African American Tobacco Control Leadership Council et al v. United States Department of Health and Human Services et al
Plaintiff: Action on Smoking and Health and African American Tobacco Control Leadership Council
Defendant: Secretary Alex M. Azar, II, United States Food and Drug Administration, Mitch Zeller, Center for Tobacco Products, United States Department of Health and Human Services and Stephen Hahn
Case Number: 4:2020cv04012
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Filing 17 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Alex M. Azar, II, Center for Tobacco Products, Stephen Hahn, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Food and Drug Administration, Mitch Zeller.. (Williams, Sarah) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
August 12, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION Extending Deadline to Respond to the Complaint filed by Alex M. Azar, II, Center for Tobacco Products, Stephen Hahn, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Food and Drug Administration, Mitch Zeller, African American Tobacco Control Leadership Council, and Action on Smoking and Health (Williams, Sarah) (Filed on 8/12/2020) Modified on 8/13/2020 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 12, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Williams (Williams, Sarah) (Filed on 8/12/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Entities by Action on Smoking and Health (Leung, Christopher) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
July 30, 2020 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Entities by African American Tobacco Control Leadership Council (Leung, Christopher) (Filed on 7/30/2020)
June 29, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Reissued as to Stephen Hahn, United States Food and Drug Administration. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2020)
June 26, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Action on Smoking and Health, African American Tobacco Control Leadership Council.. (Leung, Christopher) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
June 26, 2020 Filing 10 Proposed Summons. (Leung, Christopher) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
June 26, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Action on Smoking and Health, African American Tobacco Control Leadership Council as to United States Food and Drug Administration. (Leung, Christopher) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
June 26, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Action on Smoking and Health, African American Tobacco Control Leadership Council as to Stephen Hahn. (Leung, Christopher) (Filed on 6/26/2020)
June 19, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Alex M. Azar, II, Center for Tobacco Products, Stephen Hahn, United States Department of Health and Human Services, United States Food and Drug Administration, Mitch Zeller. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2020)
June 18, 2020 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Leung, Christopher) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 18, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Leung, Christopher) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 18, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/8/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/15/2020 01:30 PM. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 18, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Defendant Stephen Hahn is spelled differently on the proposed summons than on the Complaint. Please correct the name and re-file in its entirety. Re: #5 Proposed Summons filed by African American Tobacco Control Leadership Council, Action on Smoking and Health (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 18, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Electronic filing error. Only ONE summons will be issued. Please list all defendants on ONE summons and re-file in its entirety Re: #2 Proposed Summons filed by African American Tobacco Control Leadership Council, Action on Smoking and Health (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/1/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Leung, Christopher) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14588666.). Filed byAction on Smoking and Health, African American Tobacco Control Leadership Council. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Leung, Christopher) (Filed on 6/17/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: African American Tobacco Control Leadership Council et al v. United States Department of Health and Human Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Alex M. Azar, II
Represented By: Sarah Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Food and Drug Administration
Represented By: Sarah Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitch Zeller
Represented By: Sarah Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Center for Tobacco Products
Represented By: Sarah Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Sarah Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Hahn
Represented By: Sarah Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Action on Smoking and Health
Represented By: Christopher K. Leung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: African American Tobacco Control Leadership Council
Represented By: Christopher K. Leung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?