Zuniga v. Safeway, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Norma Zuniga
Defendant: Albertsons Companies Inc. and Safeway, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv04440
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER STAYING ACTION PENDING COMPLETION OF MEDIATION; AND DEEMING PENDING MOTION WITHDRAWN; SETTING COMPLIANCE DEADLINE by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #12 Joint Stipulation. Joint Statement due by 10/16/2020. Compliance hearing is set for 10/23/2020 09:01 AM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020)
July 23, 2020 Filing 12 JOINT STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Stay of Action Pending Completion of Mediation filed by Albertsons Companies Inc., Safeway, Inc. and Norma Zuniga.(Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kopp, Michael) (Filed on 7/23/2020) Modified on 7/23/2020 (ajsS, COURT STAFF).
July 20, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #8 First MOTION to Dismiss plaintiff's complaint: Motion Hearing set for 8/25/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2020)
July 17, 2020 Filing 11 Renotice motion hearing re #8 First MOTION to Dismiss plaintiff's complaint filed byAlbertsons Companies Inc., Safeway, Inc.. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Kopp, Michael) (Filed on 7/17/2020)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 7/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 10, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2020)
July 9, 2020 Filing 8 First MOTION to Dismiss plaintiff's complaint filed by Safeway, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/13/2020 01:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 7/23/2020. Replies due by 7/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Kopp, Michael) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
July 8, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Albertsons Companies Inc., Safeway, Inc. re #5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines,, 4 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #6 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge , Court Notices, Judge's Standing Orders, Notice to Superior Court and Adverse Party (Kopp, Michael) (Filed on 7/8/2020)
July 7, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Albertsons Companies Inc., Safeway, Inc... (Kopp, Michael) (Filed on 7/7/2020)
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 9/30/202 0. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/7/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2020)
July 6, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/20/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2020)
July 2, 2020 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Albertsons Companies Inc. (Kopp, Michael) (Filed on 7/2/2020)
July 2, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Safeway, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Albertsons Companies, Inc. for Safeway, Inc.. (Kopp, Michael) (Filed on 7/2/2020)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (with jury demand by plaintiff) of Civil Action to United States District Court from Alameda Superior Court. Their case number is HG20062742. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14651929). Filed by Safeway, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael W. Kopp, #2 Declaration of Penny Schumacher, #3 Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kopp, Michael) (Filed on 7/2/2020) Modified on 7/6/2020 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zuniga v. Safeway, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Zuniga
Represented By: Paul Anthony Matiasic,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albertsons Companies Inc.
Represented By: Michael Warner Kopp
Represented By: William J. Dritsas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Warner Kopp
Represented By: William J. Dritsas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?