Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 108.74.162.112
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 108.74.162.112
Case Number: 4:2020cv04155
Filed: June 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 108.74.162.112.. (Vondran, Steven) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 17, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven C. Vondran (Vondran, Steven) (Filed on 8/17/2020)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore ON EX PARTE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE SUBPOENA PRIOR TO RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE #8 .(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
August 4, 2020 Filing 8 Ex Parte Application For Leave To Serve A Third Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(f) Conference; Memorandum of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D Declarations In Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 8/4/2020)
July 8, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 7/8/2020)
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding copyrights (cc: form e-mailed to register). (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2020)
June 25, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/15/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/22/2020 at 01:30 PM. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2020)
June 24, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/8/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2020)
June 23, 2020 Filing 3 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 6/23/2020)
June 23, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC, Other Affiliate John Doe, Defendant for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 6/23/2020)
June 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Copyright Infringement - Demand For Jury Trial against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 108.74.162.112 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14615326.). Filed byStrike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bandlow, Lincoln) (Filed on 6/23/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 108.74.162.112
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Lincoln Dee Bandlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 108.74.162.112
Represented By: Steven C. Vondran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?