Harrington v. Saul
Plaintiff: Steven Harrington
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 4:2020cv04148
Filed: June 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 206
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Andrew Saul.. (Bolin, Timothy) (Filed on 8/18/2020)
August 7, 2020 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT from U.S. Marshal re service of process as to U.S. Attorney's Office, U.S. Attorney General re #1 Complaint, #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #6 Summons Issued as to USA, #4 Social Security Procedural Order. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
July 29, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 USM-285 US Attorney General, #2 USM-285 US Attorney Anderson)(jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #2 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton.(pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
June 25, 2020 Filing 4 SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2020)
June 24, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2020)
June 23, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Steven Harrington. (Siegfried, Katherine) (Filed on 6/23/2020)
June 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul. Filed bySteven Harrington. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Siegfried, Katherine) (Filed on 6/23/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrington v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Timothy R. Bolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Harrington
Represented By: Katherine Rose Siegfried
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?