Kockum v. The We Company et al
Plaintiff: Henriette Kockum
Defendant: Bruce Dunlevie, Lewis Frankfort, John Zhao, SoftBank Group Corp., Adam Neumann, Ronald D. Fisher, Michael Gross, Arthur Minson, The We Company, M. Steven Langman and Mark Schwartz
Case Number: 4:2020cv03894
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Referring Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of SUMMONS and COMPLAINT on Softbank Group Corp. by Henriette Kockum. (Davis, Jason) (Filed on 8/6/2020) Modified on 8/7/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
August 3, 2020 Case Closed and Consolidated. All Future Filing to be Made in the Lead Case, 4:20-cv-3686-HSG. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING (25) Stipulation in case 4:20-cv-03686-HSG CONSOLIDATING RELATED ACTIONS, APPOINTING INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL AND ESTABLISHING A SCHEDULE FOR CONSOLIDATING COMPLAINTS AND ANSWERING OR RESPONDING. Docket No. 16 in case 4:20-cv-03686-HSG terminated, re-filed as docket no. 25 ).(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2020)
July 23, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Henriette Kockum (Davis, Jason) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 21, 2020 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Telephonic Case Management Conference has been set for September 8, 2020, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by September 1st. Standing orders can be downloaded from the Court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:20-cv-03894-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.),. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929Access Code: 6064255The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Signed by Clerk on 7/21/2020. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2020)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Signed by the Clerk on 7/20/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RELATING CASE. The Court finds Case No. 20-cv-3894-DMR to be related to the lower-numbered case, Case No. 20-cv-3686-KAW. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 7/17/2020. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 14, 2020 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANT THE WE COMPANY Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant The We Company shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/28/2020. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
July 13, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANT THE WE COMPANYS DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT filed by The We Company and Henriette Kockum. (Metlitzky, Warren) (Filed on 7/13/2020) Modified on 7/14/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on The We Company on 06/24/2020, filed by Henriette Kockum. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 7/2/2020)
June 26, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Henriette Kockum.. (Davis, Jason) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
June 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Cassidy Davis (Davis, Jason) (Filed on 6/24/2020)
June 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Juan Carlos Sanchez (Sanchez, Juan) (Filed on 6/24/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/9/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/16/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 15, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Bruce Dunlevie, Ronald D. Fisher, Lewis Frankfort, Michael Gross, M. Steven Langman, Arthur Minson, Adam Neumann, Mark Schwartz, SoftBank Group Corp., The We Company, John Zhao. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2020)
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/26/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2020)
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Henriette Kockum (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 6/12/2020)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 6/12/2020)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Violations of the California Corporations Code against Bruce Dunlevie, Ronald D. Fisher, Lewis Frankfort, Michael Gross, M. Steven Langman, Arthur Minson, Adam Neumann, Mark Schwartz, SoftBank Group Corp., The We Company, John Zhao with jury demand ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14572349.). Filed by Henriette Kockum. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 6/12/2020) Modified on 6/15/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kockum v. The We Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Dunlevie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis Frankfort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Zhao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SoftBank Group Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Neumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald D. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Minson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The We Company
Represented By: Warren Metlitzky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Steven Langman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henriette Kockum
Represented By: Shawn A. Williams
Represented By: Juan Carlos Sanchez
Represented By: Travis E. Downs, III
Represented By: Brian Edward Cochran
Represented By: Jason Cassidy Davis
Represented By: Darren Jay Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?