Gregg et al v. Providence St. Joseph Health et al
Plaintiff: Charlene Davidson and Andrea Gregg
Defendant: SRM Alliance Hospital Services d/b/a Petaluma Valley Hospital, St. Joseph Hospital of Eureka, St. Joseph Health, Providence Health & Services, Santa Rosa Memorial Hospital, St. Joseph Health Northern California, LLC, Queen of the Valley Medical Center, Providence St. Joseph Health, St. Joseph Health System, Redwood Memorial Hospital of Fortuna and SRM Alliance Hospital Services doing business as Petaluma Valley Hospital
Case Number: 4:2020cv03880
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Filing 19 Request for Judicial Notice re #18 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byProvidence Health & Services, Providence St. Joseph Health, Queen of the Valley Medical Center, Redwood Memorial Hospital of Fortuna, SRM Alliance Hospital Services, Santa Rosa Memorial Hospital, St. Joseph Health, St. Joseph Health Northern California, LLC, St. Joseph Health System, St. Joseph Hospital of Eureka. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Related document(s) #18 ) (Tate, John) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 31, 2020 Filing 18 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #15 MOTION to Remand ) filed byProvidence Health & Services, Providence St. Joseph Health, Queen of the Valley Medical Center, Redwood Memorial Hospital of Fortuna, SRM Alliance Hospital Services, Santa Rosa Memorial Hospital, St. Joseph Health, St. Joseph Health Northern California, LLC, St. Joseph Health System, St. Joseph Hospital of Eureka. (Tate, John) (Filed on 7/31/2020)
July 22, 2020 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMEMT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 9/14/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for Monday, 9/21/2020 02:00 PM by ZOOM platform before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. The Zoom link information will be posted on the docket in advance of the hearing. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 16 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civl Procedure 12(b)(6) ) filed byCharlene Davidson, Andrea Gregg. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Denying Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6))(Dharap, Shounak) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 13, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #15 MOTION to Remand : Motion Hearing set for 8/25/2020 AT 02:00 PM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 10, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand filed by Charlene Davidson, Andrea Gregg. Motion Hearing set for 8/25/2020 03:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 7/31/2020. Replies due by 8/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Remand)(Dharap, Shounak) (Filed on 7/10/2020)
July 6, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Motion to Remand filed by 7/10/2020. To be Set for Hearing 8/25/2020 at 2:00pm. Opposition to Motion to Remand filed 7/31/2020. Reply to be filed 8/11/2020. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2020)
July 6, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civl Procedure 12(b)(6): Responses due by 7/17/2020. Replies due by 8/11/2020. Motion Hearing set for 8/25/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2020)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #13 Stipulation Continuing Hearing and Extending Briefing Deadlines. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2020)
June 30, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #12 Request for Judicial Notice,, #11 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civl Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by Charlene Davidson, Andrea Gregg. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 6/30/2020)
June 19, 2020 Filing 12 Request for Judicial Notice re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civl Procedure 12(b)(6) filed byProvidence Health & Services, Providence St. Joseph Health, Queen of the Valley Medical Center, Redwood Memorial Hospital of Fortuna, SRM Alliance Hospital Services, Santa Rosa Memorial Hospital, St. Joseph Health, St. Joseph Health Northern California, LLC, St. Joseph Health System, St. Joseph Hospital of Eureka. (Related document(s) #11 ) (Tate, John) (Filed on 6/19/2020)
June 19, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civl Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by Providence Health & Services, Providence St. Joseph Health, Queen of the Valley Medical Center, Redwood Memorial Hospital of Fortuna, SRM Alliance Hospital Services, Santa Rosa Memorial Hospital, St. Joseph Health, St. Joseph Health Northern California, LLC, St. Joseph Health System, St. Joseph Hospital of Eureka. Motion Hearing set for 7/28/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Responses due by 7/6/2020. Replies due by 7/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tate, John) (Filed on 6/19/2020)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 06/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Charlene Davidson, Andrea Gregg.. (Arns, Robert) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Providence Health & Services, Providence St. Joseph Health, Queen of the Valley Medical Center, Redwood Memorial Hospital of Fortuna, SRM Alliance Hospital Services, Santa Rosa Memorial Hospital, St. Joseph Health, St. Joseph Health Northern California, LLC, St. Joseph Health System, St. Joseph Hospital of Eureka.. (Freed, John) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 15, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/8/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/15/2020 01:30 PM. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2020)
June 12, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/26/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2020)
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Providence Health & Services, Providence St. Joseph Health, Queen of the Valley Medical Center, Redwood Memorial Hospital of Fortuna, SRM Alliance Hospital Services d/b/a Petaluma Valley Hospital, Santa Rosa Memorial Hospital, St. Joseph Health, St. Joseph Health Northern California, LLC, St. Joseph Health System, St. Joseph Hospital of Eureka re #1 Notice of Removal,, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities, #2 Certificate of Interested Entities,,, (Freed, John) (Filed on 6/12/2020)
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Providence Health & Services, Providence St. Joseph Health, Queen of the Valley Medical Center, Redwood Memorial Hospital of Fortuna, SRM Alliance Hospital Services d/b/a Petaluma Valley Hospital, Santa Rosa Memorial Hospital, St. Joseph Health, St. Joseph Health Northern California, LLC, St. Joseph Health System, St. Joseph Hospital of Eureka re #2 Certificate of Interested Entities,,, (Freed, John) (Filed on 6/12/2020)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Providence Health & Services, Providence St. Joseph Health, Queen of the Valley Medical Center, Redwood Memorial Hospital of Fortuna, SRM Alliance Hospital Services d/b/a Petaluma Valley Hospital, Santa Rosa Memorial Hospital, St. Joseph Health, St. Joseph Health Northern California, LLC, St. Joseph Health System, St. Joseph Hospital of Eureka identifying Corporate Parent Providence St. Joseph Health for Providence Health & Services, St. Joseph Health, St. Joseph Health System; Other Affiliate St. Joseph Health Northern California, LLC for Queen of the Valley Medical Center, Redwood Memorial Hospital of Fortuna, SRM Alliance Hospital Services d/b/a Petaluma Valley Hospital, Santa Rosa Memorial Hospital, St. Joseph Hospital of Eureka; Other Affiliate St. Joseph Health for St. Joseph Health Northern California, LLC. (Freed, John) (Filed on 6/12/2020)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-20-583964. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14571017). Filed bySt. Joseph Health Northern California, LLC, Redwood Memorial Hospital of Fortuna, Providence Health & Services, Queen of the Valley Medical Center, SRM Alliance Hospital Services d/b/a Petaluma Valley Hospital, Providence St. Joseph Health, Santa Rosa Memorial Hospital, St. Joseph Health, St. Joseph Hospital of Eureka, St. Joseph Health System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Freed, John) (Filed on 6/12/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gregg et al v. Providence St. Joseph Health et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SRM Alliance Hospital Services d/b/a Petaluma Valley Hospital
Represented By: John Douglas Freed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Joseph Hospital of Eureka
Represented By: John Douglas Freed
Represented By: Anna Rachella Buono
Represented By: Kathleen Houston Drummy
Represented By: John Russell Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Joseph Health
Represented By: John Douglas Freed
Represented By: Anna Rachella Buono
Represented By: Kathleen Houston Drummy
Represented By: John Russell Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence Health & Services
Represented By: John Douglas Freed
Represented By: Anna Rachella Buono
Represented By: Kathleen Houston Drummy
Represented By: John Russell Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Rosa Memorial Hospital
Represented By: John Douglas Freed
Represented By: Anna Rachella Buono
Represented By: Kathleen Houston Drummy
Represented By: John Russell Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Joseph Health Northern California, LLC
Represented By: John Douglas Freed
Represented By: Anna Rachella Buono
Represented By: Kathleen Houston Drummy
Represented By: John Russell Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Queen of the Valley Medical Center
Represented By: John Douglas Freed
Represented By: Anna Rachella Buono
Represented By: Kathleen Houston Drummy
Represented By: John Russell Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence St. Joseph Health
Represented By: John Douglas Freed
Represented By: Anna Rachella Buono
Represented By: Kathleen Houston Drummy
Represented By: John Russell Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Joseph Health System
Represented By: John Douglas Freed
Represented By: Anna Rachella Buono
Represented By: Kathleen Houston Drummy
Represented By: John Russell Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redwood Memorial Hospital of Fortuna
Represented By: John Douglas Freed
Represented By: Anna Rachella Buono
Represented By: Kathleen Houston Drummy
Represented By: John Russell Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SRM Alliance Hospital Services doing business as Petaluma Valley Hospital
Represented By: John Douglas Freed
Represented By: Anna Rachella Buono
Represented By: Kathleen Houston Drummy
Represented By: John Russell Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlene Davidson
Represented By: Robert Stephen Arns
Represented By: Shounak Sanjeev Dharap
Represented By: Jonathan Ellsworth Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Gregg
Represented By: Robert Stephen Arns
Represented By: Shounak Sanjeev Dharap
Represented By: Jonathan Ellsworth Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?