Marc Cohodes v. United States Department of Justice
Plaintiff: Marc Cohodes
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Department of Justice and Executive Office for United States Attorneys
Case Number: 4:2020cv04015
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marc Cohodes re #1 Complaint, #10 Proposed Summons, #9 Proposed Summons, #3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, #12 Certificate of Service, #8 Proposed Summons on United States Attorney General and United States Attorneys Office (Turetzky, Matthew) (Filed on 8/10/2020)
July 16, 2020 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Marc Cohodes.. (Turetzky, Matthew) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
July 2, 2020 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 7/16/2020. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2020)
June 25, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marc Cohodes re #1 Complaint, Summons, Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference and ADR Deadlines, DMR Standing Order (Turetzky, Matthew) (Filed on 6/25/2020)
June 24, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Executive Office for United States Attorneys, Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Department of Justice, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2020)
June 23, 2020 Filing 10 Proposed Summons. (Norton, William) (Filed on 6/23/2020)
June 23, 2020 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. (Norton, William) (Filed on 6/23/2020)
June 23, 2020 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. (Norton, William) (Filed on 6/23/2020)
June 23, 2020 #Electronic filing error. Document filed in wrong case. [err401]This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re: #7 Proposed Summons filed by Marc Cohodes, #5 Propos ed Summons filed by Marc Cohodes, #6 Proposed Summons filed by Marc Cohodes, #4 MOTION to Relate Case PLAINTIFF MARC COHODESS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED filed by Marc Cohodes (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2020)
June 23, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (Norton, William) (Filed on 6/23/2020)
June 23, 2020 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. (Norton, William) (Filed on 6/23/2020)
June 23, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Norton, William) (Filed on 6/23/2020)
June 23, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Marc Cohodes. (Norton, William) (Filed on 6/23/2020) Modified on 6/23/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/9/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/16/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/1/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief for Violations of the Freedom of Information Act against All Defendants (no process) ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14589387.). Filed by Marc Cohodes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shapiro, David) (Filed on 6/17/2020) Modified on 6/18/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marc Cohodes v. United States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Office for United States Attorneys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Cohodes
Represented By: David William Shapiro
Represented By: Matthew William Turetzky
Represented By: William Fred Norton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?