Caloca v. SJK, Inc. dba Fremont Ford et al
Plaintiff: Mark Caloca
Defendant: SJK, Inc. dba Fremont Ford and Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv03900
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Case transferred from Northern District of California has been opened in CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA as case 2:20-cv-05918, filed 07/02/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2020) Modified on 7/7/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2020 Filing 14 MDL ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the District Court for the Central District of California. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2020)
June 26, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by David Alan Cooper Plaintiff Mark Caloca's Notice of Appearance of David Alan Cooper, Esq. (Cooper, David) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
June 25, 2020 Filing 12 Plaintiff Mark Caloca's Brief Regarding Notice of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding filed byMark Caloca. (Mobasseri, Robert) (Filed on 6/25/2020) Modified on 6/25/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert B. Mobasseri (Mobasseri, Robert) (Filed on 6/25/2020) Modified on 6/25/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2020 #Electronic filing error. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Barbara Ann Rohr. The docket shows a different address from what is appearing on the document (dkt. #: 1 Notice of Removal). Please upd ate your personal profile on ECF Re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Ford Motor Company (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 9/8/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/15/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 06/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2020)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 15, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2020 Modified on 6/15/2020 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
June 15, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ford Motor Company.. (Hugret, Spencer) (Filed on 6/15/2020)
June 15, 2020 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/29/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2020)
June 12, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Hailey Marie Rogerson (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Rogerson, Hailey) (Filed on 6/12/2020)
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Ford Motor Company OF PENDENCY OF OTHER ACTION OR PROCEEDING (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hugret, Spencer) (Filed on 6/12/2020)
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer Peter Hugret (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hugret, Spencer) (Filed on 6/12/2020)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Ford Motor Company identifying Other Affiliate State Street Corporation, Other Affiliate Evercore Trust Company, N.A., Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Other Affiliate Black Rock, Inc. for Ford Motor Company. (Hugret, Spencer) (Filed on 6/12/2020)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alameda Superior Court. Their case number is RG19038710. (). Filed byFord Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Spencer P. Hugret, #2 Declaration of Hailey M. Rogerson, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Civil Cover Sheet, #20 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Hugret, Spencer) (Filed on 6/12/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caloca v. SJK, Inc. dba Fremont Ford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SJK, Inc. dba Fremont Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Hailey Marie Rogerson
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Caloca
Represented By: Barbara Ann Rohr
Represented By: Robert B. Mobasseri
Represented By: David Alan Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?