORDER ) filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 6/28/2022)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 617 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #608 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Extending Time to File Sealing Declaration filed by Google LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 6/27/2022)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 616 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF THE APRIL 21, 2022 HEARING TRANSCRIPT filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hayrapetian, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 4-21-22 Hearing Transcript [Redacted], #4 Exhibit 4-21-22 Hearing Transcript [Sealed])(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 6/27/2022)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 615 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Permission from the Court for limited further briefing regarding Google's response to the Court's sanctions order re #588 Document Sealed, #593 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FOR DISCOVERY MISCONDUCT (DKT. 588) Redacted filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt. Responses due by 6/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark Mao, #2 Exhibit A - Filed Separately Under Seal, #3 Exhibit B - Filed Separately Under Seal, #4 Proposed Order)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 6/24/2022)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 614 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Google's Material Should be Sealed filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion Regarding Court's May 20, 2022 Order, #2 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A, #3 Unredacted Version of Exhibit B)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 6/24/2022)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 613 Brief re #604 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 filed byGoogle LLC. (Related document(s) #604 ) (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 6/21/2022)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 612 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Google's Submission in Response to Dkt. 604 filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan Tse, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit - Redacted Submission, #4 Exhibit - Unredacted Submission)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 6/21/2022)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 611 ORDER granting #543 #545 #558 #560 #573 #586 #592 Administrative Motions to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 6/21/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2022)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 610 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting #606 STIPULATION RE: REBUTTAL EXPERT REPORTS. Supplemental expert report limited to rebuttal of Mark Keegan's Rebuttal Survey due by 6/30/2022. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2022)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 609 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 8/5/2022. Replies due by 8/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Trial Plan, #2 Proposed Order Granting Class Certification, #3 Declaration of Chasom Brown, #4 Declaration of Christopher Castillo, #5 Declaration of Jeremy Davis, #6 Declaration of Monique Trujillo, #7 Declaration of William Byatt, #8 Declaration of James Lee, #9 Declaration of John Yanchunis, #10 Declaration of Amanda Bonn, #11 Declaration of Jonathan Hochman, #12 Declaration of Mark Keegan, #13 Declaration of Michael Lasinski, #14 Declaration of David Nelson, #15 Declaration of Bruce Schneier, #16 Declaration of Steven Weisbrot, #17 Declaration of Mark Mao, #18 Exhibit 1 to Mao Decl Redacted, #19 Exhibit 2 to Mao Decl Redacted, #20 Exhibit 3 to Mao Decl Redacted, #21 Exhibit 4 to Mao Decl Redacted, #22 Exhibit 5 to Mao Decl Redacted, #23 Exhibit 6 to Mao Decl Redacted, #24 Exhibit 7 to Mao Decl Redacted, #25 Exhibit 8 to Mao Decl Redacted, #26 Exhibit 9 to Mao Decl Redacted, #27 Exhibit 10 to Mao Decl Redacted, #28 Exhibit 11 to Mao Decl Redacted, #29 Exhibit 12 to Mao Decl Redacted, #30 Exhibit 13 to Mao Decl Redacted, #31 Exhibit 14 to Mao Decl Redacted, #32 Exhibit 15 to Mao Decl, #33 Exhibit 16 to Mao Decl Redacted, #34 Exhibit 17 to Mao Decl Redacted, #35 Exhibit 18 to Mao Decl Redacted, #36 Exhibit 19 to Mao Decl Redacted, #37 Exhibit 20 to Mao Decl Redacted, #38 Exhibit 21 to Mao Decl Redacted, #39 Exhibit 22 to Mao Decl Redacted, #40 Exhibit 23 to Mao Decl Redacted, #41 Exhibit 24 to Mao Decl Redacted, #42 Exhibit 25 to Mao Decl Redacted, #43 Exhibit 26 to Mao Decl Redacted, #44 Exhibit 27 to Mao Decl Redacted, #45 Exhibit 28 to Mao Decl Redacted, #46 Exhibit 29 to Mao Decl Redacted, #47 Exhibit 30 to Mao Decl Redacted, #48 Exhibit 31 to Mao Decl Redacted, #49 Exhibit 32 to Mao Decl Redacted, #50 Exhibit 33 to Mao Decl Redacted, #51 Exhibit 34 to Mao Decl Redacted, #52 Exhibit 35 to Mao Decl Redacted, #53 Exhibit 36 to Mao Decl Redacted, #54 Exhibit 37 to Mao Decl Redacted, #55 Exhibit 38 to Mao Decl Redacted, #56 Exhibit 39 to Mao Decl Redacted, #57 Exhibit 40 to Mao Decl Redacted, #58 Exhibit 41 to Mao Decl Redacted, #59 Exhibit 42 to Mao Decl Redacted, #60 Exhibit 43 to Mao Decl Redacted, #61 Exhibit 44 to Mao Decl Redacted, #62 Exhibit 45 to Mao Decl Redacted, #63 Exhibit 46 to Mao Decl Redacted, #64 Exhibit 47 to Mao Decl Redacted, #65 Exhibit 48 to Mao Decl Redacted, #66 Exhibit 49 to Mao Decl Redacted, #67 Exhibit 50 to Mao Decl Redacted, #68 Exhibit 51 to Mao Decl Redacted, #69 Exhibit 52 to Mao Decl Redacted, #70 Exhibit 53 to Mao Decl Redacted, #71 Exhibit 54 to Mao Decl Redacted, #72 Exhibit 55 to Mao Decl Redacted, #73 Exhibit 56 to Mao Decl Redacted, #74 Exhibit 57 to Mao Decl Redacted, #75 Exhibit 58 to Mao Decl Redacted, #76 Exhibit 59 to Mao Decl Redacted, #77 Exhibit 60 to Mao Decl Redacted, #78 Exhibit 61 to Mao Decl Redacted, #79 Exhibit 62 to Mao Decl Redacted, #80 Exhibit 63 to Mao Decl, #81 Exhibit 64 to Mao Decl Redacted, #82 Exhibit 65 to Mao Decl Redacted, #83 Exhibit 66 to Mao Decl Redacted, #84 Exhibit 67 to Mao Decl Redacted, #85 Exhibit 68 to Mao Decl Redacted, #86 Exhibit 69 to Mao Decl Redacted, #87 Exhibit 70 to Mao Decl Redacted, #88 Exhibit 71 to Mao Decl Redacted, #89 Exhibit 72 to Mao Decl Redacted, #90 Exhibit 73 to Mao Decl Redacted, #91 Exhibit 74 to Mao Decl Redacted, #92 Exhibit 75 to Mao Decl Redacted, #93 Exhibit 76 to Mao Decl Redacted, #94 Exhibit 77 to Mao Decl Redacted, #95 Exhibit 78 to Mao Decl Redacted, #96 Exhibit 79 to Mao Decl Redacted, #97 Exhibit 80 to Mao Decl Redacted, #98 Exhibit 81 to Mao Decl Redacted, #99 Exhibit 82 to Mao Decl Redacted, #100 Exhibit 83 to Mao Decl Redacted, #101 Exhibit 84 to Mao Decl Redacted, #102 Exhibit 85 to Mao Decl Redacted, #103 Exhibit 86 to Mao Decl Redacted, #104 Exhibit 87 to Mao Decl, #105 Exhibit 88 to Mao Decl, #106 Exhibit 89 to Mao Decl, #107 Exhibit 90 to Mao Decl, #108 Exhibit 91 to Mao Decl)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 6/21/2022)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 608 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration McGee, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal, #3 Class Certification Brief, #4 Trial Brief, #5 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Class Certification, #6 Schneier 6/20 Report, #7 Schneier 4/15 Report, #8 Nelson Report, #9 Lasinski Report, #10 Keegan Report, #11 Hochman Report 6/7, #12 Hochman Report 4/15, #13 Exhibit 1, #14 Exhibit 2, #15 Exhibit 3, #16 Exhibit 4, #17 Exhibit 5, #18 Exhibit 6, #19 Exhibit 7, #20 Exhibit 8, #21 Exhibit 9, #22 Exhibit 10, #23 Exhibit 11, #24 Exhibit 12, #25 Exhibit 13, #26 Exhibit 14, #27 Exhibit 16, #28 Exhibit 17, #29 Exhibit 18, #30 Exhibit 19, #31 Exhibit 20, #32 Exhibit 21, #33 Exhibit 22, #34 Exhibit 23, #35 Exhibit 24, #36 Exhibit 25, #37 Exhibit 26, #38 Exhibit 27, #39 Exhibit 28, #40 Exhibit 29, #41 Exhibit 30, #42 Exhibit 31, #43 Exhibit 32, #44 Exhibit 33, #45 Exhibit 34, #46 Exhibit 35, #47 Exhibit 36, #48 Exhibit 37, #49 Exhibit 38, #50 Exhibit 39, #51 Exhibit 40, #52 Exhibit 41, #53 Exhibit 42, #54 Exhibit 43, #55 Exhibit 44, #56 Exhibit 45, #57 Exhibit 46, #58 Exhibit 47, #59 Exhibit 48, #60 Exhibit 49, #61 Exhibit 50, #62 Exhibit 51, #63 Exhibit 52, #64 Exhibit 53, #65 Exhibit 54, #66 Exhibit 55, #67 Exhibit 56, #68 Exhibit 57, #69 Exhibit 58, #70 Exhibit 59, #71 Exhibit 60, #72 Exhibit 61, #73 Exhibit 62, #74 Exhibit 64, #75 Exhibit 65, #76 Exhibit 66, #77 Exhibit 67, #78 Exhibit 68, #79 Exhibit 69, #80 Exhibit 70, #81 Exhibit 71, #82 Exhibit 72, #83 Exhibit 73, #84 Exhibit 74, #85 Exhibit 75, #86 Exhibit 76, #87 Exhibit 77, #88 Exhibit 78, #89 Exhibit 79, #90 Exhibit 80, #91 Exhibit 81, #92 Exhibit 82, #93 Exhibit 83, #94 Exhibit 84, #95 Exhibit 85, #96 Exhibit 86)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 6/21/2022)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 607 RESPONSE re #603 Discovery Order Plaintiffs' Supplement In Support of Request for Reimbursement of Attorneys' Fees and Costs Incurred for Successful Sanctions Motion by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Second Declaration of Mark C. Mao in Support of Plaintiffs' Request for Reimbursement of Attorneys' Fees and Costs Incurred for Successful Sanctions Motion)(Mao, Mark) (Filed on 6/17/2022)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 606 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re: Rebuttal Expert Reports filed by Google LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 6/15/2022)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 605 ORDER RE REASSESSMENT OF DOCUMENTS FOR WHICH PRIVILEGE HAS BEEN CLAIMED AND STRIKING PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 6/10/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2022)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 604 ORDER ON #591 GOOGLE'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION OF MAY 20, 2022 PRESERVATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 6/9/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2022)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 603 ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF FEES AND COSTS INCURRED FOR MOTION FOR DISCOVERY SANCTIONS. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 6/7/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2022)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 602 ORDER granting #565 Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion Regarding Briefing on Renewed Request to Depose Google CEO Sundar Pichai. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 6/7/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2022)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 601 ORDER APPOINTING COMMISSIONERS TO TAKE EVIDENCE PURSUANT TO CHAPTER II, ARTICLE 17 OF THE HAGUE CONVENTION OF 18 MARCH 1970 ON THE TAKING OF EVIDENCE ABROAD IN CIVIL OR COMMERCIAL MATTERS by Judge Susan van Keulen granting #599 Joint Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2022)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 600 APPOINTMENT OF COMMISSIONERS UNDER THE HAGUE CONVENTION AND REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 6/7/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2022)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 599 Joint MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE AND APPOINTMENT OF COMMISSIONERS TO TAKE EVIDENCE PURSUANT TO CHAPTER II, ARTICLE 17 OF THE HAGUE CONVENTION OF 18 MARCH 1970 ON THE TAKING OF EVIDENCE ABROAD IN CIVIL OR COMMERCIAL MATTERS filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit B - Letter of Request)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 6/6/2022)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 598 RESPONSE re #596 Discovery Order Plaintiffs' Update to Administrative Motion Regarding Their Renewed Request to Depose Google CEO Sundar Pichai by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Mao, Hsiao) (Filed on 6/6/2022)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 597 RESPONSE re #588 Document Sealed ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FOR DISCOVERY MISCONDUCT. by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Mao, #2 Proposed Order)(Mao, Hsiao) (Filed on 6/3/2022)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 596 ORDER RE #565 RENEWED REQUEST TO DEPOSE GOOGLE CEO SUNDAR PICHAI. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 6/3/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2022)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 595 EXHIBITS re #594 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal RENEWED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL PORTIONS OF THE MATERIAL ASSOCIATED WITH PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR AN ORDER FOR GOOGLE TO SHOW CAUSE FOR WHY IT SHOULD NOT BE SANCTIONED FOR DISCOVERY MISCONDUCT Exhibit Dkt. 430 filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dkt. 511, #2 Exhibit Dkt. 528, #3 Exhibit Dkt. 536, #4 Exhibit Dkt. 549, #5 Exhibit Dkt. 552, #6 Exhibit Dkt. 583)(Related document(s) #594 ) (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 6/1/2022)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 594 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal RENEWED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL PORTIONS OF THE MATERIAL ASSOCIATED WITH PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR AN ORDER FOR GOOGLE TO SHOW CAUSE FOR WHY IT SHOULD NOT BE SANCTIONED FOR DISCOVERY MISCONDUCT filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hayrapetian, #2 Proposed Order)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 5/31/2022)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 593 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FOR DISCOVERY MISCONDUCT (DKT. 588) filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hayrapetian, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A - Redacted Order, #4 Exhibit B - Sealed Order)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 5/31/2022)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 592 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF ORDER ADOPTING IN PART AND MODIFYING IN PART THE SPECIAL MASTERS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ON REFERRED DISCOVERY ISSUES RE PRESERVATION PLAN (DKT. 587) filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hayrapetian, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A - Redacted Order, #4 Exhibit B - Sealed Order)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 5/31/2022)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 591 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Clarification of May 20, 2022 Preservation Order re #587 Document Sealed, filed by Google LLC. Responses due by 5/31/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 5/27/2022)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 590 Declaration of Jonathan Tse in Support of Sealing Dkts. 582, 583 filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - redacted, #3 Exhibit B - redacted)(Tse, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/23/2022)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 589 REDACTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 5/20/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2022)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 588 Document sealed. ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FOR DISCOVERY MISCONDUCT. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 5/20/22. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2022) Fax emailed to counsel.
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 587 Document sealed. ORDER ADOPTING IN PART AND MODIFYING IN PART THE SPECIAL MASTERS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ON REFERRED DISCOVERY ISSUES RE PRESERVATION PLAN. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 5/20/22. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2022) Fax emailed to counsel.
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 586 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF THE MARCH 17, 2022 HEARING TRANSCRIPT filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hayrapetian, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A - Redacted, #4 Exhibit B - Sealed)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 5/19/2022)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 585 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #583 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION re #430 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Why it Should Not be Sanctioned for Discovery Misconduct ) filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 5/19/2022)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 584 Declaration of Jonathan Tse in Support of #573 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit - Redacted Response)(Related document(s) #573 ) (Tse, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/16/2022)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 583 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION re #430 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Why it Should Not be Sanctioned for Discovery Misconduct filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. Responses due by 5/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark Mao, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order)(Mao, Hsiao) (Filed on 5/16/2022)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 582 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark Mao (Redacted), #2 Declaration of Mark Mao (Unredacted), #3 Exhibit A (Redacted), #4 Exhibit A (Unredacted), #5 Exhibit B (Redacted), #6 Exhibit B (Unredacted))(Mao, Hsiao) (Filed on 5/16/2022)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 581 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting #576 Stipulation. Google's rebuttals to Jonathan E. Hochman's opening report and certain sections of Bruce Schneier's opening report; and Plaintiffs' rebuttals to Dr. Georgios Zervas due by 6/7/2022. Class Certification Motion due by 6/20/2022. Response due by 8/5/2022. Reply due by 8/26/2022. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2022)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 580 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/03/2022 before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Frawley, Alexander) (Filed on 5/12/2022)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 579 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/3/22 before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen by Google LLC, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Tse, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/12/2022)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 578 ORDER granting #577 Stipulation Authorizing Release of May 3, 2022 Transcript to Counsel of Record. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 5/12/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2022)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 577 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Authorizing Release of May 3, 2022 Hearing Transcript filed by Google LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 5/12/2022)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 576 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Deadlines for Expert Discovery and Class Certification filed by Google LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 5/11/2022)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 575 SEALED Transcript of Proceedings held on March 17, 2022, before Judge Susan van Keulen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408 287-4580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 5/31/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/7/2022. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2022)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 574 RESPONSE re #566 Letter Brief Re: Privilege Re-Review by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 5/9/2022)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 573 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Response To Googles Submission Re: Privilege Re-Review, #2 UNDER SEAL Response To Googles Submission Re: Privilege Re-Review)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 5/9/2022)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 572 Minute Entry for UNDER SEAL proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen: Discovery Hearing held on 5/3/2022 via Zoom.All parties appeared via Zoom. Court to issue order.Total Time in Court: 1:05-2:24pm/2:39-2:56pm (1 hour 36 mins). Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. Plaintiff Attorney: Amanda Bonn, Mark Mao, John Yanchunis, Ryan McGee, Alex Frawley, Alison Anderson, Beko Richardson, Ryan Sila, Erika Nyborg-Burch & Michael Ram (Plaintiff's representatives: Christopher Thompson & Lillian Dai). Defendant Attorney: Andrew Schapiro, Stephen Broome, Viola Trebicka, Josef Ansorge & Tracy Gao. Special Master Team: Douglas Brush & Timothy Schmidt. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/4/2022)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 571 ORDER granting #569 Administrative Motion to Seal Courtroom for May 3, 2022 Discovery Hearing. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 5/3/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2022)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 570 Declaration of Jonathan Tse in Support of #560 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit - Redacted Response, #3 Exhibit - Redacted Declaration)(Related document(s) #560 ) (Tse, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/2/2022)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 569 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the Courtroom for May 3, 2022 Hearing filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Jonathan Tse)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 5/2/2022)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 568 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4-21-22, before Judge Susan van Keulen. Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge, email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #556 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/1/2022. (Related documents(s) #556 ) (las, ) (Filed on 5/2/2022)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 567 ORDER RE MAY 3, 2022 DISCOVERY HEARING. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 5/2/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2022)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 566 Letter Brief re #542 Discovery Order filed byGoogle LLC. (Related document(s) #542 ) (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 4/29/2022)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 565 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Regarding Renewed Request to Depose Google CEO Sundar Pichai re #523 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. Responses due by 5/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rossana Baeza, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order)(Mao, Hsiao) (Filed on 4/29/2022)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 564 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING 5/3/22 IN PERSON DISCOVERY HEARING FROM 2:00PM TO 1:00PM VIA ZOOM. The In Person Discovery Hearing set for 5/3/2022 at 2:00pm is continued to 5/3/2022 at 1:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen and will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/svk Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at SVKcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than May 2, 2022 at 2:00 PM PDT.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2022)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 563 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding April 21, 2022 Hearing Exhibits filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 4/27/2022)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 562 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/21/2022 before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Yanchunis, John) (Filed on 4/27/2022)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 561 OBJECTIONS to re #544 Objection to Special Master Preservation Order by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Thompson)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 4/25/2022)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 560 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 REDACTED Plaintiffs Response to Googles Objections to Special Master Preservation Order, #2 UNDER SEAL Plaintiffs Response to Googles Objections to Special Master Preservation Order, #3 REDACTED Thompson Declaration, #4 UNDER SEAL Thompson Declaration)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 4/25/2022)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 559 Statement re #546 Objection, by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard Harting, #2 Declaration of Viola Trebicka, #3 Exhibit 1)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 4/25/2022)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 558 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Google's Responses to Plaintiffs' Objections filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Jonathan Tse, #3 Exhibit - Redacted Responses, #4 Exhibit - Unredacted Responses, #5 Exhibit - Redacted Harting Declaration, #6 Exhibit - Unredacted Harting Declaration, #7 Exhibit 1 - Redacted, #8 Exhibit 1 - Unredacted)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 4/25/2022)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 557 Declaration of JONATHAN TSE in Support of #551 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law)(Related document(s) #551 ) (Tse, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/25/2022)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 556 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/21/22 before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen by Google LLC, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Tse, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/25/2022)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 555 Declaration of JONATHAN TSE in Support of #545 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs Objections To The Special Masters Report and Recommendation filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Objections - Redacted, #3 Exhibit Mao Ex. 1 - Redacted, #4 Exhibit Thompson Decl - Redacted, #5 Exhibit Thompson Ex. A - Redacted, #6 Exhibit Thompson Ex. B - Redacted)(Related document(s) #545 ) (Tse, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/22/2022)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 554 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen: Evidentiary Hearing re Dkt. #430 held on 4/21/2022.Matter taken under submission.Total Time in Court: 5 hours 17 minutes. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. Plaintiff Attorney: David Boies, Alison Anderson, John Yanchunis, Ryan McGee & Mark Mao. Defendant Attorney: Viola Trebicka, Josef Ansorge & Andrew Schapiro. Special Master: Douglas Brush & Timothy Schmidt. (Attachments: #1 Evidentiary Hearing Log)(jhf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/22/2022)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 553 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting #537 JOINT STIPULATION RE: GOOGLE'S PRODUCTION OF DASHBOARD DATA AND PLAINTIFFS' DAMAGES EXPERT REPORT.(amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2022)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 552 Proposed Findings of Fact by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen REDACTED. (Mao, Hsiao) (Filed on 4/18/2022)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 551 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Finding of Facts and Conclusions of Law, #2 REDACTED Finding of Facts and Conclusions of Law)(Mao, Hsiao) (Filed on 4/18/2022)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 550 Declaration of JONATHAN TSE in Support of #535 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SANCTIONS filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Reply - Redacted, #3 Exhibit Mao Reply Declaration - Redacted, #4 Exhibit Mao Exhibits 1-6 - Redacted, #5 Exhibit Thompson Reply Declaration - Redacted, #6 Exhibit Thompson Exhibits B-1-D)(Related document(s) #535 ) (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 4/18/2022)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 549 Proposed Findings of Fact by Google LLC ON PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR AN ORDER FOR GOOGLE TO SHOW CAUSE FOR WHY IT SHOULD NOT BE SANCTIONED FOR DISCOVERY MISCONDUCT (re Dkt. 528). (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 4/18/2022)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 548 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF GOOGLE LLCS PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tse, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1 - Redacted, #4 Exhibit 2 - Sealed)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 4/18/2022)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 547 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting #539 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2022)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 546 OBJECTIONS to re #524 Document Sealed, SPECIAL MASTERS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ON REFERRED DISCOVERY ISSUES (PRESERVATION PLAN) by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Mao, #2 Exhibit 1 to Mao Decl., #3 Declaration of C. Thompson, #4 Exhibit A to Thompson Decl., #5 Exhibit B to Thompson Decl., #6 Proposed Order)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 4/15/2022)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 545 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs Objections To The Special Masters Report and Recommendation filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Objection to Special Master Preservation Plan REDACTED, #2 Objection to Special Master Preservation Plan UNDER SEAL, #3 Declaration of M. Mao, #4 Exhibit 1 to Mao Decl. REDACTED, #5 Exhibit 1 to Mao Decl. UNDER SEAL, #6 Declaration of Thompson REDACTED, #7 Declaration of Thompson Decl. UNDER SEAL, #8 Exhibit A to Thompson Decl. REDACTED, #9 Exhibit A to Thompson Decl. UNDER SEAL, #10 Exhibit B to Thompson Decl.REDACTED, #11 Exhibit B to Thompson Decl. UNDER SEAL, #12 Proposed Order re Objection REDACTED, #13 Proposed Order re Objection UNDER SEAL)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 4/15/2022)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 544 OBJECTIONS to re #524 Document Sealed, SPECIAL MASTERS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ON REFERRED DISCOVERY ISSUES (PRESERVATION PLAN) by Google LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 4/15/2022)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 543 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF GOOGLE LLCS OBJECTIONS TO SPECIAL MASTERS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ON REFERRED DISCOVERY ISSUES (PRESERVATION PLAN) filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tse, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A - Redacted, #4 Exhibit B - Sealed)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 4/15/2022)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 542 ORDER REGARDING RE-ASSESSMENT OF DOCUMENTS FOR WHICH PRIVILEGE HAS BEEN CLAIMED. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 4/15/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2022)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 541 ORDER REGARDING #533 PRIVILEGE DISPUTE RE REDACTIONS. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 4/15/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2022)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 540 ORDER on on #484 #509 #516 #518 #534 Administrative Motions for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 4/14/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2022)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 539 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-17087506.) filed by Google LLC. (Fortenbery, Donald) (Filed on 4/14/2022)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 538 NOTICE of Appearance by Alison Lynn Anderson (Anderson, Alison) (Filed on 4/14/2022)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 537 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Google's Production of Dashboard Data and Plaintiff's Damages Expert Report filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 4/14/2022)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 536 REPLY (re #430 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Why it Should Not be Sanctioned for Discovery Misconduct ) filed byChasom Brown, William Byatt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Mao REDACTED, #2 Exhibit 1 REDACTED, #3 Exhibit 2 REDACTED, #4 Exhibit 3 REDACTED, #5 Exhibit 4 REDACTED, #6 Exhibit 5 REDACTED, #7 Exhibit 6 REDACTED, #8 Declaration Thompson REDACTED, #9 Exhibit A Thompson CV, #10 Exhibit B REDACTED, #11 Exhibit B-1 REDACTED, #12 Exhibit B-2 REDACTED, #13 Exhibit C REDACTED, #14 Exhibit D REDACTED)(Mao, Hsiao) (Filed on 4/12/2022)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 535 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt. (Attachments: #1 Reply Brief UNDER SEAL, #2 Reply Brief REDACTED, #3 Declaration Mao UNDER SEAL, #4 Declaration Mao REDACTED, #5 Exhibit 1 to Mao Declaration UNDER SEAL, #6 Exhibit 1 to Mao Declaration REDACTED, #7 Exhibit 2 to Mao Declaration UNDER SEAL, #8 Exhibit 2 to Mao Declaration REDACATED, #9 Exhibit 3 to Mao Declaration UNDER SEAL, #10 Exhibit 3 to Mao Declaration REDACTED, #11 Exhibit 4 to Mao Declaration UNDER SEAL, #12 Exhibit 4 to Mao Declaration REDACTED, #13 Exhibit 5 to Mao Declaration UNDER SEAL, #14 Exhibit 5 to Mao Declaration REDACTED, #15 Exhibit 6 to Mao Declaration UNDER SEAL, #16 Exhibit 6 to Mao Declaration REDACTED, #17 Declaration Thomspson UNDER SEAL, #18 Declaration Thompson REDACTED, #19 Exhibit A to Thompson Decl., #20 Exhibit B to Thompson Decl. UNDER SEAL, #21 Exhibit B to Thompson Decl. REDACTED, #22 Exhibit B-1 to Thompson Decl. UNDER SEAL, #23 Exhibit B-1 to Thompson Decl. REDACTED, #24 Exhibit B-2 to Thompson Decl. UNDER SEAL, #25 Exhibit B-2 to Thompson Decl. REDACTED, #26 Exhibit C to Thompson Decl. UNDER SEAL, #27 Exhibit C to Thompson Decl. REDACATED SEAL, #28 Exhibit D to Thompson Decl. UNDER SEAL, #29 Exhibit D to Thompson Decl. REDACTED)(Mao, Hsiao) (Filed on 4/12/2022)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 534 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF SPECIAL MASTERS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ON REFERRED DISCOVERY ISSUES (PRESERVATION PLAN) IN RESPONSE TO DKT. NOS. 524, 525 filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tse, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A - Redacted Order, #4 Exhibit B - Sealed Order)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 4/11/2022)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 533 Discovery Letter Brief Re: In Camera Review and Re-review Proposal filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 4/11/2022)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 532 Order to Provide Chambers Copies of Briefing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Order to Show Cause re Sanctions. Copies to be delivered to San Jose Courthouse by 4/13/2022 - see order for instructions. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 4/11/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2022)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 531 ANSWER to THIRD AMENDED Complaint Dkt. #395 -2 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT by Google LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 4/8/2022) Modified on 4/11/2022 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 530 EXHIBITS re #528 Opposition/Response to Motion,, CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [528-2] and [528-4] filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Leung Declaration)(Related document(s) #528 ) (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 4/8/2022)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 529 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF GOOGLE LLCS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR AN ORDER FOR GOOGLE TO SHOW CAUSE FOR WHY IT SHOULD NOT BE SANCTIONED FOR DISCOVERY MISCONDUCT - CORRECTION OF DOCKET #527 , [527-2], [527-7] and [527-11]. filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Ansorge Ex 3-39, #3 Exhibit Leung Declaration)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 4/8/2022)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 528 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #430 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Why it Should Not be Sanctioned for Discovery Misconduct ) filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ansorge, #2 ***POSTED IN ERROR ***Exhibit Ansorge Ex 1-39, #3 Declaration of Liao, #4 ***POSTED IN ERROR ***Exhibit Declaration of Leung**TEMPORARILY LOCKED**, #5 Declaration of Golueke, #6 Declaration of Trebicka, #7 Exhibit Trebicka Ex 1-51, #8 Proposed Order)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 4/5/2022) Modified on 4/8/2022. Counsel Requested Attachment 4 Temporarily Locked (dhm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/8/2022 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 527 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF GOOGLE LLCS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR AN ORDER FOR GOOGLE TO SHOW CAUSE FOR WHY IT SHOULD NOT BE SANCTIONED FOR DISCOVERY MISCONDUCT filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tse, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Opposition - REDACTED, #4 Exhibit Opposition - UNREDACTED, #5 Exhibit Ansorge Decl - REDACTED, #6 Exhibit Ansorge Decl - UNREDACTED, #7 Exhibit Ansorge Ex. 1-39 - REDACTED, #8 Exhibit Ansorge Ex. 1-39 - UNREDACTED, #9 Exhibit Liao Decl - REDACTED, #10 Exhibit Liao Decl - UNREDACTED, #11 Exhibit Leung Decl - REDACTED**TEMPORARILY LOCKED**, #12 Exhibit Leung Decl - UNREDACTED, #13 Exhibit Golueke Decl - REDACTED, #14 Exhibit Golueke Decl - UNREDACTED, #15 Exhibit Trebicka Ex. 1-50 - REDACTED, #16 Exhibit Trebicka Ex. 1-50 - UNREDACTED)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 4/5/2022) Modified on 4/8/2022. Counsel Requested Attachment 11 Temporarily Locked (dhm, COURT STAFF).
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 526 Scheduling Order re Special Master's April 4, 2022 Report and Recommendation. Objections due by 4/15/2022. Responses to Objections due by 4/25/2022. Hearing set for 5/3/2022 02:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor before Judge Susan van Keulen.Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 4/4/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2022)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 525 Redaction Order. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 4/4/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2022)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 524 Document sealed. SPECIAL MASTERS REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ON REFERRED DISCOVERY ISSUES (Preservation Plan). Signed by Special Master Douglas A. Brush on 4/4/22. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2022) Modified on 4/4/2022 (jhf, COURT STAFF). Fax emailed to counsel.
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 523 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers GRANTING #382 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE RE SUNDAR PICHAI'S DEPOSITION; DENYING #375 MOTION WITH RESPECT TO LORRAINE TWOHILL'S DEPOSITION. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2022)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 522 ORDER RE #517 Dispute re Privilege Logs (P25). Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 4/1/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2022)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 521 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #519 Stipulation Continuing Deadlines for Expert Discovery and Class Certification. Opening Reports due by 4/15/2022. Rebuttal Reports due by 5/20/2022. Class Certification Motion due by 6/16/2022. Response due by 8/4/2022. Close of Expert Discovery due by 8/25/2022. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2022)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 520 Declaration of Jonathan Tse in Support of #510 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Motion, #3 Redacted Declaration, #4 Redacted Exhibit 1, #5 Redacted Exhibit 2, #6 Redacted Exhibit 3, #7 Redacted Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) #510 ) (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 3/28/2022)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 519 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Deadlines for Expert Discovery and Class Certification filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 3/28/2022)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 518 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Dkts. 487 and 505 filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan Tse, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Dkt. 487, #4 Redacted Dkt. 505)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 3/28/2022)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 517 Letter Brief re #487 Document Sealed JOINT LETTER BRIEF IN RESPONSE TO ORDER RE PRIVILEGE DISPUTE (DKT. 487-1, DISPUTE P25) filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #487 ) (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 3/25/2022)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF JOINT LETTER BRIEF IN RESPONSE TO ORDER RE PRIVILEGE DISPUTE (DKT. 487-1, DISPUTE P25) filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tse, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A - SEALED, #4 Exhibit B - Redacted)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 3/25/2022)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 515 ORDER REGARDING DOCUMENTS SUBMITTED FOR IN-CAMERA REVIEW re: #456 #468 #486 . Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 3/24/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2022)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 514 Declaration of Jonathan Tse in Support of #429 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Request for OSC filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Redacted Motion, #3 Redacted Declaration, #4 Redacted Exhibit 1, #5 Redacted Exhibit 2, #6 Redacted Exhibit 3, #7 Redacted Exhibit 4, #8 Redacted Exhibit 8, #9 Redacted Exhibit 9, #10 Redacted Exhibit 10, #11 Redacted Exhibit 11, #12 Redacted Exhibit 12, #13 Redacted Exhibit 14, #14 Redacted Exhibit 15, #15 Redacted Exhibit 16, #16 Redacted Exhibit 17, #17 Redacted Exhibit 18, #18 Redacted Exhibit 19, #19 Redacted Exhibit 20, #20 Redacted Exhibit 21, #21 Redacted Exhibit 22, #22 Redacted Exhibit 23, #23 Redacted Exhibit 24, #24 Redacted Exhibit 25)(Related document(s) #429 ) (Tse, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/23/2022)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 513 Declaration of JONATHAN TSE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SANCTIONS (DKTS. 494, 495) filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Sanctions Supplement - Redacted, #3 Exhibit Mao Declaration - Redacted, #4 Exhibit 1 - Redacted, #5 Exhibit 2 - Redacted, #6 Exhibit 3 - Redacted, #7 Exhibit 4 - Redacted)(Tse, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/23/2022)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 512 ORDER granting #511 Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion for Leave to Supplement Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 3/22/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2022)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 511 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to File Supplement in Support of Their Motion for Order Requiring Google to Show Cause Why It Should Not Be Sanctioned for Discovery Misconduct re #430 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Why it Should Not be Sanctioned for Discovery Misconduct, #508 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt. Responses due by 3/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark C. Mao in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Supplement in Support of Their Request for Order Requiring Google to Show Cause, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Proposed Order)(Mao, Hsiao) (Filed on 3/21/2022)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 510 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted - Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Supplement in Support of Their Motion for Order Requiring Google to Show Cause Why it Should Not be Sanctioned for Discovery Misconduct, #2 Redacted - Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Supplement in Support of Their Motion for Order Requiring Google to Show Cause Why it Should Not be Sanctioned for Discovery Misconduct, #3 Unredacted Declaration of Mark C. Mao, #4 Redacted Declaration of Mark C. Mao, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1, #6 Redacted Version of Exhibit 1, #7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2, #8 Redacted Version of Exhibit 2, #9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 3, #10 Redacted Version of Exhibit 3, #11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 4, #12 Redacted Version of Exhibit 4, #13 Proposed Order)(Mao, Hsiao) (Filed on 3/21/2022)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 509 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Dkts. 480, 481 filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan Tse, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Exhibit A)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 3/21/2022)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 508 ORDER re #494 #495 Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief re Motion for an Order to Show Cause re Sanctions. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 3/21/2022.(svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2022)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 507 Declaration of JONATHAN TSE in Support of #484 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal TO CONSIDER WHETHER ANOTHER PARTYS MATERIAL SHOULD BE SEALED RE: STATUS OF DISCOVERY DISPUTES (DKT. 484) filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Discovery Chart - Redacted, #3 Exhibit A - Redacted)(Related document(s) #484 ) (Tse, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/18/2022)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 506 REDACTION ORDER re #487 #505 3/15/2022 and 3/18/2022 Discovery Orders. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 3/18/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2022)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 505 Document sealed. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 3/18/22. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2022)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 504 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting #395 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2022)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 503 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on March 17, 2022 before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Frawley, Alexander) (Filed on 3/17/2022)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 502 ORDER INSTRUCTING PARTIES RE FUTURE SEALING MOTIONS; ORDER ON #410 #423 #436 #452 #455 #463 #469 #470 #475 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 3/17/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2022)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 501 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/17/22 before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen by Google LLC, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Tse, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/17/2022)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 500 ORDER granting #499 Stipulation Authorizing Release of Transcript of 3/17/2022 Discovery Hearing to Counsel of Record. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 3/17/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2022)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 499 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #491 Order on Stipulation to Release March 17, 2022 Hearing Transcript filed by Google LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 3/17/2022)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 498 Minute Entry for UNDER SEAL proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen: Discovery Hearing held on 3/17/2022 via Zoom.All parties appeared via Zoom. Court to issue order.Digital Recording Time: 10:08-10:27am/12:14-12:21pm (23 mins). Plaintiff Attorney: John Yanchunis, Amanda Bonn, Mark Mao, Beko Richardson, Rossana Baeza, Ryan Sila, Erika Nyborg-Burch & Alex Frawley. Defendant Attorney: Andrew Scharpiro, Stephen Broome, Viola Trebicka, Jomaire Crawford, Josef Ansorge, Sara Jenkins, Marie Hayrapetian, Aly Olson, Seth Fortenbery & Brett Watkins. Special Master Douglas Brush with Timothy Schmidt. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/17/2022)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 497 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting #492 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2022)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 496 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting #474 Stipulation. Opening Reports due by 4/1/2022. Proposed Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law for Sanctions Motion due by 4/18/2022. Rebuttal Reports due by 5/6/2022. Close of Expert Discovery due by 6/2/2022. Motions due by 6/9/2022. Responses due by 7/28/2022. Replies due by 8/25/2022. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2022)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines as to #430 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Why it Should Not be Sanctioned for Discovery Misconduct. Response due by 3/31/2022. Reply due by 4/11/2022. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2022)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 495 MOTION PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENT IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR ORDER REQUIRING GOOGLE TO SHOW CAUSE WHY IT SHOULD NOT BE SANCTIONED FOR DISCOVERY MISCONDUCT re #430 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Why it Should Not be Sanctioned for Discovery Misconduct filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt. Responses due by 3/31/2022. Replies due by 4/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark C. Mao in Support of Plaintiffs' Order to Show Cause Motion, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Mao, Hsiao) (Filed on 3/16/2022)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 494 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Unredacted Version, #2 Supplement Redacted Version, #3 Declaration Unredacted Version, #4 Declaration Redacted Version, #5 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 1, #7 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 2, #9 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 3, #10 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 3, #11 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit 4, #12 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit 4)(Mao, Hsiao) (Filed on 3/16/2022)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 493 NOTICE of Appearance by Marie M Hayrapetian (Hayrapetian, Marie) (Filed on 3/16/2022)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 492 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Ryan Sila ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16998854.) filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Sila, Ryan) (Filed on 3/16/2022)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 491 ORDER granting Google's Administrative Motion to Seal Courtroom for March 17, 2022 Discovery Hearing. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 3/16/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2022)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 490 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 477 Clerk's Notice,, to Seal Courtroom for March 17, 2022 Hearing filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan Tse, #2 Proposed Order)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 3/16/2022)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 489 ORDER GRANTING #488 STIPULATION FURTHER EXTENDING TIME FOR GOOGLE TO SUBMIT DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 3/16/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2022)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 488 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #448 Order on Stipulation Extending Time to Seal filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan Tse)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 3/15/2022)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 487 Document sealed. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 3/15/22. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2022)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 486 Discovery Letter Brief re in Camera Review filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Josef Ansorge, #2 Declaration of Toni Baker, #3 Declaration of Ryan Blackhart, #4 Declaration of Wing Pan "Bert" Leung, #5 Declaration of Noelle Kvasnosky Luiten)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 3/14/2022)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 485 Letter Brief Joint Submission in Response to Dkt 447 re: Status of Discovery Dispute filed byChasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 3/14/2022)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 484 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Joint Submission in Response to DKT 447 re: Status of Discovery Disputes, #2 Exhibit A - Unredacted, #3 Redacted Joint Submission in Response to DKT 447 re: Status of Discovery Disputes, #4 Exhibit A - Redacted)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 3/14/2022)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 483 Declaration of Audrey An in Support of #479 Order on Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory, #478 Discovery Order filed byGoogle LLC. (Related document(s) #479 , #478 ) (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 3/14/2022)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 482 Declaration of JONATHAN TSE in Support of #460 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint (R. Civ. P. 15(a)) filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Reply - Redacted, #3 Exhibit Redacted)(Related document(s) #460 ) (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 3/14/2022)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 481 Redaction Order. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 3/14/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2022)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 480 Document sealed. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 3/14/22. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2022)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 479 ORDER APPOINTING COMMISSIONERS TO TAKE EVIDENCE PURSUANT TO CHAPTER II, ARTICLE 17 OF THE HAGUE CONVENTION OF 18 MARCH 1970 ON THE TAKING OF EVIDENCE ABROAD IN CIVIL OR COMMERCIAL MATTERS;granting #476 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 3/14/2022.(svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2022)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 478 APPOINTMENT OF COMMISSIONERS UNDER THE HAGUE CONVENTION AND REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 3/14/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2022)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 477 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING 3/15/22 DISCOVERY HEARING; 3/17/22 DISCOVERY HEARING REMAINS AS SET. In light of parties' imminent discovery deadlines, the hearing on 3/15 is vacated. Hearing on 3/17 will proceed as noticed.Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required o f counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at SVKcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than March 16, 2022 at 12:00PM PDT. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2022)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 476 Joint MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory FOR ISSUANCE OF LETTER OF REQUEST FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE AND APPOINTMENT OF COMMISSIONERS TO TAKE EVIDENCE PURSUANT TO CHAPTER II, ARTICLE 17 OF THE HAGUE CONVENTION OF 18 MARCH 1970 ON THE TAKING OF EVIDENCE ABROAD IN CIVIL OR COMMERCIAL MATTERS filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Letter of Request, #2 Proposed Order)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 3/14/2022)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 475 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the February 28, 2022 Hearing Transcript filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan Tse, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted transcript, #4 Unredacted transcript)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 3/10/2022)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 474 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #465 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, #443 Discovery Order Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Continuing Deadlines for Discovery and Class Certification filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt. (Mao, Hsiao) (Filed on 3/10/2022)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 473 NOTICE by Google LLC of Withdrawal of Attorney Thao T. Thai (Olson, Alyssa) (Filed on 3/10/2022)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 472 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Authenticity of Documents filed by Google LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 3/8/2022)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 471 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #457 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROPOSE REVISED BRIEFING SCHEDULE re #443 Discovery Order, #430 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Why it Should Not be Sanctioned for Discovery Misconduct ) filed byChasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Mao, Hsiao) (Filed on 3/8/2022)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 470 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Dkts. 437, 438 filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan Tse, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit - redacted)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 3/8/2022)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 469 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Dkts. 447, 449 filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan Tse, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit - redacted)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 3/8/2022)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 468 ORDER IN RE SUBMISSION OF DOCUMENTS FOR IN-CAMERA REVIEW re #456 Discovery Letter Brief. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 3/7/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2022)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 467 NOTICE of Appearance by Alyssa G Olson (Olson, Alyssa) (Filed on 3/7/2022)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 466 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING OF DISCOVERY HEARINGS TO ADDRESS OPEN DISCOVERY ISSUES AS NECESSARY.Discovery Hearings set for 3/15/2022 & 3/17/2022 10:00 AM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. These proceedings will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ svk Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at SVKcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than March 14, 2022 at 12:00PM PDT.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.g ov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2022)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 465 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Opening Reports due by 3/25/2022. Rebuttal Reports due by 4/22/2022. Close of Expert Discovery due by 5/26/2022. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/7/2022. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2022)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 464 Discovery Letter Briefre RFA and Interrogatory Disputes filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 3/4/2022)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 463 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Letter Brief re RFA and Interrogatory Disputes filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan Tse, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit - letter brief redacted, #4 Exhibit - letter brief unredacted, #5 Exhibit A - redacted, #6 Exhibit A - unredacted)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 3/4/2022)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 462 Letter Brief RE: GOOGLES RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 3/4/2022)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 461 REPLY (re #395 MOTION for Leave to File to Amend Complaint (R. CIV. P. 15(a)) ) Redacted filed byChasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amanda Bonn, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Proposed Order)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 3/4/2022)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 460 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint (R. Civ. P. 15(a)) filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Version of Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint (R. Civ. P. 15(a)), #2 Unredacted Version of Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint (R. Civ. P. 15(a)), #3 Redacted Version of Exhibit 2, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 3/4/2022)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 459 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal In Support of Motion to Seal Joint Discovery Chart (Dkt. 423) filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit - redacted, #3 Exhibit - unredacted)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 3/4/2022)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 458 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING HEARING. Notice is hereby given that the hearing on the #395 MOTION for Leave to File to Amend Complaint (R. CIV. P. 15(a)) previously set for 3/15/2022 is continued to 3/22/2022 at 2:00 p.m. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Motion Hearing set for 3/22/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2022)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 457 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROPOSE REVISED BRIEFING SCHEDULE re #443 Discovery Order, #430 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Why it Should Not be Sanctioned for Discovery Misconduct filed by Google LLC. Responses due by 3/8/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Trebicka, #2 Proposed Order)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 3/4/2022)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 456 Discovery Letter Brief re In Camera Review filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 3/4/2022)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 455 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Letter Brief re In Camera Review filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan Tse, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit - redacted, #4 Exhibit - unredacted)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 3/4/2022)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 454 Further Order re Discovery Dispute P23. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 3/4/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Chart of Discovery Rulings)(svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2022)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 453 Statement re #450 Order on Discovery Letter Brief re P23 by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan Tse, #2 Exhibit A - redacted)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 3/2/2022)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 452 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal P23 Submission filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan Tse, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A - redacted, #4 Exhibit A - unredacted)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 3/2/2022)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 451 Sealed Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/28/2022, before Judge Susan Van Keulen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 3/21/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/30/2022. (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 3/2/2022)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 450 ORDER ON DISCOVERY DISPUTES P23, P28, AND P30. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 3/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Chart of Discovery Rulings)(svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2022)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 449 REDACTION ORDER re #447 Sealed Discovery Order. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 3/2/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2022)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 448 ORDER granting #445 Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Submission of Declaration in Support of Sealing Motion at ECF 429. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 3/2/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2022)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 447 Document sealed. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 3/2/22. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2022)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 446 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/28/2022 before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Frawley, Alexander) (Filed on 3/2/2022)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 445 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #429 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs Request For Order To Show Cause Re: Sanctions For Googles Discovery Misconduct filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tse)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 3/1/2022)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 444 NOTICE of Appearance by Xi Gao (Gao, Xi) (Filed on 3/1/2022)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 443 Order Setting Briefing and Hearing Schedule on #430 Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions for Discovery Misconduct. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 3/1/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2022)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 442 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2/28/22 before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen by Google LLC, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Tse, Jonathan) (Filed on 3/1/2022)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 441 NOTICE of Appearance by Crystal Nix-Hines (Nix-Hines, Crystal) (Filed on 3/1/2022)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 440 ORDER granting #439 STIPULATION AUTHORIZING RELEASE OF FEBRUARY 28, 2022 HEARING TRANSCRIPT TO COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 3/1/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2022)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 439 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #432 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Authorizing Release of February 28, 2022 Hearing Transcript filed by Google LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 3/1/2022)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 438 Redaction Order re #437 Sealed Discovery Order. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 3/1/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2022)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 437 Document sealed. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 2/28/22. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2022)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines as to #430 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Why it Should Not be Sanctioned for Discovery Misconduct. Responses due by 3/24/2022. Replies due by 4/7/2022. Motion Hearing set for 4/21/2022 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2022)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 436 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal IN RESPONSE TO DKT. 419 RE: SEALING PORTIONS OF FEBRUARY 22, 2022 ORDER ON JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF (DKT. 418) filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tse, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Order - Redacted, #4 Exhibit Order - Sealed)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 2/28/2022)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 435 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ISO Dkt. 412 filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit - redacted, #3 Exhibit - unredacted)(Tse, Jonathan) (Filed on 2/28/2022)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 434 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ISO Dkt. 414 filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit - redacted, #3 Exhibit - unredacted)(Tse, Jonathan) (Filed on 2/28/2022)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 433 Minute Entry for UNDER SEAL proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen: Discovery Hearing held on 2/28/2022 via Zoom.All parties appeared via Zoom. Court to issue order(s).Total Time in Court: 1:37-2:34pm (57 mins). Court Reporter: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: Amanda Bonn, Mark Mao, James Lee, Beko Richardson, Rossana Baeza, Erika Nyborg-Burch, John Yanchunis, Ryan McGee & Alex Frawley. Defendant Attorney: Andrew Schapiro, Stephen Broome, Viola Trebicka, Jomaire Crawford, Josef Ansorge, Carl Spilly, Tracy Gao & Sara Jenkins.Special Master Douglas Brush with Timothy Schmidt. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/28/2022)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 432 ORDER granting Motion to Seal Courtroom for February 28, 2022 Discovery Hearing. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 2/28/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2022)
February 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 431 Proposed Pretrial Order and Case Management Order by Google LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 2/26/2022)
February 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 430 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Why it Should Not be Sanctioned for Discovery Misconduct filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. Responses due by 3/14/2022. Replies due by 3/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Proposed Order)(Yanchunis, John) (Filed on 2/26/2022)
February 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 429 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unredacted Request for Order to Show Cause, #2 Exhibit Redacted Request for Order to Show Cause, #3 Declaration Unredacted Mao Decl., #4 Declaration Redacted Mao Decl., #5 Exhibit Ex. 1 (Restricted), #6 Exhibit Ex. 1, #7 Exhibit Ex. 2 (Restricted), #8 Exhibit Ex. 2, #9 Exhibit Ex. 3 (Restricted), #10 Exhibit Ex. 3, #11 Exhibit Ex. 4 (Restricted), #12 Exhibit Ex. 4, #13 Exhibit Ex. 5 (Restricted), #14 Exhibit Ex. 5, #15 Exhibit Ex. 6 (Restricted), #16 Exhibit Ex. 6, #17 Exhibit Ex. 7 (Restricted), #18 Exhibit Ex. 7, #19 Exhibit Ex. 8 (Restricted), #20 Exhibit Ex. 8, #21 Exhibit Ex. 9 (Restricted), #22 Exhibit Ex. 9, #23 Exhibit Ex. 10 (Restricted), #24 Exhibit Ex. 10, #25 Exhibit Ex. 11 (Restricted), #26 Exhibit Ex. 11, #27 Exhibit Ex. 12 (Restricted), #28 Exhibit Ex. 12, #29 Exhibit Ex. 13 (Restricted), #30 Exhibit Ex. 13, #31 Exhibit Ex. 14 (Restricted), #32 Exhibit Ex. 14, #33 Exhibit Ex. 15 (Restricted), #34 Exhibit Ex. 15, #35 Exhibit Ex. 16 (Restricted), #36 Exhibit Ex. 16, #37 Exhibit Ex. 17 (Restricted), #38 Exhibit Ex. 17, #39 Exhibit Ex. 18 (Restricted), #40 Exhibit Ex. 18, #41 Exhibit Ex. 19 (Restricted), #42 Exhibit Ex. 19, #43 Exhibit Ex. 20 (Restricted), #44 Exhibit Ex. 20, #45 Exhibit Ex. 21 (Restricted), #46 Exhibit Ex. 21, #47 Exhibit Ex. 22 (Restricted), #48 Exhibit Ex. 22, #49 Exhibit Ex. 23 (Restricted), #50 Exhibit Ex. 23, #51 Exhibit Ex. 24 (Restricted), #52 Exhibit Ex. 24, #53 Exhibit Ex. 25 (Restricted), #54 Exhibit Ex. 25)(Yanchunis, John) (Filed on 2/26/2022)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 428 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #395 MOTION for Leave to File to Amend Complaint (R. CIV. P. 15(a)) ) filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Stephen Broome, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 2/25/2022)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 427 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan Tse, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1 - unredacted, #4 Exhibit 1 - redacted, #5 Exhibit 5 - unredacted, #6 Exhibit 5 - redacted, #7 Exhibit 9 - unredacted, #8 Exhibit 9 - redacted)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 2/25/2022)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 426 Transcript of Proceedings held on February 11, 2022, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Raynee H. Mercado, CSR, telephone number 510-565-7228, cacsr8258@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (480 in 4:20-cv-05146-YGR) Transcript Order, (402 in 4:20-cv-03664-YGR) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/19/2022. (Mercado, Raynee) (Filed on 2/25/2022)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 425 Transcript of Proceedings held on February 11, 2022, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Court Reporter Raynee H. Mercado, CSR, telephone number 510-565-7228, cacsr8258@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #402 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/19/2022. (Related document(s) #402 ) (Mercado, Raynee) (Filed on 2/25/2022)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 424 Joint Discovery Letter Brief regarding docket 416 filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 2/25/2022)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 423 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Discovery Dispute Chart filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Version of Joint Discovery Submission, #2 Redacted Version of Joint Discovery Submission)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 2/25/2022)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Hearing as to #395 MOTION for Leave to File to Amend Complaint (R. CIV. P. 15(a)). Motion Hearing set for 3/15/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2022)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 421 Declaration of JONATHAN TSE in Support of #410 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Joint Letter Brief re 30(b)(6) Deposition Notices filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1 - Joint Letter Brief re 30(b)(6), #3 Exhibit 2 - Exhibit A to Joint Letter Brief re 30(b)(6))(Related document(s) #410 ) (Tse, Jonathan) (Filed on 2/23/2022)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 420 ORDER on #398 Administrative Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 2/22/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2022)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 419 Redaction Order re #418 Discovery Order. Redactions due 2/28/2022. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 2/22/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2022)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 418 ORDER ON JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF RE PLAINTIFFS RULE 30(B)(6) DEPOSITION NOTICES. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 2/22/22. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2022)FAXED VIA EMAIL TO COUNSEL
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 417 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING.The Discovery Hearing on 2/28/22 at 1:30PM will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/svk Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be partici pating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names must be sent to the CRD at SVKcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than February 25, 2022 at 12:00PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2022)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 416 ORDER RE UPDATED DISCOVERY DISPUTE CHARTS. Discovery Hearing set for 2/28/2022 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 2/22/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2022)
February 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 415 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #382 MOTION For Relief From Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge re #365 Discovery Order ) filed byChasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 2/21/2022)
February 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 414 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Response to Google's Motion re Sundar Pichai Deposition filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs' Response to Google LLC's Motion for Relief From Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge re Apex Deposition of Sundar Pichai, #2 Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Response to Google LLC's Motion for Relief From Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge re Apex Deposition of Sundar Pichai)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 2/21/2022)
February 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 413 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #375 MOTION For Relief From Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge re #359 Discovery Order ) filed byChasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 2/21/2022)
February 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 412 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Response to Google's Motion re Twohill Deposition filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs' Response to Google LLC's Motion for Relief From NonDispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge re Apex Deposition of Lorraine Twohill, #2 Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Response to Google LLC's Motion for Relief From NonDispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge re Apex Deposition of Lorraine Twohill)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 2/21/2022)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 411 Joint Discovery Letter Briefre 30(b)(6) Deposition Notices filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Chart with each disputed topic)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 2/17/2022)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 410 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Joint Letter Brief re 30(b)(6) Deposition Notices filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Version of Joint Letter Brief re 30(b)(6) Deposition Notices, #2 Redacted Version of Joint Letter Brief re 30(b)(6) Deposition Notices, #3 Unredacted Exhibit A - Chart with each disputed topic, #4 Redacted Exhibit A - Chart with each disputed topic)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 2/17/2022)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 409 Declaration of JONATHAN TSE in Support of #394 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave, #3 Exhibit B - Mao Decl., #4 Exhibit C- Plaintiffs' Exhibits 1-43)(Related document(s) #394 ) (Tse, Jonathan) (Filed on 2/17/2022)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 408 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Granting #400 JOINT STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR GOOGLE TO SUBMIT OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT (DKT. 395) AND DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SEAL (DKT. 394).(amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2022)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Reset Deadline as to #395 MOTION for Leave to File to Amend Complaint (R. CIV. P. 15(a)). Response due by 2/25/2022. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2022)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 407 Declaration of JONATHAN TSE in Support of #398 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Joint Letter Brief re: Plaintiffs' Request for an Additional Google Custodian filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A: Joint Letter Brief)(Related document(s) #398 ) (Tse, Jonathan) (Filed on 2/15/2022)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 406 Joint Discovery Letter Brief RE: COURT ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION, DKT. 401 filed by Google LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 2/14/2022) Modified on 2/14/2022 (jhf, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 422 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers: Initial Case Management Conference held on 2/11/2022. Defendant's Motion relative to individual plaintiffs due by 8/2/2022. Plaintiff's response to Google's motion for administrative relief at Dkt. #375 due by 2/21/2022. Hearing on the Motion for Class Certification is continued 9/20/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.Total Time in Court: 1:20. Court Reporter: Raynee Mercado. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/11/2022)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 405 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/11/2022 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen, for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Frawley, Alexander) (Filed on 2/11/2022)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 404 Declaration of JONATHAN TSE in Support of #396 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1 - Joint Case Management Statement [Redacted])(Related document(s) #396 ) (Tse, Jonathan) (Filed on 2/11/2022)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 403 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/11/2022 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Google LLC, for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Reddy, Aarti) (Filed on 2/11/2022)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 402 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2/11/22 before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers by Google LLC, for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Tse, Jonathan) (Filed on 2/11/2022)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 401 ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION FOR #399 JOINT DISCOVERY SUBMISSION. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 2/10/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2022)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 400 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #394 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , #395 MOTION for Leave to File to Amend Complaint (R. CIV. P. 15(a)) Extending Time filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tse)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 2/8/2022)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 399 Letter Brief Joint Letter Brief re Plaintiffs' Request for an Additional Google Custodian filed byChasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Orders)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 2/8/2022)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 398 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Joint Letter Brief filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Version of Joint Letter Brief re Additional Google Custodian, #2 Redacted Version of Joint Letter Brief re Additional Google Custodian)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 2/8/2022)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 397 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 2/4/2022)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 396 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Joint Case Management Statement, #2 Redacted Joint Case Management Statement)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 2/4/2022)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 395 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint (R. CIV. P. 15(a)) filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark C. Mao, #2 Exhibit A, THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibits 1-43 - Filed Separately Under Seal, #5 Proposed Order)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 2/3/2022) Modified on 4/11/2022 (cv, COURT STAFF).
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 394 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Version of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint (R. CIV. P. 15(a)), #2 Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint (R. CIV. P. 15(a)), #3 Redacted Version of Declaration of Mark C. Mao, #4 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Mark C. Mao, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2, #7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 3, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 4, #9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 5, #10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 6, #11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 7, #12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 8, #13 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 9, #14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 10, #15 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 11, #16 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 12, #17 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 13, #18 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 14, #19 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 15, #20 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 16, #21 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 17, #22 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 18, #23 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 19, #24 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 20, #25 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 21, #26 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 22, #27 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 23, #28 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 24, #29 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 25, #30 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 26, #31 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 27, #32 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 28, #33 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 29, #34 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 30, #35 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 31, #36 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 32, #37 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 33, #38 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 34, #39 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 35, #40 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 36, #41 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 37, #42 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 38, #43 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 39, #44 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 40, #45 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 41, #46 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 42, #47 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 43)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 2/3/2022)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 393 Order on #390 Joint Letter Brief re Google's Responses to Plaintiffs' Interrogatories. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 1/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Discovery Rulings)(svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2022)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 392 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Summary and Update due by 2/4/2022. Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2022 12:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ygr Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at ygrcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than February 9, 2022 at 5:00 PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Case Management Statement due by 2/4/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2022 12:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This is a Text Only Entry. The attached document is Judge Gonzalez Rogers' Standing Order for Civil Cases. (amg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2022) Modified on 1/26/2022 (amg, COURT STAFF).
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 391 Case Reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Judge Lucy H. Koh no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2022)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 390 Letter Brief Joint Discovery Letter Brief re: Interrogatory Disputes filed byChasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 1/19/2022)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 389 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/27/2021 before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen, for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Frawley, Alexander) (Filed on 1/19/2022)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 388 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time for Parties to Submit Joint Case Management Statement filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan Tse)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 1/18/2022)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ANSWER to Complaint Second Amended Complaint (Dkt. 136-1) byGoogle LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 1/14/2022)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 386 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on October 27, 2021 before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen by Google LLC, for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (Tse, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/13/2022)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 385 ORDER ON #383 DISCOVERY DISPUTE FILED AS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 1/13/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2022)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 384 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #383 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Regarding Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions of Google ) filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jenkins, #2 Proposed Order)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 1/12/2022)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Regarding Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions of Google filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. Responses due by 1/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark C. Mao, #2 Proposed Order)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 1/11/2022)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 382 MOTION For Relief From Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge re #365 Discovery Order filed by Google LLC. Responses due by 1/24/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 1/10/2022)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 381 Declaration of JONATHAN TSE in Support of #370 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Motion for Relief from Case Management Schedule filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Motion, #3 Exhibit Mao Declaration)(Related document(s) #370 ) (Tse, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/7/2022)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER ON #291 #354 #356 #360 #361 Administrative Motions for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 1/6/2022. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2022)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 379 RESPONSE to Clerk's Notice, DKT. 364 by Google LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 1/5/2022)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 378 RESPONSE to Clerk's Notice, DKT. 364 by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 1/5/2022) Modified on 1/5/2022 (sfb, COURT STAFF).
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2022)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 376 Declaration of JONATHAN TSE in Support of #360 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to [dkt 358] filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 9, #7 Exhibit 14, #8 Exhibit 15, #9 Exhibit 16, #10 Exhibit 17, #11 Exhibit 18, #12 Exhibit 19, #13 Exhibit 20, #14 Exhibit 21, #15 Exhibit 24)(Related document(s) #360 ) (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 1/3/2022)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 375 MOTION For Relief From Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge re #359 Discovery Order filed by Google LLC. Responses due by 1/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 1/3/2022)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 374 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #372 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Second Amended Complaint ) filed byChasom Brown, William Byatt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration James W. Lee in Support of Opposition)(McGee, Ryan) (Filed on 1/3/2022)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 373 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #371 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief from Case Management Schedule) Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Expedited Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date for Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief from Case Management Schedule filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 1/3/2022)
December 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 372 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Second Amended Complaint filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 12/31/2021)
December 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 371 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief from Case Management Schedule) filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark C. Mao, #2 Proposed Order)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 12/31/2021)
December 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 370 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Motion for Relief from Case Management Schedule filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief from Case Management Schedule - Unredacted, #2 Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief from Case Management Schedule - Redacted Version, #3 Declaration Declaration of Mark C. Mao - Unredacted, #4 Declaration Declaration of Mark C. Mao - Redacted Version)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 12/31/2021)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 369 ORDER APPOINTING COMMISSIONERS TO TAKE EVIDENCE PURSUANT TO CHAPTER II, ARTICLE 17 OF THE HAGUE CONVENTION OF 18 MARCH 1970 ON THE TAKING OF EVIDENCE ABROAD IN CIVIL OR COMMERCIAL MATTERS by Judge Susan van Keulen granting #362 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory. (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2021)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 368 APPOINTMENT OF COMMISSIONERS UNDER THE HAGUE CONVENTION AND REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 12/29/21. (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2021)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER granting #366 Stipulation to Extend Time to Submit Declaration in Support of Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 12/28/2021. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2021)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 366 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #360 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to [dkt 358] EXTENDING TIME FOR GOOGLE TO SUBMIT DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO SEAL (DKT. 360) filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tse)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 12/27/2021)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER REGARDING DEPOSITION OF SUNDAR PICHAI. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 12/27/2021. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2021)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 364 You are receiving this Notice because this case has been assigned to the Honorable Lucy H. Koh. On December 13, 2021, Judge Koh was confirmed to the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. The parties to this action are instructed to meet and confer to determine if collectively they will consent to transfer of this case to a Magistrate Judge for all purposes. On or before January 5, 2022, each party must file either (1) written consent to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge or (2) a request for reassignment of this case to a district judge. The parties may consent to the jurisdiction of a specific Magistrate Judge regardless of the division of the Court to which that Judge is assigned. In the event that the parties decline consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction, the case will be randomly reassigned to a district judge who likely will not be resident in the San Jose division of the Court. ON BEHALF OF THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE, Richard Seeborg, Chief Judge. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy-adi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2021)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 363 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Denying #164 Motion to Dismiss.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2021)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 362 Joint MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE AND APPOINTMENT OF COMMISSIONERS TO TAKE EVIDENCE PURSUANT TO CHAPTER II, ARTICLE 17 OF THE HAGUE CONVENTION OF 18 MARCH 1970 ON THE TAKING OF EVIDENCE ABROAD IN CIVIL OR COMMERCIAL MATTERS filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter of Request, #2 Declaration of Halavati, #3 Proposed Order)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 12/20/2021)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 361 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Google's Supporting Documents in Dkt. 357 filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 12/20/2021)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 360 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Pursuant to [dkt 358] filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt. (Attachments: #1 Sealed 1 GOOG-BRWN-00409986, #2 Sealed 2 GOOG-BRWN-00226088, #3 Sealed 3 Apr. 13 Hearing Transcript, #4 Sealed 4 GOOG-BRWN-00225677, #5 Sealed 5 GOOG-BRWN-00477510, #6 Sealed 6 GOOG-BRWN-00630517, #7 Sealed 7 GOOG-BRWN-00393432, #8 Sealed 8 GOOG-BRWN-00393423, #9 Sealed 9 GOOG-CABR-03750737, #10 Sealed 10 GOOG-BRWN-00418249, #11 Sealed 11 GOOG-BRWN-00167337, #12 Sealed 12 GOOG-BRWN-00183943, #13 Sealed 13 GOOG-CABR-0382763, #14 Sealed 14 GOOG-BRWN-00140297, #15 Sealed 15 GOOG-CABR-04991831, #16 Sealed 16 GOOG-BRWN-CABR-05269357, #17 Sealed 17 GOOG-BRWN-00457784, #18 Sealed 18 GOOG-BRWN-00048967.C, #19 Sealed 19 GOOG-BRWN-00388293, #20 Sealed 20 GOOG-CABR-00501220 (GOOG-CALH-00452518), #21 Sealed 21 GOOG-CABR-05269678, #22 Sealed 22 Radowski Transcript, #23 Sealed 23 Felt Transcript, #24 Sealed 24 Mardini Transcript)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 12/20/2021)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 359 Order re Deposition of Lorraine Twohill. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 12/20/2021. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2021)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 358 ORDER REGARDING DEPOSITION OF SUNDAR PICHAI. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 12/20/2021. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2021)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 357 Letter Brief JOINT SUBMISSION RE: DEPOSITION OF GOOGLE OFFICER SUNDAR PICHAI filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Orders)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 12/17/2021)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 356 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF JOINT SUBMISSION RE: DEPOSITION OF GOOGLE OFFICER SUNDAR PICHAI filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tse, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A - Redacted, #4 Exhibit B - Sealed)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 12/17/2021)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 355 Letter Brief JOINT SUBMISSION RE: DEPOSITION OF GOOGLE OFFICER LORRAINE TWOHILL filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 12/16/2021)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 354 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF JOINT SUBMISSION RE: DEPOSITION OF GOOGLE OFFICER LORRAINE TWOHILL filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tse, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A - Redacted, #4 Exhibit B - Sealed)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 12/16/2021)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER granting (AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT) #352 Stipulation re Briefing Schedule on Discovery Disputes. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 12/15/2021. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2021)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 352 Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION For Scheduling Order For Joint Statements On Discovery Disputes filed by Google LLC. Responses due by 12/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 12/14/2021)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 351 *** POSTED IN WRONG CASE NUMBER *** MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order , Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 12/9/2021) Modified on 12/9/2021 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER granting #337 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 12/7/2021. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2021)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ORDER granting #345 Stipulation to Extend Time for Promontory Financial Group to Respond to Subpoena. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 11/30/2021. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2021)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER granting #344 Stipulation to Extend Time for Ernst & Young to Respond to Subpoena. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 11/30/2021.(svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2021)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER granting #343 Stipulation to Extend Time for PricewaterhouseCoopers to Respond to Subpoena. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 11/30/2021. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2021)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 346 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #342 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (ked, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2021)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 345 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING THIRD PARTY PROMONTORY FINANCIAL GROUPS DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO SUBPOENA filed by Chasom Brown. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Ryan McGee)(McGee, Ryan) (Filed on 11/29/2021)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 344 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND THIRD PARTY ERNST & YOUNG LLPS DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO SUBPOENA filed by Chasom Brown. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Ryan McGee)(McGee, Ryan) (Filed on 11/29/2021)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 343 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR NON-PARTY PRICEWATERHOUSECOOPERS LLP TO RESPOND TO COURT ORDER FOR DOCUMENT PRODUCTION filed by PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF RICHARD J. DEMARCO, JR. IN SUPPORT OF JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR NON-PARTY PRICEWATERHOUSECOOPERS LLP TO RESPOND TO COURT ORDER FOR DOCUMENT PRODUCTION, #2 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR NON-PARTY PRICEWATERHOUSECOOPERS LLP TO RESPOND TO COURT ORDER FOR DOCUMENT PRODUCTION)(Cave, Matthew) (Filed on 11/29/2021)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 342 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Brett N. Watkins ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-16664450.) filed by Google LLC. (Watkins, Brett) (Filed on 11/29/2021)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER granting #321 #333 #339 #340 Administrative Motions to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 11/23/2021. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2021)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 340 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal IN RESPONSE TO DKT. 320 RE: SEALING PORTIONS OF NOVEMBER 4, 2021 HEARING TRANSCRIPT filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tse, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 11/19/2021)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 339 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal IN RESPONSE TO DKT. 331, 332 RE: SEALING PORTIONS OF NOVEMBER 12, 2021 ORDER RE: SPECIAL MASTERS REPORT AND ORDERS ON REFERRED DISCOVERY ISSUES filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tse, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 11/19/2021)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 338 Declaration of ANDRE GOLUEKE in Support of #332 Discovery Order, #336 Discovery Order GOOGLE LLCS SUBMISSION IN RESPONSE TO NOVEMBER 12 ORDER ADOPTING IN PART AND MODIFYING IN PART THE SPECIAL MASTERS REPORT AND ORDERS ON REFERRED DISCOVERY ISSUES DKT. 331, 336 filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #332 , #336 ) (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 11/18/2021)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 337 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF GOOGLE LLCS SUBMISSION IN RESPONSE TO NOVEMBER 12 ORDER ADOPTING IN PART AND MODIFYING IN PART THE SPECIAL MASTERS REPORT AND ORDERS ON REFERRED DISCOVERY ISSUES DKT. 331, 336 filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tse, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A - Redacted, #4 Exhibit A - Version Sought to be Sealed, #5 Exhibit B - Redacted, #6 Exhibit B - Version Sought to be Sealed)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 11/18/2021)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH ORDER RE SPECIAL MASTER'S REPORT AND ORDERS. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 11/16/2021. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2021)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #314 Defendant's Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 11/16/2021. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2021)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 334 Declaration of JONATHAN TSE in Support of #330 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, NOVEMBER 4 HEARING DEMONSTRATIVES (DKT. 321) filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #330 ) (Tse, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/12/2021)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 333 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF SEPTEMBER 30, 2021 HEARING TRANSCRIPT filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tse, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 11/12/2021)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 332 Redaction Order. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 11/12/2021. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2021)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #308 #309 #310 #321 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 11/12/2021. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2021)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 329 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/04/2021 before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Frawley, Alexander) (Filed on 11/10/2021)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 328 Sealed Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/04/2021, before Judge Susan Van Keulen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 11/29/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/8/2021. (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 11/10/2021)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 327 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/4/21 before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen by Google LLC, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Tse, Jonathan) (Filed on 11/9/2021)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER granting #325 Stipulation Authorizing Release of November 4, 2021 Hearing Transcript to Counsel. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 11/9/2021. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2021)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 325 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER AUTHORIZING RELEASE OF NOVEMBER 4 HEARING TRANSCRIPT filed by Google LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 11/8/2021)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 324 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING 11/23/21 10:00AM MOTION FOR SANCTIONS #292 HEARING.Per Order at Dkt. #297 , motion stayed pending resolution of issues set forth in the Special Master's report. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2021)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 323 NOTICE by Chasom Brown, William Byatt Plaintiffs' November 4 Hearing Demonstratives (Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 11/4/2021)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 322 Minute Entry for proceedings held UNDER SEAL before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen: Hearing re Special Master Order held on 11/4/2021.Court to issue order.Total Time in Court: 10:16-11:35am (1 hour 19 mins).Court Reporter: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: Mark Mao, Ryan McGee, Beko Reblitz-Richardson and Amanda Bonn. Defendant Attorney: Andrew Schapiro, Stephen Broome, Viola Trebicka and Josef Ansorge. Special Master: Douglas Brush with Timothy Schmidt via Zoom. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/4/2021)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 321 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' November 4 Hearing Demonstratives filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexander P. Frawley in Support of Administrative Motion to Seal Plaintiffs' November 4 Hearing Demonstratives, #2 Proposed Order, #3 November 4 Hearing Demonstratives [REDACTED], #4 November 4 Hearing Demonstratives, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 11/4/2021)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER granting #319 Administrative Motion to Seal Courtroom for November 4, 2021 Discovery Hearing. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 11/3/2021. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2021)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 319 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal THE COURTROOM FOR HEARING ON SPECIAL MASTERS SEALED RECOMMENDATIONS AND ORDER DATED OCTOBER 20, 2021 (DKT NO. 299) filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tse, #2 Proposed Order)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 11/3/2021)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER RE NOVEMBER 4, 2021 HEARING ON OBJECTIONS TO SPECIAL MASTER REPORT. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 11/2/2021. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2021)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 317 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/27/2021, before Magistrate Judge van Keulen. Court Reporter Pamela Batalo Hebel, telephone number 626-688-7509; pamela_batalo-hebel@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #316 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 11/23/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/3/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/31/2022. (Related documents(s) #316 ) (Batalo, Pam) (Filed on 11/2/2021)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 316 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/27/2021 before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen for Court Reporter Pam Batalo. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2021)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 315 Declaration of JONATHAN TSE in Support of #309 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Objections to Special Master Report (Dkt. 299) filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Objections, #3 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #309 ) (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 11/1/2021)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 314 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Motion for Protective Order Against Plaintiffs' Non-Party Subpoenas filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 10/28/2021)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 313 CLERK'S NOTICE No later than 10:00 a.m. Pacific Time on Friday, October 29, 2021, both sides must provide the Special Master with unredacted versions of their objections to the Special Masters report, exhibits, and proposed orders. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2021)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 312 OBJECTIONS to re #299 Document Sealed GOOGLE LLCS RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO SPECIAL MASTERS REPORT AND ORDERS ON REFERRED DISCOVERY ISSUES (DKT. 299) by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 10/28/2021)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 311 OBJECTIONS to re #299 Document Sealed Plaintiffs' Objections to Special Master Brush Report REDACTED by Chasom Brown, William Byatt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A REDACTED, #2 Exhibit B REDACTED, #3 Exhibit C REDACTED, #4 Exhibit D REDACTED, #5 Exhibit E REDACTED, #6 Proposed Order re Plaintiffs' Objections to Special Master Brush Report REDACTED)(Carmody, William) (Filed on 10/27/2021)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 310 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal GOOGLE LLCS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO SPECIAL MASTERS REPORT AND ORDERS ON REFERRED DISCOVERY ISSUES filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tse, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A - Redacted, #4 Exhibit B - Sealed, #5 Exhibit 1 - Redacted, #6 Exhibit 1 - Sealed, #7 Exhibit 2 - Redacted, #8 Exhibit 2 - Sealed, #9 Exhibit 3 - Redacted, #10 Exhibit 3 - Sealed, #11 Exhibit 4- Redacted, #12 Exhibit 4 - Sealed)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 10/27/2021)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 309 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Objections to Special Master Report filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexander Frawley, #2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Mot. to Seal, #3 Plaintiffs' Objections to Special Master Brush Report REDACTED, #4 Plaintiffs' Objections to Special Master Brush Report UNDER SEAL, #5 Exhibit A REDACTED, #6 Exhibit A UNDER SEAL, #7 Exhibit B REDACTED, #8 Exhibit B UNDER SEAL, #9 Exhibit C REDACTED, #10 Exhibit C UNDER SEAL, #11 Exhibit D REDACTED, #12 Exhibit D UNDER SEAL, #13 Exhibit E REDACTED, #14 Exhibit E UNDER SEAL, #15 Proposed Order re Plaintiffs' Objections to Special Master Brush Report REDACTED, #16 Proposed Order re Plaintiffs' Objections to Special Master Brush Report UNDER SEAL, #17 Certificate/Proof of Service re Frawley Decl. ISO Plaintiffs' Mot. to Seal)(Carmody, William) (Filed on 10/27/2021)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 308 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal JOINT SUBMISSION IN RESPONSE TO DKT. 302 RE: SEALING PORTIONS OF OCT. 20, 2021 SPECIAL MASTER REPORT filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tse, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 10/27/2021)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER FOLLOWING OCTOBER 27, 2021 DISCOVERY HEARING re #290 Discovery Letter Brief re Clawback Dispute, #296 Discovery Letter Brief re Privilege Log Dispute. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 10/27/2021. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2021)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER granting #295 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 10/27/2021. (svklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2021)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 305 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen: Discovery Hearing held on 10/27/2021 via Zoom.All parties appeared via Zoom. Court to issue short order.Total Time in Court: 10:03-11:10am (1 hr 7 mins). Court Reporter: Pamela Batalo Hebel. Plaintiff Attorney: Amanda Bonn, Rossana Baeza & Mark Mao. Defendant Attorney: Andrew Schapiro, Viola Trebicka & Sara Jenkins. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/27/2021)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 304 CLERKS NOTICE DUE TO COURTHOUSE CLOSURE TODAY'S DISCOVERY HEARING AT 10:00AM WILL BE HEARD VIA ZOOM.Today's proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/svk General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2021)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 303 Declaration of Jonathan Tse in Support of #291 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Motion Seeking Relief for Google's Failure to Obey Discovery Order filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit F, #5 Exhibit H, #6 Exhibit I, #7 Exhibit J, #8 Exhibit K, #9 Exhibit L)(Related document(s) #291 ) (Tse, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/25/2021)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 302 REDACTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 10/22/2021. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2021)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER granting #300 Stipulation to Extend Time for Google to File Motion for Protective Order Against Non-Party Subpoenas. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 10/22/2021. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2021)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 300 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to File Motion for Protective Order Against Non-Party Subpoenas filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan Tse)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 10/20/2021)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 299 Document sealed. SPECIAL MASTERS REPORT AND ORDERS ON REFERRED DISCOVERY ISSUES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2021) Modified on 10/20/2021 (jhfS, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER LIMITING ONGOING DISCOVERY re #289 . Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 10/20/21. (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2021)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOLLOWING SPECIAL MASTER REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION AND STAYING BRIEFING ON DKT. 292 IN -3664 ACTION. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 10/19/21. Hearing re Special Master Order set for 11/4/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2021)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 296 Letter Brief JOINT SUBMISSION RE: GOOGLE PRIVILEGE LOG DISPUTE filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 10/19/2021)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 295 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF JOINT SUBMISSION RE: GOOGLE PRIVILEGE LOG DISPUTE filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tse, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 10/19/2021)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER by Judge Susan van Keulen granting #293 Stipulation Extending Time for Google to Submit Declaration in Support of #291 Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal. (svklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2021)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 293 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR GOOGLE TO SUBMIT DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO SEAL (DKT. 291) filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tse)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 10/15/2021)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 292 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt. Motion Hearing set for 11/23/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Responses due by 10/28/2021. Replies due by 11/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Erika Nyborg-Burch, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Erika Nyborg-Burch, #3 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Erka Nyborg-Burch, #4 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Erika Nyborg-Burch, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Erika Nyborg-Burch, #6 Exhibit E to the Declaration of Erika Nyborg-Burch, #7 Exhibit F to the Declaration of Erika Nyborg-Burch, #8 Exhibit G to the Declaration of Erika Nyborg-Burch, #9 Exhibit H to the Declaration of Erika Nyborg-Burch, #10 Exhibit I to the Declaration of Erika Nyborg-Burch, #11 Exhibit J to the Declaration of Erika Nyorg-Burch, #12 Exhibit K tot he Declaration of Erka Nyborg-Burch, #13 Exhibit L to the Declaration of Erika Nyborg-Burch, #14 Exhibit M to the Declaration of Erika Nyborg-Burch, #15 Declaration of Mark C. Mao, #16 Proposed Order)(Mao, Hsiao) (Filed on 10/14/2021)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 291 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Motion Seeking Relief for Google's Failure to Obey Discovery Order filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Erika Nyborg-Burch, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Erika Nyborg-Burch Unredacted, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Erika Nyborg-Burch Redacted Version, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Erika Nyborg-Burch, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Exhibit A to Declaration of Erika Nyborg-Burch ISO Motion for Relief, #7 Exhibit E to Declaration of Erika Nyborg-Burch ISO of Motion for Relief, #8 Exhibit F to the Declaration of Erika Nyborg-Burch ISO Motion for Relief, #9 Exhibit H to the Declaration of Erika Nyborg-Burch ISO Motion for Relief, #10 Exhibit I to the Declaration of Erika Nyborg-Burch ISO Motion for Relief, #11 Exhibit J to the Declaration of Erika Nyborg-Burch ISO Motion for Relief, #12 Exhibit K to the Declaration of Erika Nyborg-Burch ISO Motion for Relief, #13 Exhibit L to the Declaration of Erika Nyborg-Burch ISO Motion for Relief)(Mao, Hsiao) (Filed on 10/14/2021)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 290 Joint Discovery Letter BriefRE CLAWBACK DISPUTE filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lee, #2 Declaration of Liu)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 10/8/2021)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 289 Proposed Order Regarding Limiting Ongoing Discovery by Chasom Brown, William Byatt. (Mao, Hsiao) (Filed on 10/8/2021)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER FOLLOWING SEPTEMBER 30, 2021 DISCOVERY HEARING re #281 Discovery Letter Brief.Further Discovery Hearing set for 10/27/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 10/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit chart of discovery rulings)(svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2021)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 287 Minute Entry for proceedings held Under Seal before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen: Discovery Hearing held on 9/30/2021 via Zoom.All parties appeared via Zoom. Court to issue order.Total Time in Court: 9:36-10:48am/10:56-11:39am (1 hour 55 minutes). Zoom Recording. Plaintiff Attorney: Mark Mao, Beko Richardson, Ryan McGee, Amanda Bonn and Alex Frawley. Defendant Attorney: Andrew Schapiro, Stephen Broome, Viola Trebicka, Josef Ansorge, Jomaire Crawford, Teuta Fani, Sara Jenkins and Jonathan Tse. Special Master: Douglas Brush with Timothy Schmidt. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/30/2021)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER on #255 #257 #260 #280 Administrative Motions to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 9/30/2021. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2021)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT GOOGLE LLC'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL THE COURTROOM FOR HEARING ON JOINT SUBMISSION (DKT. 281) by Judge Susan van Keulen granting #284 Administrative Motion.The Discovery Hearing on 9/30/21 at 9:30am before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen will be held via Zoom meeting link emailed to all counsel today. (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2021)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL THE COURTROOM FOR HEARING ON JOINT SUBMISSION (DKT. 281) re #281 Joint Discovery Letter Brief IN RESPONSE TO DKT. 242 RE: STATUS OF DISCOVERY DISPUTES filed by Google LLC. Responses due by 9/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 9/29/2021)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 283 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING 9/30/2021 HEARING on Motion to Dismiss #164 . Matter to be determined on the papers without oral argument. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 282 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara E. Jenkins (Jenkins, Sara) (Filed on 9/28/2021)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 281 Joint Discovery Letter Brief IN RESPONSE TO DKT. 242 RE: STATUS OF DISCOVERY DISPUTES filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Limiting Ongoing Discovery)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 9/24/2021)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 280 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal JOINT SUBMISSION IN RESPONSE TO DKT. 242 RE: STATUS OF DISCOVERY DISPUTES filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 9/24/2021)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 279 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING SEPTEMBER 30, 2021 MOTION TO DISMISS HEARING. The hearing on #164 MOTION to Dismiss remains as set on Thursday, September 30, 2021 at 1:30 PM before Judge Lucy H. Koh. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar remotely.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lhk Court Appea rances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at lhkcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Monday, September 27, 2021 at 5:00 pm PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2021)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Set Deadlines/Hearings per #277 Case Management Order: Further Case Management Conference set for 1/26/2022 at 2:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 1/19/2022. Class Certification Hearing set for 9/22/2022 at 1:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2021)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 278 NOTICE by Chasom Brown, William Byatt of Withdrawal of Antonio L. Ingram II (Mao, Hsiao) (Filed on 9/23/2021)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 277 Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 09/23/2021. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2021)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting #274 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2021)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 275 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 9/22/2021)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 274 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Case Management Statement filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 9/22/2021)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER REVISING SEPTEMBER 13, 2021 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 9/16/2021. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2021)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Terminating 9/23/21 Hearing pursuant to (309 in 5:20-cv-05146-LHK, 273 in 5:20-cv-03664-LHK) Order (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2021)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER granting #271 Stipulation re Expert Discovery. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 9/14/2021. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2021)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 271 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Expert Discovery filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt. (Mao, Hsiao) (Filed on 9/13/2021)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 270 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING.Hearing on Any Objections to the Special Masters Forthcoming Report set for 9/23/2021 10:00 AM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/svk Court A ppearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at SVKcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than September 21, 2021 at 4:00PM PDT.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2021)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 269 SCHEDULING ORDER RE FORTHCOMING SPECIAL MASTER'S RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 9/13/2021. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2021)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 268 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #267 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2021)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 267 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16372518.) filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Gregory, Amy) (Filed on 9/9/2021)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 266 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #264 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2021)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 265 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byGoogle LLC. (Related document(s) #208 , #164 ) (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 9/8/2021)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 264 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16369639.) filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Declaration Of Erika Nyborg-Burch)(Nyborg-Burch, Erika) (Filed on 9/8/2021)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 263 Order in re Disputed Custodian David Monsees. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 9/7/2021. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2021)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 262 Supplemental Brief re #259 Order, #242 Order on Discovery Letter Brief SUPPLEMENTAL JOINT SUBMISSION IN RESPONSE TO DKTS. 242, 242-1, 259 RE: CUSTODIANS AND SEARCH TERMS filed byGoogle LLC. (Related document(s) #259 , #242 ) (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 8/30/2021)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 261 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #256 Stipulation to Continue Discovery Deadlines.(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2021)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 260 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal IN RESPONSE TO DKTS. 238, 247 RE: SEALING PORTIONS OF AUGUST 12, 2021 HEARING TRANSCRIPT filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 8/25/2021)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 259 Court approves parties' proposal of filing a supplemental statement on Monday, August 30, 2021 re Dkt. #258 on 8/25/21. (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2021)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 258 Letter Brief re #242 Order on Discovery Letter Brief re JOINT SUBMISSION IN RESPONSE TO DKT. 242, 242-1 RE: CUSTODIANS AND SEARCH TERMS filed byGoogle LLC. (Related document(s) #242 ) (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 8/24/2021)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 257 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF JOINT SUBMISSION IN RESPONSE TO DKT. 242, 242-1 RE: CUSTODIANS AND SEARCH TERMS filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 8/24/2021)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 256 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Discovery Deadlines filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt. (Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 8/24/2021)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #254 Notice (Other) filed by Google LLC (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2021)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 255 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF JUNE 2, 2021 HEARING TRANSCRIPT filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 8/19/2021)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 254 Statement of Recent Decision in Support of #164 MOTION to Dismiss Counts Six and Seven of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by Google LLC (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 8/19/2021) Modified on 8/20/2021 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER re #249 & #251 August 13, 2021 Discovery Submissions. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 8/17/2021. (svklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2021)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 252 Sealed Transcript of Proceedings held on 08/12/2021, before Judge Susan van Keulen. Court Reporter Ruth Levine Ekhaus, RMR, RDR, FCRR, CSR No. 12219, Telephone number (415)336-5223/ruth_ekhaus@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 8/31/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/10/2021. (rreS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2021)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 251 Statement re #242 Order on Discovery Letter Brief - Google's Identification of Discovery Disputes for Resolution by Google LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 8/13/2021)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 250 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 8/12/2021 before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus. (Frawley, Alexander) (Filed on 8/13/2021)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 249 Statement re #242 Order on Discovery Letter Brief Plaintiffs' Identification of Discovery Disputes for Resolution by Chasom Brown, William Byatt. (Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 8/13/2021)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 248 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 8/12/2021 before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen by Google LLC, for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus. (Tse, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/13/2021)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER granting #245 Stipulation for Release of August 12, 2021 Hearing Transcript to Counsel. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 8/13/2021. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2021)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER granting #244 Stipulation Extending Time to Submit Proposed Redactions to June 2, 2021 Transcript. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 8/13/2021. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2021)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 245 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Authorizing Release of August 12 Hearing Transcript filed by Google LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 8/13/2021)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 244 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #222 Sealed Transcript, Extending Time For Submitting Proposed Redactions to Transcript of June 2, 2021 Hearing filed by Google LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 8/12/2021)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 243 Cross-Use and Discovery Coordination Order. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 8/12/2021. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2021)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER on #230 Discovery Letter Brief. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 8/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit chart of discovery rulings)(svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2021)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 241 Minute Entry for proceedings held Under Seal before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen: Further Discovery Hearing held on 8/12/2021 via Zoom.All parties appeared via Zoom. Court to issue order.Total Time in Court: 9:33-11:18am (1 hour 45 mins). Court Reporter: Ruth Levine Ekhaus. Plaintiff Attorney: Mark Mao, Beko Reblitz-Richardson, Ryan McGee, James Lee, Amanda Bonn & Alexander Frawley (Michael Ram observing). Defendant Attorney: Andrew Schapiro, Stephen Broome, Viola Trebicka, Josef Ansorge, Jomaire Crawford & Teuta Fani.Special Master: Douglas Brush with Jason Crosby.Further Discovery Hearing set for 9/30/2021 09:30 AM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/sv k Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at SVKcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 9/29/21 at 12:00 PM PDT.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/12/2021)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER on #198 #204 #210 #217 #228 #229 Administrative Motions to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 8/11/2021. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2021)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 239 CLERK'S NOTICE ZOOM APPEARANCE INSTRUCTIONS FOR SEALED 8/12/21 9:30AM DISCOVERY HEARING(S).These proceeding(s) will be held via Zoom meeting.Parties emailed Judge van Keulen's private Zoom Meeting Link to appear.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://ww w.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2021)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT GOOGLE LLCS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL THE COURTROOM FOR HEARING ON JOINT SUBMISSION (DKT. 230) by Judge Susan van Keulen granting (237) Administrative Motion TO SEAL THE COURTROOM FOR HEARING ON JOINT SUBMISSION (DKT. 230) in case 5:20-cv-03664-LHK. (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2021)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL THE COURTROOM FOR HEARING ON JOINT SUBMISSION (DKT. 230) re #191 Order on Discovery Letter Brief, filed by Google LLC. Responses due by 8/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF JONATHAN TSE ISO GOOGLES MOTION TO SEAL COURTROOM, #2 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING GOOGLES MOTION TO SEAL COURTROOM)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 8/11/2021)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 236 NOTICE of Appearance by Jenna Golda Farleigh (Farleigh, Jenna) (Filed on 8/11/2021)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 235 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #231 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To Submit Additional Briefing Concerning Disputes P1 and P2 ) filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 8/9/2021)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 234 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #233 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2021)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 233 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16260178.) filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Fani, Teuta) (Filed on 8/6/2021)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 232 CLERKS NOTICEThe Discovery Hearing(s) on 8/12/21 at 9:30am will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/svk Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at SVKcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than August 11, 2021 by noon.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2021)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To Submit Additional Briefing Concerning Disputes P1 and P2 filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt. Responses due by 8/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mao, Hsiao) (Filed on 8/3/2021)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 230 Joint Discovery Letter Brief in Response to Dkt. 191, 191-1 Re: Status of Discovery Disputes filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Custodians and Search Terms, #2 Proposed Order re Sundar Pichai Production, #3 Proposed Order re Source Code, #4 Proposed Order re Joint Submission)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 8/3/2021)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 229 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Proposed Orders to August 2, 2021 Joint Submission filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan Tse, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 8/3/2021)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 228 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal August 2 Joint Submission filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan Tse, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 8/3/2021)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER RE GOOGLE'S REQUEST FOR EMERGENCY DISCOVERY CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 7/30/2021. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2021)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 226 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #223 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2021)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 225 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Pursuant to this notice, the Case Management Conference is CONTINUED from July 28, 2021 to September 29, 2021 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California before Judge Lucy H. Koh. A Joint Case Management Statement is due September 22, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2021)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 224 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Google LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 7/21/2021)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 223 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Joint Case Management Statement filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan Tse, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 7/21/2021)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 222 Sealed Transcript of Proceedings held on 06/02/2021, before Judge van Keulen. Court Reporter Irene L. Rodriguez, email address Irene_Rodriguez@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/12/2021. (irodS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2021)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER REFERRING DISCOVERY DISPUTES TO SPECIAL MASTER. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 7/13/2021. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2021)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL MASTER. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 7/13/2021. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2021)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 219 CLERK'S NOTICE The Court has selected Douglas Brush as special master in this action; order of appointment to follow. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2021)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 218 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Dispute P16 filed by Google LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 7/9/2021)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 217 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Joint Letter Brief re Dispute P16 filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan Tse, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 7/9/2021)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 216 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d in Opposition to Google's Motion to Dismiss filed byChasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #164 ) (Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 7/8/2021)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 215 CLERK'S NOTICE: The Court will conduct confidential, ex parte interviews of the special master candidates and will direct the candidates not to engage in post-interview discussions with counsel pending the Courts selection. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2021)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 214 CLERK'S NOTICE : The Court is in receipt of the Parties' special master submissions. Google has until 5 p.m. on July 7, 2021 to file any further objection to Plaintiffs candidate. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2021)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 213 NOTICE by Chasom Brown re #205 Statement, Notice of Withdrawal of Joint Submission re: Nominations for a Special Master and Proposed Orders (Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 7/2/2021)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 212 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Special Master Nomination and Proposed Order filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit A-3, #4 Exhibit B-1, #5 Exhibit B-2, #6 Exhibit B-3, #7 Exhibit B-4, #8 Exhibit B-5)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 7/2/2021)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 211 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #199 MOTION to Compel ) filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1)(Trebicka, Viola) (Filed on 6/30/2021)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 210 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Regarding Dispute P3 filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D)(Trebicka, Viola) (Filed on 6/30/2021)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER REGARDING ESI PROTOCOL re #202 . Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 6/30/2021. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2021)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 208 REPLY (re #164 MOTION to Dismiss Counts Six and Seven of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint ) filed byGoogle LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 6/29/2021)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 207 EXHIBITS re #205 Statement, Exhibit B-5 to Joint Submission re: Nominations for a Special Master and Proposed Orders filed byChasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Related document(s) #205 ) (Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 6/29/2021)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 206 CLERK'S NOTICE Special master submissions previously ordered by the Court to be filed by June 28 shall now be due on Friday, July 2nd by 12 noon. Parties further requests for extensions shall be by stipulation or administrative motion. Parties obligation to meet and confer remain in place. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2021)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 205 Statement - Joint Submission re: Nominations for a Special Master and Proposed Orders (Redacted) by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 (Filed Under Seal), #2 Exhibit A-2 (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit A-3 (Filed Under Seal), #4 Exhibit A-4 (Filed Under Seal), #5 Exhibit A-5 (Filed Under Seal), #6 Exhibit B-1, #7 Exhibit B-2, #8 Exhibit B-3, #9 Exhibit B-4)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 6/29/2021)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 204 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Joint Submission re: Nominations for a Special Master and Proposed Orders filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amanda Bonn, #2 Proposed Order, #3 (Redacted) Joint Submission re: Nominations for a Special Master and Proposed Orders, #4 (Unredacted) Joint Submission re: Nominations for a Special Master and Proposed Orders, #5 Exhibit (Unredacted) A-1, #6 Exhibit (Unredacted) A-2, #7 Exhibit (Unredacted) A-3, #8 Exhibit (Unredacted) A-4, #9 Exhibit (Unredacted) A-5)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 6/29/2021)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 203 Declaration of Viola Trebicka in Support of #198 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion to Compel filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K)(Related document(s) #198 ) (Trebicka, Viola) (Filed on 6/29/2021)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 202 Joint Discovery Letter Brief PURSUANT TO DKT. 191-1 RE: P1, ESI SEARCH TERMS AND CUSTODIANS filed by Google LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 6/25/2021)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 201 Order Relating Cases. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/24/2021. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2021)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 200 CLERK'S NOTICE MOTION TO COMPEL #199 HEARING 6/30/21 AT 9:00 AM IS OFF CALENDAR.Briefing and hearing, if any, already set by the Court. [Dkt. #191 ]. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2021)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 199 MOTION to Compel filed by Chasom Brown. Motion Hearing set for 6/30/2021 09:00 AM in San Jose, - Telephonic Only before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Responses due by 7/7/2021. Replies due by 7/14/2021. (Ram, Michael) (Filed on 6/23/2021)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 198 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion to Compel filed by Chasom Brown. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Ram, Michael) (Filed on 6/23/2021)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER ON #194 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF THE JUNE 2, 2021 DISCOVERY HEARING TRANSCRIPT. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 6/21/2021. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2021)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER RE #195 SUBMISSIONS ON APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL MASTER. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 6/21/2021. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2021)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 195 JOINT SUBMISSION RE: POSSIBLE APPOINTMENT OF A SPECIAL MASTER filed by Google LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 6/18/2021) Modified text on 6/21/2021 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 194 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal June 2 Hearing Transcript filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of June 2 Hearing Transcript, #4 Unredacted Version of June 2 Hearing Transcript)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 6/16/2021)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 193 Request for Judicial Notice re #192 Opposition/Response to Motion, Plaintiffs' Request for Judicial Notice in Opposition to Google's Motion to Dismiss Counts Six and Seven of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed byChasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #192 ) (Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 6/15/2021)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 192 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #164 MOTION to Dismiss Counts Six and Seven of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint ) filed byChasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexander Frrawley, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 6/15/2021)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER re #177 Discovery Letter Brief. Further Discovery Status Chart due by 8/2/2021. Discovery Hearing set for 8/12/2021 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 6/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit chart of discovery rulings)(svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2021)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER granting #176 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 6/8/2021.(svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2021)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 189 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on June 2, 2021 before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Frawley, Alexander) (Filed on 6/4/2021)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 188 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 6/2/2021 before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen by Google LLC, for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Tse, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER granting #185 Stipulation Authorizing Release of June 2 Hearing Transcript. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 6/3/2021.(svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 185 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Authorizing Release of June 2 Hearing Transcript filed by Google LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 6/3/2021)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 187 Minute Entry for proceedings held Under Seal before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen: Further Discovery Hearing held on 6/2/2021 via Zoom.All parties appear via Zoom.Pending deadlines are as set forth on the record. Order will issue.Total Time in Court: 1:34-2:56pm & 3:06-3:41pm (1 hour 57 mins). Court Reporter: Irene Rodriguez. Plaintiff Attorney: Mark Mao, Beko Richardson, Ryan McGee, James Lee and Michael Ram. Defendant Attorney: Andrew Schapiro, Stephen Broome, Viola Trebicka, Josef Ansorge and Jomaire Crawford. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/2/2021)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 184 CLERK'S NOTICE ZOOM APPEARANCE INSTRUCTIONS FOR SEALED 6/2/21 1:30PM DISCOVERY HEARING(S).These proceeding(s) will be held via Zoom.Parties emailed Judge van Keulen's private Zoom Meeting Link to appear.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://ww w.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2021)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER granting #182 Administrative Motion to seal courtroom for June 2 discovery hearing. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 6/1/2021. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2021)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Seal Courtroom for June 2 Hearing filed by Google LLC. Responses due by 6/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan Tse, #2 Proposed Order)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 6/1/2021)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 181 Statement re 179 Clerk's Notice, by Google LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 5/28/2021)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 180 RESPONSE re 179 Clerk's Notice, by Chasom Brown, William Byatt. (Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 5/28/2021)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 179 CLERK'S NOTICE: By NOON tomorrow (5/28/2021), each party must file a statement identifying (by reference to the chart of discovery issues submitted on 5/26/2021) no more than 4 issues it deems most critical to address at the 6/2/2021 discovery hearing. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2021)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 178 EXHIBITS re #177 Joint Discovery Letter Brief In Response to Dkts. 147, 147-1, 159, 159-1 Re: Status of Discovery Disputes filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #177 ) (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 5/26/2021)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 177 Joint Discovery Letter Brief In Response to Dkts. 147, 147-1, 159, 159-1 Re: Status of Discovery Disputes filed by Google LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 5/26/2021)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 176 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Submission filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Viola Trebicka, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A - Redacted Version of Joint Submission, #4 Exhibit B - Unredacted Version of Joint Submission)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 5/26/2021)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 175 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #173 Stipulation re: Briefing Schedule on Motion to Dismiss.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2021)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER granting #170 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Transcript of April 29, 2021 Discovery Hearing. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 5/26/2021. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2021)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 173 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #164 MOTION to Dismiss Counts Six and Seven of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint Briefing Schedule filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt. (Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 5/24/2021)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 172 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #168 Administrative Motion to File Joint Case Management Statement Under Seal.(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2021)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 171 Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/20/2021. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2021)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Set Deadlines/Hearings per #171 Case Management Order: Further Case Management Conference CONTINUED from 5/26/2021 to 7/28/2021 at 2:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 7/21/2021. Class Certification Hearing CONTINUED to 5/19/2022 at 1:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2021)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 170 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the April 29 Transcript filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Viola Trebicka, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A - Redacted Version of Transcript, #4 Exhibit B - Unredacted Version of Transcript)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 5/19/2021)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 169 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 5/19/2021)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 168 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the Joint Case Management Statement filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Viola Trebicka, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A - Redacted Version of JCMS, #4 Exhibit B - Unredacted Version of JCMS)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 5/19/2021)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 167 Order re: Court's Website. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/18/2021. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2021)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 166 Request for Judicial Notice re #165 Declaration in Support,, #164 MOTION to Dismiss Counts Six and Seven of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #165 , #164 ) (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 165 Declaration of Andrew H. Schapiro in Support of #164 MOTION to Dismiss Counts Six and Seven of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed byGoogle LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24)(Related document(s) #164 ) (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 164 MOTION to Dismiss Counts Six and Seven of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Google LLC. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2021 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 6/1/2021. Replies due by 6/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 5/17/2021)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER granting #162 Stipulation to Extend Time for Submitting Proposed Redactions to April 29, 2021 Hearing Transcript. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 5/13/2021. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2021)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 162 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time For Submitting Proposed Redactions to Transcript of April 29, 2021 Hearing filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support of Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order Extending Time For Submitting Proposed Redactions to Transcript of April 29, 2021 Hearing)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 5/12/2021)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 161 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #158 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2021)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER granting #154 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 5/10/2021.(svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2021)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 159 INTERIM DISCOVERY ORDER re #155 May 6, 2021 Joint Submission. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 5/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit interim rulings)(svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2021)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 158 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15939369.) filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 5/7/2021)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 157 CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUANCE OF 5/26/21 1:30PM FURTHER DISCOVERY HEARINGS TO 6/2/21 1:30PM.Further Discovery Hearing set for 6/2/2021 01:30 PM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.All pre-hearing submissions due by 5/26/2021. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/svk General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a tex t-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2021)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 156 Proposed Order to the Joint Submission (Dkt. 155) re Clean Room Access by Google LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 5/6/2021)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 155 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Google LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 5/6/2021)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 154 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the Joint Submission in Response to Dkt. 147 filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Viola Trebicka, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Joint Submission, #4 Unredacted Version of Joint Submission)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 5/6/2021)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 153 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/29/2021 before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen by Benjamin Hewitt, Kimberley Woodruff, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Ornelas, Angelica) (Filed on 5/5/2021)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER granting #139 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 5/4/2021. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2021)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 151 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/29/2021 before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Frawley, Alexander) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 150 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on April 29, 2021 before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen by Google LLC, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Tse, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER granting #145 Stipulation Authoring Release of April 29 Hearing Transcript to Counsel. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 4/30/2021. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER RE GOOGLE SEARCH TERMS re #140 Discovery Letter Brief. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 4/30/2021. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 147 DISCOVERY ORDER FOLLOWING APRIL 29, 2021 Hearing re #140 Discovery Letter Brief. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 4/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit chart of rulings)(svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 146 Minute Entry for proceedings held Under Seal before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen: Discovery Hearing held on 4/29/2021 via Zoom.All parties appear via Zoom.Court to issue written order.Total Time in Court: 3:23-4:29pm (1 hour 6 minutes). Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. Plaintiff Attorney: Amanda Bonn, Mark Mao, Beko Reblitz-Richardson, Ryan McGee, Alex Frawley and James Lee (Mike Ram observing). Defendant Attorney: Andrew Schapiro, Stephen Broome, Viola Trebicka, Josef Ansorge, Jomaire Crawford and Jonathan Tse. Further Discovery Hearing set for 5/26/2021 01:30 PM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Status Report due by 5/6/2021.Chart with status of discovery issues due by 5/20/2021.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/svk General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/30/2021)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 145 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Authorizing Release of April 29 Hearing Transcript filed by Google LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 4/30/2021)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 144 CLERK'S NOTICE ZOOM APPEARANCE INSTRUCTIONS FOR SEALED 4/29/21 1:30PM DISCOVERY HEARING(S).These proceeding(s) will be held via Zoom.Parties emailed Judge van Keulen's private Zoom Meeting Link to appear.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://ww w.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2021)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER on #142 Google's Administrative Motion to Seal Courtroom for April 29, 2021 Discovery Hearing. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 4/28/2021. (svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2021)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Seal the Courtroom for April 29 Hearing filed by Google LLC. Responses due by 4/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan Tse, #2 Proposed Order)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 4/27/2021)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 141 Declaration of Ryan McGee in Support of #139 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Discovery Statement , Chart C filed byChasom Brown, William Byatt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #139 ) (McGee, Ryan) (Filed on 4/23/2021)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 140 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 4/23/2021)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 139 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Discovery Statement filed by Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Viola Trebicka, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Schapiro, Andrew) (Filed on 4/23/2021)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 138 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting #136 Stipulation Re: Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and Deadline to Respond to Second Amended Complaint.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2021)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 137 Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/13/2021, before Judge Susan Van Keulen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, telephone number summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #132 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 5/6/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/17/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/14/2021. (Related documents(s) #132 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 4/15/2021)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 136 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and Deadline to Respond to Second Amended Complaint filed by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bonn, Amanda) (Filed on 4/14/2021)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 135 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on April 13, 2021 before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen by Chasom Brown, William Byatt, Maria Nguyen, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Frawley, Alexander) (Filed on 4/14/2021)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 134 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/13/2021 before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2021)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 133 DISCOVERY ORDER FOLLOWING APRIL 13, 2021 HEARING re #127 and #129 Discovery Letter Briefs. Further discovery status report due at noon on April 23, 2021. Further discovery hearing set for April 29, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 4/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(svklc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2021)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 132 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on April 13, 2021 before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen by Google LLC, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Tse, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/13/2021)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 131 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen: Discovery Hearing held on 4/13/2021 via Zoom.All parties appear via Zoom.Court to issue short order.Total Time in Court: 11:09am-12:35pm (44 mins). Court Reporter: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: Amanda Bonn, Mark Mao, Beko Reblitz-Richardson and Ryan McGee. Defendant Attorney: Andrew Shapiro, Viola Trebicka, Jomaire Crawford and Josef Ansorge. Further Discovery Hearing set for 4/29/2021 01:30 PM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/svk General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photograp hing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https: //www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/13/2021)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 130