Perez v. Kindercare Education LLC
Plaintiff: Isabel Perez
Defendant: Kindercare Education LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv04562
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the Case Management Conference, previously set for October 19, 2020, is continued to October 20, 2020, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by October 13th. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.). This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone.For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929Access Code: 6064255The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length.PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020)
July 24, 2020 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for October 19, 2020, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by October 12th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:20-cv-04562-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2020)
July 23, 2020 Filing 15 Case REASSIGNED to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to the case. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2020) (bwS, COURT STAFF).
July 23, 2020 Filing 14 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 23, 2020 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 23, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kindercare Education LLC.. (Price, Kristen) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 23, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE re #7 Order Re Notice of Removal by Kindercare Education LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kristen L. Price)(Price, Kristen) (Filed on 7/23/2020)
July 16, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kindercare Education LLC (Weiner, William) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
July 16, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by Kindercare Education LLC re #7 Order Re Change of Admission Status (Price, Kristen) (Filed on 7/16/2020)
July 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by William Elliot Weiner (Weiner, William) (Filed on 7/14/2020)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #1 Notice of Removal and Defendant's Counsel of Record. Defendant's response due by 7/23/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 7/13/2020. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2020)
July 10, 2020 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 10/6/202 0. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/13/2020 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2020)
July 10, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/24/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2020)
July 9, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kindercare Education LLC re #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities, #1 Notice of Removal, (Price, Kristen) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
July 9, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kindercare Education LLC identifying Corporate Parent Knowledge School LLC, Corporate Parent KinderCare Education Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent KC Sub, Inc., Corporate Parent KC Holdco, Inc., Corporate Parent KUEGH Corp., Corporate Parent KC Parent, LLC for Kindercare Education LLC. (Price, Kristen) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Kindercare Education LLC identifying Corporate Parent Knowledge School LLC, Corporate Parent KinderCare Education Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent KC Sub, Inc., Corporate Parent KC Holdco, Inc., Corporate Parent KUEGH Corp., Corporate Parent KC Parent, LLC for Kindercare Education LLC. (Price, Kristen) (Filed on 7/9/2020)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara County Superior Court. Their case number is 20CV366792. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-14672461). Filed byKindercare Education LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kristen L. Price, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Price, Kristen) (Filed on 7/9/2020)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. Kindercare Education LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kindercare Education LLC
Represented By: Kristen L Price
Represented By: Kristen L. Price
Represented By: William E. Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isabel Perez
Represented By: Chelsea Hill
Represented By: Lori J. Costanzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?