Leon et al v. Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Plaintiff: Shannon Williams, Jeffrey Medley, Tammy Slaughter, Bill J. Stacy, Ronald Matthews, Derick Graham, Christine Spann, Robert E. Lynn, Patrick S. Cusac, Toney Ray Clark, Jeffrey Thomas Von-Schmidt, Saundra Smith, James Pollard, Don F. Lett, Marion L. Parker, Christopher Gordon, Charity Howard, Earl Summers, Tangalar Armstrong, Timothy Bradford, Lenetta Turnbow-Bolden, Roy Garner, Cecle May Jones Hammond, Clifford Mills, Theresa Baldwin, Pearlie Williams, Annabel Thomas, John Lee Edward Mauck, Jesse C. Burns, Jr., Jermaine Ball, Linda Teague Thornton, Francisco Mendez, Ronald E. Williams, Jr., Douglas M. Wolf, Remarro Branch, Jerron Knox, Bert Chester Franklin, Marcus Crumble, Valerie Holliday, Josie M. Roper, Carl Leggett, Linda R. Lett, Jeric Craven, Prez Johnson, Jr., Glenda Ann Shelby, Anissa A. Edison, Bridget Lewis, James Abbott, Jr., Rebecca Lutz, Freda Dixon, Ronald Smith, Michael Aikins, Raymon Lopez, Geraldine Bolden, Rhoda V. Long, Dexter Smith, Donald Lee Hicks, Michael Ray Roberts, Betty Gilliam, Byron Grady, Gregory Oliver, Tony Jerry, Courtney M. Mars, Michael Niece-Jacoby, Rodney Peters, Floyd Meeks, Kevin Love, Lonnie C. Carr, Christopher J. Del Val, Gabriel Rodriguez, Albert J. Leon, Pamela Franklin, Norman G. Grant, Willie Scott, Jr. and Prez Johnson,, Sr.
Defendant: Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv03744
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to R. Allan Pixton.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Katrina Ashley.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Robert Hilliard.(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14754446.) filed by Albert J. Leon. (Hilliard, Robert) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14754433.) filed by Albert J. Leon. (Hilliard, Robert) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14754420.) filed by Albert J. Leon. (Hilliard, Robert) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REGARDING DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS AND RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting (305) Stipulation in case 4:18-cv-06972-JST; granting (11) Stipulation in case 4:20-cv-03744-JST. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
July 15, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS AND RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS filed by Gilead Sciences, Inc. and Plaintiffs. (Anderson, Joshua) (Filed on 7/15/2020) Modified on 7/16/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES FOR PRETRIAL PURPOSES by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting (301) Stipulation in case 4:18-cv-06972-JST. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 7/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RELATING CASES to 18-cv-06972-JST. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 8, 2020. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2020)
July 8, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by James Abbott, Jr, Michael Aikins, Tangalar Armstrong, Theresa Baldwin, Jermaine Ball, Geraldine Bolden, Timothy Bradford, Remarro Branch, Jesse C. Burns, Jr, Lonnie C. Carr, Toney Ray Clark, Jeric Craven, Marcus Crumble, Patrick S. Cusac, Christopher J. Del Val, Freda Dixon, Anissa A. Edison, Bert Chester Franklin, Pamela Franklin, Roy Garner, Betty Gilliam, Christopher Gordon, Byron Grady, Derick Graham, Norman G. Grant, Cecle May Jones Hammond, Donald Lee Hicks, Valerie Holliday, Charity Howard, Tony Jerry, Prez Johnson,, Sr, Jerron Knox, Carl Leggett, Albert J. Leon, Don F. Lett, Linda R. Lett, Bridget Lewis, Rhoda V. Long, Raymon Lopez, Kevin Love, Rebecca Lutz, Robert E. Lynn, Courtney M. Mars, Ronald Matthews, John Lee Edward Mauck, Jeffrey Medley, Floyd Meeks, Francisco Mendez, Clifford Mills, Michael Niece-Jacoby, Gregory Oliver, Marion L. Parker, Rodney Peters, James Pollard, Michael Ray Roberts, Gabriel Rodriguez, Josie M. Roper, Willie Scott, Jr, Glenda Ann Shelby, Tammy Slaughter, Dexter Smith, Ronald Smith, Saundra Smith, Christine Spann, Bill J. Stacy, Earl Summers, Annabel Thomas, Linda Teague Thornton, Lenetta Turnbow-Bolden, Jeffrey Thomas Von-Schmidt, Pearlie Williams, Ronald E. Williams, Jr, Shannon Williams, Douglas M. Wolf.. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 7/8/2020)
July 7, 2020 Filing 6 SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/21/2020. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2020)
June 24, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Albert J. Leon. Service waived by Gilead Sciences, Inc. waiver sent on 6/23/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 6/24/2020)
June 22, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/6/2020. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2020) .
June 8, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/9/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/16/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/19/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2020)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Gilead Sciences, Inc. (no process)( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14546672.). Filed byJ ames Pollard, Jeffrey Medley, Ronald E. Williams, Jr, Donald Lee Hicks, Toney Ray Clark, Bridget Lewis, Freda Dixon, Dexter Smith, Tony Jerry, Courtney M. Mars, Lonnie C. Carr, Raymon Lopez, Willie Scott, Jr, Gabriel Rodriguez, Remarro Branch, Ronald Matthews, Linda R. Lett, Cecle May Jones Hammond, James Abbott, Jr, Jeric Craven, Charity Howard, Michael Niece-Jacoby, Saundra Smith, Glenda Ann Shelby, Norman G. Grant, John Lee Edward Mauck, Roy Garner, Christine Spann, Kevin Love, Rhoda V. Long, Clifford Mills, Patrick S. Cusac, Rodney Peters, Rebecca Lutz, Shannon Williams, Marcus Crumble, Valerie Holliday, Don F. Lett, Ronald Smith, Prez Johnson, Jr, Tammy Slaughter, Timothy Bradford, Tangalar Armstrong, Anissa A. Edison, Derick Graham, Albert J. Leon, Gregory Oliver, Francisco Mendez, Geraldine Bolden, Josie M. Roper, Christopher J. Del Val, Theresa Baldwin, Robert E. Lynn, Michael Ray Roberts, Floyd Meeks, Pearlie Williams, Douglas M. Wolf, Lenetta Turnbow-Bolden, Marion L. Parker, Earl Summers, Christopher Gordon, Bill J. Stacy, Annabel Thomas, Jermaine Ball, Pamela Franklin, Carl Leggett, Michael Aikins, Byron Grady, Jesse C. Burns, Jr, Bert Chester Franklin, Jeffrey Thomas Von-Schmidt, Jerron Knox, Linda Teague Thornton, Betty Gilliam. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scarlett, Shana) (Filed on 6/5/2020) Modified on 6/8/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leon et al v. Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Williams
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Medley
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Slaughter
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill J. Stacy
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Matthews
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derick Graham
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Spann
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E. Lynn
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick S. Cusac
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toney Ray Clark
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Thomas Von-Schmidt
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Saundra Smith
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Pollard
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don F. Lett
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marion L. Parker
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Gordon
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charity Howard
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Summers
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tangalar Armstrong
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Bradford
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lenetta Turnbow-Bolden
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Garner
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecle May Jones Hammond
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Mills
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Baldwin
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pearlie Williams
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annabel Thomas
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Lee Edward Mauck
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse C. Burns, Jr.
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jermaine Ball
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Teague Thornton
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Mendez
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald E. Williams, Jr.
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas M. Wolf
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Remarro Branch
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerron Knox
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bert Chester Franklin
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Crumble
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Holliday
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josie M. Roper
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Leggett
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda R. Lett
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeric Craven
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prez Johnson, Jr.
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenda Ann Shelby
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anissa A. Edison
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridget Lewis
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Abbott, Jr.
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Lutz
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freda Dixon
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Smith
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Aikins
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymon Lopez
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geraldine Bolden
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhoda V. Long
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dexter Smith
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Lee Hicks
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Ray Roberts
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Gilliam
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byron Grady
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Oliver
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Jerry
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney M. Mars
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Niece-Jacoby
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Peters
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Floyd Meeks
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Love
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonnie C. Carr
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher J. Del Val
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Rodriguez
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert J. Leon
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Robert Carl Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Franklin
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman G. Grant
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Scott, Jr.
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prez Johnson,, Sr.
Represented By: Shana E. Scarlett
Represented By: R. Allan Pixton
Represented By: Robert C Hilliard
Represented By: Katrina R. Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Eugene Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?