Cladianos v. Marin General Hospital et al
Plaintiff: Diane Cladianos
Defendant: MD Xavier Perez, Northgate Post Acute Care, United States, MD Robert D. Teasdale, Partnership of Health, Marin General Hospital and MD Robert Sinaiko
Case Number: 4:2020cv03769
Filed: June 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting (53) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 4:19-cv-02846-JST. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar Granting #15 DEFENDANT'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION REQUESTING THAT THE COURT ADOPT JUDGMENT ENTERED BY STATE COURT.(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 10, 2020 Filing 18 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Diane Cladianos. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2020)
July 7, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Edward Finkel (Finkel, Joseph) (Filed on 7/7/2020)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Substitute Party Party United States for Dr. Perez and Dr. Sinaiko filed by United States, Set/Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Substitute Party Party United States for Dr. Perez and Dr. Sinaiko. Responses due by 7/20/2020. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 6, 2020. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 3, 2020 Filing 15 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Requesting Adoption of State Court Judgment Entered Prior to Removal of Case to Federal Court filed by Teasdale. Responses due by 7/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kevin Kelly with Exhibits A, B, & C, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kelly, Kevin) (Filed on 7/3/2020)
July 3, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Peter Kelly (Kelly, Kevin) (Filed on 7/3/2020)
June 22, 2020 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 9/1/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/8/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 22, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Northgate Post Acute Care.. (Roth, David) (Filed on 6/22/2020)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 06/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RELATING CASE 20-cv-03769-KAW to 19-cv-02846-JST. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on June 19, 2020. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 17, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 6/24/2020. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 16, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Substitute Party Party United States for Dr. Perez and Dr. Sinaiko (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 6/16/2020)
June 15, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION to Substitute Party Party United States for Dr. Perez and Dr. Sinaiko filed by United States. Responses due by 6/29/2020. Replies due by 7/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 6/15/2020)
June 9, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/1/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/8/2020 01:30 PM. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 9, 2020 Filing 5 Answer to Removal Complaint byPerez, Sinaiko. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2020)
June 9, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States re #1 Notice of Removal, (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 6/9/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/22/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Civil Cover Sheet from Marin County Superior Court. Their case number is CIV1802875. (). Filed byUnited States. (Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 6/8/2020)
June 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marin County Superior Court. Their case number is CIV1802875. (). Filed byUnited States. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Answer, #3 Exhibit State Court Docket, #4 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit State Court Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit Torres Declaration, #7 Exhibit Scope Certification)(Zack, Adrienne) (Filed on 6/8/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cladianos v. Marin General Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Xavier Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northgate Post Acute Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Represented By: Adrienne Zack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Robert D. Teasdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Partnership of Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marin General Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Robert Sinaiko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Cladianos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?